Sayegh et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Chassan Sayegh and Brenda Sayegh
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00207
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 10/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. The scheduling conference set for 6/18/2020 is canceled. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 6/15/2020. (ndc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT and Scheduling Recommendations by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC (Crawford-Steger, Amanda)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Crawford-Steger on behalf of FCA US LLC (Crawford-Steger, Amanda)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yesenia Esmeralda Cardenas-Colenso on behalf of FCA US LLC (Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 6/12/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 01:00 PM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 5/15/2020. (ndc)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 FCA US LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC.(Kern, Kurt)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to FCA US LLC and emailed to plaintiff to serve. (ndc)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Galen Counts on behalf of Brenda Sayegh, Chassan Sayegh (Counts, Andrew)
April 23, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
April 23, 2020 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
April 23, 2020 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7763112.), filed by Chassan Sayegh, Brenda Sayegh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayegh et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chassan Sayegh
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Sayegh
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Amanda Crawford-Steger
Represented By: Yesenia Esmeralda Cardenas-Colenso
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?