City of Canton, Texas v. New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Canton, Texas
Defendant: New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas, Inc., Reverand Joe Donalson and Covenant Comunity of New Beginnings Fellowship/Canton
Case Number: 6:2019cv00365
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
2 Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Mailed Order #23 to Joe Donalson, New Beginnings Fellowship Church, via certified mail rrr, tracking no. 70183090000184390456. (mjc, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief, #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2019 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 10/2/2019. (mjc, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City's Opposition to Defendant Donalson's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Canton, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Martin with Exhibits in Support of City's Opposition, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Martin, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Joe Donalson on 9/27/2019 as to #19 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. Document was received when Mr. Donalson was in the clerk's office to file some documents. (mjc, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Donalson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mjc, )
September 27, 2019 Mailed Order #19 to Joe Donalson via certified mail rrr, tracking no. 70183090000184390449. (mjc, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER entered that New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas and Covenant Community of New Beginnings Fellowship/Canton shall respond by 10/8/2019 to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 9/26/2019. (mjc, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Defendant Donalson's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, and Motion to Abate or Stay This Case filed by City of Canton, Texas. (Martin, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Canton, Texas. Covenant Comunity of New Beginnings Fellowship/Canton served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019 (Voss, Edwin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Canton, Texas. New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019 (Voss, Edwin)
September 20, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Documents # 14 and 15, Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect dates of service. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (slo, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Canton, Texas. Covenant Comunity of New Beginnings Fellowship/Canton served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Voss, Edwin) Modified on 9/20/2019 (slo, ).
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Canton, Texas. New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Voss, Edwin) Modified on 9/20/2019 (slo, ).
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Lee Martin on behalf of City of Canton, Texas (Martin, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief filed by Joe Donalson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Plat, #3 Exhibit B - Aerial Photo, #4 Exhibit C - Minutes, #5 Exhibit D - Statement, #6 Exhibit E - Newspaper Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration, #8 Exhibit G -HHS Application)(mjc, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief filed by City of Canton, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Debra Johnson, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Voss, Edwin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Defendant Donalson's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Canton, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Edwin P. Voss, Jr., #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Voss, Edwin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Defendant Donalson's Second Motion to Consolidate filed by City of Canton, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Edwin P. Voss, Jr., #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Voss, Edwin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Covenant Comunity of New Beginnings Fellowship/Canton, New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Covenant Community)(mjc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief filed by Joe Donalson. (mjc, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss presented in Defendants' Notice of Removal filed by City of Canton, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Edwin P. Voss, Jr., #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Voss, Edwin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief by City of Canton, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Edwin P. Voss, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Voss, Edwin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Joe Donalson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joe Donalson, #2 Exhibits A-N, #3 Exhibits O-V)(mjc, )
August 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell no longer assigned to case. (ksd)
August 14, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. District Judge J. Campbell Barker no longer assigned to the case. Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell no longer assigned to the case. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00365-JCB-KNM, 6:19-cv-00177-JDK(ksd)
August 9, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TXE600048657. (ksd )
August 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joe Donalson. (ksd)
August 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent Form Mailed to Pro Se Defendant, Joe Donalson.** (ksd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Canton, Texas.(Original Petition (Complaint) as filed in the State Court Action(ksd).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (ksd )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joe Donalson from 249th District Court, Van Zandt County Texas, case number 19-00185. (Filing fee $ 400 paid Receipt # TXE600048657) filed by Joe Donalson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(ksd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Canton, Texas v. New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Beginnings Fellowship Church of Houston, Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Alfred Izen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reverand Joe Donalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Comunity of New Beginnings Fellowship/Canton
Represented By: Joe Alfred Izen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Canton, Texas
Represented By: Edwin Armstrong Price Voss, Jr
Represented By: Michael Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?