Loco Brands, LLC v. Frontier Communications Corporation
Plaintiff: Loco Brands, LLC d/b/a Direct Tek
Defendant: Butler America, LLC and Frontier Communications Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv00388
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER that the above-styled civil action is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Within ten days of the completion of its bankruptcy proceedings, Frontier shall file a status report in this case. The status report shall address the status of the bankruptcy and state whether the case should be placed back on the Court's active docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/11/20. (mll, )
July 15, 2020 Case Stayed until further order of the Court. (mll, )
July 15, 2020 Defendant Frontier Communications Corporation is SEVERED into Civil Action 6:20cv388, per #273 Order Severing Case. (mll, )
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER SEVERING CASE. Frontier Communications Corporation is SEVERED into the next available case number and the newly numbered action as to Frontier is STAYED. Frontier shall file a notice in the severed action that the bankruptcy proceedings have concluded within ten days of their completion. Trial in the existing case between Direct TEK and Butler (6:19-CV-69) is SET for 11-16-2020 before Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. The parties shall submit a new Docket Control Order incorporating deadlines to file motions in limine and responses thereto, as well as other pretrial deadlines. Parties' Motions in Limine #223 , #224 , #241 are DENIED AS MOOT to be refiled in accordance with the Court's forthcoming Seventh Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/15/20. (mll, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 272 RESPONSE to #269 Order, #271 Response to Non-Motion filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
April 25, 2020 Filing 271 RESPONSE to #269 Order, filed by Butler America, LLC. (Durkin, Marcia)
April 24, 2020 Filing 270 RESPONSE to #269 Order, filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER for Plaintiff Loco Brands and Defendant Butler America inform the Court within 3 days of receipt of this Order whether the entire case should be stayed or whether the case against Defendant Frontier should be severed and stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/22/20. (leh, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 268 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Frontier Communications Corporation and its subsidiaries by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL GRANTING #261 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Butler America, LLC. All claims and defenses in this action relating to Counts IV and V of Butlers Counterclaim are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs, attorneys fees, and expenses. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/1/2020. (gsg)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #231 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Frontiers Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 140) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/31/2020. (gsg)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER that the pretrial and trial settings in this case are continued until further notice of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 03/16/20. (mll, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 264 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation Notice of Time Requested (Johnson, Jacqueline)
March 12, 2020 Filing 263 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC Notice of Time Requested (Durkin, Marcia)
March 5, 2020 Filing 262 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC re #260 Notice (Other) (Notice of Withdrawal of Doc. #260) (Rook, Chad)
March 5, 2020 Filing 261 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Butler America, LLC. (Adamson, R.)
February 28, 2020 Filing 260 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC re #256 Exhibit List (Objections to Amended Exhibit List) (Rook, Chad)
February 27, 2020 Filing 259 Exhibit List Amended by Butler America, LLC.. (Durkin, Marcia)
February 27, 2020 Filing 258 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC re #251 Notice (Other) Objections to Plaintff's Deposition Designations and Rebuttal Designations (Durkin, Marcia)
February 27, 2020 Filing 257 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation re #251 Notice (Other) Rebuttal Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Designation of Video Deposition Testimony of Dave Teddy (Johnson, Jacqueline)
February 27, 2020 Filing 256 Exhibit List (Amended) by Frontier Communications Corporation.. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
February 26, 2020 Filing 255 Exhibit List (Third Amended) by Loco Brands, LLC.. (Rook, Chad)
February 24, 2020 Filing 254 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC re #250 Notice (Other) Objection to Defendant Frontier's Designation of Deposition Excerpts of Dave Teddy (Rook, Chad)
February 24, 2020 Filing 253 REPLY to Response to Motion re #223 MOTION in Limine (First Amended) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
February 20, 2020 Filing 252 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC of Supplemental Deposition Designations (Durkin, Marcia)
February 20, 2020 Filing 251 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC of Designation of Video Deposition Testimony of Dave Teddy (Rook, Chad)
February 20, 2020 Filing 250 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation of Supplemental Deposition Designations (Johnson, Jacqueline)
February 19, 2020 Filing 249 REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence Disclosed by Direct Tek in Support of its Damages Claims filed by Butler America, LLC. (Bell, Ryan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SIXTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Selection set for 3/30/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/19/20. (mll, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 247 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Butler America, LLC . (Adamson, R.)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #232 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant Butler America, LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 141) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 2/18/2020. (gsg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 245 OBJECTION to #231 Report and Recommendations by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
February 13, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Objections submitted, docket entry #244 . Exceed Page Limit. Correction should be made by 1 Business Day. (gsg)
February 13, 2020 Filing 244 ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** OBJECTION to #231 Report and Recommendations by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline) Modified on 2/13/2020 (gsg).
February 11, 2020 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re #241 MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence Disclosed by Direct Tek in Support of its Damages Claims filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rook, Chad)
February 10, 2020 Filing 242 REPLY to Response to Motion re #223 MOTION in Limine (First Amended) (Plaintiff's Reply in Opposition to Butler's Opposition (Doc. #236) to Plaintiff's First Amended Motion in Limine (Doc. #223)) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rook, Chad)
February 5, 2020 Filing 241 MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence Disclosed by Direct Tek in Support of its Damages Claims by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 2018 Rule 30(b)(6), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 5th Supp & Add'l Disclosures, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - 6th Supp & Add'l Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 2020 Rule 30(b)(6), #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - P&L, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - P&L)(Bell, Ryan)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #239 Motion for Leave to File Additional Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/05/20. (mll, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 239 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motion in Limine by Butler America, LLC. (Bell, Ryan)
February 4, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. (saenz, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting in part #230 Motion for Reconsideration re #226 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting filed by Frontier Communications Corporation, Butler America, LLC. Trial in this cause is SET for March 30, 2020 before Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. The parties shall submit a new Docket Control Order incorporating any unreached deadlines. The Docket Control Order shall reflect the following dates: Jury Trial/Jury Selection March 30, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. And Pre-Trial Conference March 19, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/04/2020. (saenz, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 237 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of Time Requested pursuant to Doc. 205) (Rook, Chad)
February 3, 2020 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition re #223 MOTION in Limine (First Amended) filed by Butler America, LLC. (Durkin, Marcia)
January 31, 2020 Filing 235 RESPONSE in Opposition re #224 Amended MOTION in Limine filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
January 31, 2020 Filing 234 Exhibit List (Second Amended) by Loco Brands, LLC.. (Rook, Chad)
January 31, 2020 Filing 233 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (Seventh Supplemental) (Rook, Chad)
January 31, 2020 Jury Selection set for 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (gsg)
January 30, 2020 Filing 232 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(a) filed by Butler America, LLC. The Court RECOMMENDS DENYING Butler's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/30/20. (mll, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 231 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. The Court RECOMMENDS DENYING Frontier's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/30/20. (mll, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 230 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Continuance and Resetting of Deadlines in Docket Control Order by Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Airfare)(Adamson, R.)
January 30, 2020 Filing 229 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC re #222 Notice (Other), #220 Order on Motion to Continue (Conflicting Trial Dates Resolved) (Rook, Chad)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER denying #226 Motion to Continue Trial Setting. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/29/20. (mll, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER denying #181 Motion to Sever Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/29/20. (mll, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 226 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting by Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation. (Durkin, Marcia)
January 28, 2020 Filing 225 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #224 Amended MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2 to Dkt. 224)(Adamson, R.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 224 Amended MOTION in Limine by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durkin, Marcia)
January 27, 2020 Filing 223 MOTION in Limine (First Amended) by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
January 27, 2020 Filing 222 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC re #220 Order on Motion to Continue (Advisory to Court Regarding Conflicting Trial Dates) (Rook, Chad)
January 27, 2020 Filing 221 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (Sixth Supplemental Disclosures) (Rook, Chad)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting in part #218 Motion to Continue. Trial in this cause is SET for March 2, 2020 before Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/24/2020. (gsg)
January 23, 2020 Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re #218 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting & Extend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
January 21, 2020 Filing 218 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting & Extend Pretrial Deadlines by Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
January 21, 2020 Filing 217 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC (First Amended Rule 26(a)(3) Pre-Trial Disclosures) (Adamson, R.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 216 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Butler America, LLC (Supplement to Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order) (Adamson, R.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 215 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental Sur-Reply to Frontier's Supplemental Reply) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB, #3 Exhibit CC, #4 Exhibit DD, #5 Exhibit EE)(Rook, Chad)
December 27, 2019 Filing 214 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental) filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dave Teddy Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Rubin Stokes Deposition Transcript Excerpts)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #182 Motion to Take Deposition from Dave Teddy; granting #199 Motion for Leave to Supplement Discovery Responses; granting #203 Supplement Initial and Pretrial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/12/2019. (gsg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 212 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #181 MOTION to Sever Partially-Unopposed Motion for Severance filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
November 12, 2019 Filing 211 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #182 MOTION to Take Deposition from Dave Teddy for Trial filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
November 11, 2019 Filing 210 RESPONSE in Opposition re #199 MOTION for Leave to Supplement and/or Amend Written Discovery Responses (Partially Opposed) filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
November 7, 2019 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #181 MOTION to Sever Partially-Unopposed Motion for Severance filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
November 5, 2019 Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion re #182 MOTION to Take Deposition from Dave Teddy for Trial filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
November 5, 2019 Filing 207 Exhibit List (First Amended) by Loco Brands, LLC.. (Rook, Chad)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury Selection set for 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/1/2019. (gsg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 205 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Loco Brands, LLC (Fifth Amended). (Rook, Chad)
October 31, 2019 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 MOTION to Sever Partially-Unopposed Motion for Severance filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
October 30, 2019 Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement Initial and Pretrial Disclosures by Butler America, LLC. (Adamson, R.)
October 29, 2019 Filing 202 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (Fifth Supplemental & Additional Disclosures) (Rook, Chad)
October 28, 2019 Filing 201 RESPONSE to Motion re #182 MOTION to Take Deposition from Dave Teddy for Trial filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
October 28, 2019 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re #190 MOTION in Limine , #183 MOTION in Limine filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
October 28, 2019 Filing 199 MOTION for Leave to Supplement and/or Amend Written Discovery Responses (Partially Opposed) by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
October 28, 2019 Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION in Limine filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 23, 2019 Filing 197 RESPONSE to Motion re #182 MOTION to Take Deposition from Dave Teddy for Trial filed by Butler America, LLC. (Adamson, R.)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #179 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Olin Trey Hebert, III and Attorney Michael Simons are withdrawn as counsel for Butler America LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/22/19. (leh, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting-in-Part Defendants' #155 Motion to Continue Trial Setting and Extend Pretrial Deadlines, and Denying as Moot the Defendants' #180 Motion to Stay Further Trial Proceedings. Parties shall submit a new Docket Control Order with the dates outlined in this Order. It is further ORDERED that Direct TEK and Butler provide expedited objection to Defendant Frontier's #182 Motion for Leave to Depose Dave Teddy within 7 days of receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/22/19.(leh, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 194 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #183 MOTION in Limine .. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC re #190 MOTION in Limine Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine (Durkin, Marcia)
October 21, 2019 Filing 192 Proposed Jury Instructions by Butler America, LLC. (Durkin, Marcia)
October 21, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC Butler America's Objections to Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosure of Exhibits (Durkin, Marcia)
October 21, 2019 Filing 190 MOTION in Limine by Butler America, LLC. (Durkin, Marcia)
October 21, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC Proposed General Verdict Form with Interrogatories (Joint) (Durkin, Marcia)
October 21, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC (Plaintiff's Objections to Pretrial Disclosure of Exhibits) (Rook, Chad)
October 21, 2019 Filing 187 MOTION in Limine by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
October 21, 2019 Filing 186 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Butler's Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Frontier's Witness List, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Depo Desigs, #5 Exhibit E - Butler's Depo Desigs, #6 Exhibit F - Frontier's Depo Desigs, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #8 Exhibit H - Butler's Exhibit List, #9 Exhibit I - Frontier's Exhibit List)(Rook, Chad)
October 21, 2019 Filing 185 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #184 Proposed Jury Instructions.. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2019 Filing 184 Proposed Jury Instructions by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2019 Filing 183 MOTION in Limine by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 18, 2019 Filing 182 MOTION to Take Deposition from Dave Teddy for Trial by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sworn Statement of Dave Teddy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 17, 2019 Filing 181 MOTION to Sever Partially-Unopposed Motion for Severance by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 17, 2019 Filing 180 Joint MOTION to Stay Further Trial Proceedings and, MOTION to Continue Trial Pending Dispositive U.S. Supreme Court Decision by Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 16, 2019 Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael Simons and Olin (Trey) Ray Hebert, III as Counsel for Butler America, LLC by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC re #174 Order (Durkin, Marcia)
October 11, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC re #174 Order (Plaintiff's Notice) (Rook, Chad)
October 11, 2019 Filing 176 RESPONSE to #174 Order filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Leave to File Objections to Deposition Designations. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/10/2019. (gsg)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDERED that by Friday October 11, 2019, each party file a notice with the Court as to whether the parties need additional time to prepare for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/8/2019. (gsg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (Fourth Supplemental) (Rook, Chad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Deposition Designations (Rook, Chad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Objections to Deposition Designations by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting (Bell, Ryan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations and Rebuttal Designations (Durkin, Marcia)
October 7, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation Rebuttal Designations and Objections to Portions of Depositions Designated by Plaintiff (Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 4, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC Pretrial Disclosures (Durkin, Marcia)
October 4, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation Pretrial Disclosures Statement (Johnson, Jacqueline)
October 4, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC of Filing Plaintiff's First Amended Pretrial Disclosures (Rook, Chad)
October 4, 2019 Filing 164 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rook, Chad)
October 4, 2019 Filing 163 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(a) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rook, Chad)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall exchange their Pretrial Disclosures by October 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/1/2019. (gsg)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying #139 Motion to Strike affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/1/2019. (gsg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC of Filing Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosures (Rook, Chad)
September 30, 2019 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re #155 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting and Extend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
September 27, 2019 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(a) filed by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nab Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Crawford Deposition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Acosta Deposition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Acosta DX 04, #5 Exhibit 5 - Gorman Deposition)(Simons, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Disclosures by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Ryan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #147 Motion to Seal; granting #148 Motion to Seal signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/27/2019. (ksd)
September 27, 2019 Filing 155 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting and Extend Pretrial Deadlines by Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
September 27, 2019 Filing 154 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit h - Michael Crawford Dep Excerpts, #2 Exhibit I - Susan Nab Dep Excerpts, #3 Exhibit J - Butler 30(b)(6) Dep Excerpts)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
September 24, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by R. Jeremy Adamson on behalf of Butler America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7449658. (Adamson, R.) (Main Document 153 replaced on 9/25/2019 listing appropriate parties represented) (jmv, ).
September 24, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marcia Fuller Durkin on behalf of Butler America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7449642. (Durkin, Marcia) Modified on 9/24/2019 (jmv, ). (Main Document 152 replaced on 9/25/2019 -listing appropriate parties represented) (jmv, ).
September 24, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ryan B. Bell on behalf of Butler America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7449619. (Bell, Ryan) Modified on 9/24/2019 (jmv, ). (Main Document 151 replaced on 9/25/2019 - listing appropriate parties represented) (jmv, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 150 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #140 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
September 20, 2019 Filing 149 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(a) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Errata J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
September 20, 2019 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Frontier Communications Corporation's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
September 20, 2019 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Butler America, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
September 18, 2019 Filing 146 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing (telephonic) held on 9/18/2019 re #139 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Michael Crawford filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Court Reporter L Hardwick/ECRO.) (leh, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 145 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Michael Crawford filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER SETTING A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/13/2019. (gsg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Michael Crawford filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - August 27, 2019 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - August 27, 2019 Email to M. Crawford, #3 Exhibit 3 - August 29, 2019 Email to M. Crawford, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sept. 3. 2019 Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
September 4, 2019 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re #139 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Michael Crawford filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
August 30, 2019 Filing 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rule 56(a) by Butler America, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hebert Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Simons, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sworn Statement of Cort Petterson, #2 Exhibit B - Frontier 30(b)(6) Dep Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Direct TEK 30(b)(6) Dep Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Rubin Stokes Dep Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - Sworn Statement of Dave Teddy, #6 Exhibit F - Susan Nap Dep Excerpts, #7 Exhibit G - Butler 30(b)(6) Dep Excerpts, #8 Exhibit Amber Pyramid v. Buffington Harbor, #9 Exhibit Contemporary Personnel v. Godiva, #10 Exhibit Hall v. Cont'l Airlines, #11 Exhibit James v. Parish, #12 Exhibit McClain v. Avis Rent A Car, #13 Exhibit Miller v. Metrocare Servs, #14 Exhibit Obey v. Frisco Med. Ctr, #15 Exhibit White Glove v. Methodist Hosps. of Dallas, #16 Exhibit White v. Denton Cnty, #17 Exhibit Wolf v. Cowgirl Tuff, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
August 21, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Michael Crawford by Frontier Communications Corporation. Responses due by 9/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5/30/19 Deposition of E. Acosta, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition Served Upon M. Crawford, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence Between C. Kaiser & M. Crawford, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
August 20, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation of Related Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petitioner's Rule 45 Motion, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Casey Kaiser)(Kaiser, Casey)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 FOURTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Selection set for 11/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Jury Trial set for 11/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/22/2019. (gsg)
July 18, 2019 Filing 136 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Loco Brands, LLC (Agreed Fourth Amended). (Rook, Chad)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying as moot #125 Motion to Continue and Enforce Prior Order; granting in part and denying in part #126 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/11/2019. (gsg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2019 re #126 Opposed MOTION to Continue (Opposed, in Part, Motion for Relief from Docket Control Order and to Adjourn Trial) filed by Frontier Communications Corporation, and #125 MOTION to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline in Order to Allow Parties to Complete Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Depositions and Motion to Enforce Prior Order (Dkt. No. 105) re #105 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for S filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Court Reporter L Hardwick/ECRO.) (leh, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING Butlers Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically (Doc. No. 129); denying as moot #131 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/8/2019. (gsg)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE OF HEARING (RESET) re #125 MOTION to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline in Order to Allow Parties to Complete Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Depositions and Motion to Enforce Prior Order (Dkt. No. 105):Motion Hearing re-set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (leh, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE to Motion re #125 MOTION to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline in Order to Allow Parties to Complete Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Depositions and Motion to Enforce Prior Order (Dkt. No. 105) re #105 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for S filed by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically re #127 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
July 3, 2019 Filing 130 RESPONSE to Motion re #125 MOTION to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline in Order to Allow Parties to Complete Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Depositions and Motion to Enforce Prior Order (Dkt. No. 105) re #105 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for S filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 16, 2018 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel regarding Preliminary List of Topics, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Frontier Communications Corp., #3 Exhibit C - July 1, 2019 Letter from Defendant Frontier Communications Corp.'s Counsel Objecting to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice)(Johnson, Jacqueline) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #4 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #126 Opposed MOTION to Continue (Opposed, in Part, Motion for Relief from Docket Control Order and to Adjourn Trial) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #125 MOTION to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. ORDERED that the current dispositive motion deadline of July 3, 2019, is STAYED. EXPEDITED RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANTS AND PLANTIFFS DUE BY 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/2/2019. (gsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 126 Opposed MOTION to Continue (Opposed, in Part, Motion for Relief from Docket Control Order and to Adjourn Trial) by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Casey Kaiser)(Johnson, Jacqueline) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline in Order to Allow Parties to Complete Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Depositions and Motion to Enforce Prior Order (Dkt. No. 105) re #105 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 124 Original ANSWER to #121 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Loco Brands, LLC.(Rook, Chad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 123 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by Frontier Communications Corporation.(Johnson, Jacqueline)
June 13, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Frontier Communications Corporation to 2/21/2019. 9 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
June 13, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Application for Extension of time, Entry #120 submitted. Incorrect Format. See Entry #122 for Corrected Filing. (gsg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 122 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Frontier Communications Corporation.( Johnson, Jacqueline) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #1 Corrected Application) (gsg, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 121 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Loco Brands, LLC by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement)(Simons, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 120 ***DEFICIENT FILING. SEE ENTRY #122 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Joint Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation.( Johnson, Jacqueline) Modified on 6/13/2019 (gsg).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #95 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Direct TEKs and Frontiers objections are OVERRULED and that the Magistrate Judges Report (Docket No. 95) is ADOPTED as the opinion of this Court. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 5/29/2019. (gsg)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/23/2019. (gsg)
April 18, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation re #116 Order on Motion to Take Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Modified Docket Control Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #112 Motion to Take Deposition from former Direct TEK Techs, and Eurie Acosta. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/15/2019. (gsg)
April 5, 2019 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION to Take Deposition from Michael Crawford, John Slater, Eric Moorehead and Reopen Deposition of Eurie Acosta filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Supplemental and Additional Disclosures of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - Third Supplemental and Additional Disclosures of Plaintiff)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
April 1, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (Third Supplemental) (Rook, Chad)
March 29, 2019 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion re #112 MOTION to Take Deposition from Michael Crawford, John Slater, Eric Moorehead and Reopen Deposition of Eurie Acosta filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
March 21, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION to Take Deposition from Michael Crawford, John Slater, Eric Moorehead and Reopen Deposition of Eurie Acosta by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
March 5, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Casey Kaiser on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7165716. (Kaiser, Casey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Laura A. Lindner on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7165251. (Lindner, Laura)
February 22, 2019 Filing 109 RESPONSE to #106 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
February 18, 2019 Filing 108 RESPONSE to #103 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
February 18, 2019 Filing 107 RESPONSE to #103 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 106 OBJECTION to #95 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #53 Motion to continue; granting in part and denying in part #54 Motion to continue; withdrawing #86 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #89 Motion to continue; denying as moot #99 motion for extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/8/2019. (gsg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2019 re #53 MOTION to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance filed by Loco Brands, LLC, #54 Amended MOTION Motion to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (leh, )
February 6, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Response to Non-Motion, Docket Entry #101 . Incorrect Docket Event. Please disregard and see Entry #103 for corrected filing. (gsg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 103 OBJECTION to #95 Report and Recommendations by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rook, Chad)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part #99 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #92 Sealed Response to Motion. Responses due by 2/7/2019 at 2:00 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/4/2019. (gsg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 101 ***DEFICIENT FILING. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT. SEE ENTRY #103 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** RESPONSE to #95 Report and Recommendations, (Objections to Report and Recommendations) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rook, Chad) Modified on 2/6/2019 (gsg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lee Ina Correa on behalf of Loco Brands, LLC (Correa, Lee)
February 1, 2019 Filing 99 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #92 Sealed Response to Motion, by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Mark)
January 31, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing (RE-SET) on #54 Amended MOTION Motion to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance , #89 Opposed MOTION for Continuance to Respond to Defendant Frontier's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permit Discovery (Rule 56(d)), #53 MOTION to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance : Motion Hearing re-set for 2/7/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (leh, )
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions #54 Amended MOTION Motion to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance , #89 Opposed MOTION for Continuance to Respond to Defendant Frontier's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permit Discovery (Rule 56(d)), #53 MOTION to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance . Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/31/2019. (gsg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 Opposed MOTION for Continuance to Respond to Defendant Frontier's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permit Discovery (Rule 56(d)) filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Leave to File under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/30/2019. (gsg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Butler America, LLC, #67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. The Court RECOMMENDS GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART Doc #67 and Doc #69 . Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/28/2019. (gsg)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER WITHDRAWING #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Butler America, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/25/2019. (gsg)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE re #89 Opposed MOTION for Continuance to Respond to Defendant Frontier's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permit Discovery (Rule 56(d)) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. ORDERED that Defendant Frontier Communications Corporation file an expedited response to Plaintiffs Motion for Continuance no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, January 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/25/2019. (gsg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 92 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
January 25, 2019 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Response to Defendant Frontier's Motion for Summary Judgment by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
January 23, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment (Simons, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 89 Opposed MOTION for Continuance to Respond to Defendant Frontier's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permit Discovery (Rule 56(d)) by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Affidavit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Second Amended Docket Control Order. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Selection set for 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/8/2019. (gsg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 87 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER [94}*** MOTION for Summary Judgment by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Olin (Trey) Hebert, III, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael) Modified on 1/25/2019 (gsg).
January 4, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sworn Statement of Cort Petterson, #2 Exhibit B - Sworn Statement of Dave Teddy, #3 Exhibit C - Sworn Statement of Mark A. Flores, #4 Exhibit D - Sworn Statement of Robert Todd Brooks, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline)
January 4, 2019 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 84 REPORT of Mediation Mediation result: Impasse(gsg)
December 28, 2018 Filing 83 Rebuttal Witness List by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Flores, Mark)
December 28, 2018 Filing 82 Trial Witness List by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER striking #80 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Court STRIKES this motion for failure to comply with the local rules. LEAD COUNSEL is ORDEREDto have a telephonic meet and confer prior to filing a new motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/26/2018. (gsg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 80 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #81 *** Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #64 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2018 (gsg).
December 21, 2018 Filing 79 Second Trial Witness List by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Flores, Mark)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE that the TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for Friday, December 14, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. has been moved to Friday, December 14, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. (srb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING set for Friday, December 14, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss mediation. The Plaintiff is to provide the parties and the Court at Sharon_Baum@txed.uscourts.gov with a conference call in number no later than December 14, 2018 at 12:00 P.M. (srb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 77 Case Reassigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to the case. (rlf)
December 11, 2018 Filing 76 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6), #67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
December 7, 2018 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
December 6, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference set for 12/19/2018 AT 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/29/2018. (gsg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
November 27, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC re #55 Amended Complaint (Supplement to Second Amended Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rook, Chad)
November 26, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Butler America, LLC. Responses due by 12/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REFERRING CASE to MEDIATION. Mediator Judge Love appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/26/2018. (saenz, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 Amended MOTION Motion to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance (Reply to Both Defendants' Responses) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
November 21, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC (Joint Notice of Agreement to Mediate and Request that Judge John Love be Appointed as Mediator) (Rook, Chad)
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (gsg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2018. Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/19/2018. (gsg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance filed by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 Amended MOTION Motion to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Flores, Mark)
November 14, 2018 Filing 61 Amended Trial Witness List by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
November 13, 2018 Filing 60 Trial Witness List by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad)
November 13, 2018 Filing 59 Trial Witness List by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 58 Trial Witness List by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Flores, Mark)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: #17 Motion to Dismiss-MOOT; #18 Motion to Dismiss-MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/13/2018. (saenz, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #43 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Mark)
November 12, 2018 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation, filed by Loco Brands, LLC.(Rook, Chad)
November 12, 2018 Filing 54 Amended MOTION Motion to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
November 2, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Compel, Motion for Brief Extension of Document Production and Discovery Deadlines, and Alternative Motion for Continuance by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
October 17, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (Second Supplemental) (Rook, Chad)
October 16, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE by Butler America, LLC Designation of Experts (Simons, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC (Plaintiff's Designation of Experts) (Rook, Chad)
August 3, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Frontier Communications Corporation (Flores, Mark)
July 30, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Butler America, LLC (Simons, Michael)
July 27, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (1st Supplemental and Additional Disclosures) (Rook, Chad)
July 13, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Frontier Communications Corporation (Johnson, Jacqueline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Loco Brands, LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Rook, Chad)
July 13, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Butler America, LLC (Simons, Michael)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Selection set for 3/18/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/31/18. (mll, )
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/31/18. (mll, )
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 E-DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/31/18. (mll, )
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/31/18. (mll, )
May 30, 2018 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order)(Simons, Michael)
May 29, 2018 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Scheduling Conference held on 5/29/2018. (Court Reporter L Hardwick.) (leh, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER terminating as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/21/18. (mll, )
May 18, 2018 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Docket Control Order)(Simons, Michael)
May 14, 2018 Scheduling Conference reset for 5/29/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Modify Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference in this matter is rescheduled to 5-29-2018, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall submit an up-to-date Docket Control Order and Discovery Order, taken from the undersigned's website, an agreed order related to the discovery and production of electronically stored information (ESI) and a Protective Order no later than 9:00 a.m. ten days prior to the scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/14/18. (mll, )
May 14, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #34 Additional Attachment submitted by Butler America, LLC. Please disregard this docket entry. (mll, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 34 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: #33 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order .. (Simons, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mll, ).
May 11, 2018 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ).
May 11, 2018 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Regarding Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mll, ).
May 11, 2018 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mll, ).
May 11, 2018 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mll, ).
May 9, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order re #22 Order, Set Hearings by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
May 4, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by Frontier Communications Corporation Certificate of Interested Parties (Johnson, Jacqueline)
May 4, 2018 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Frontier Communications Corporation identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
April 30, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by Loco Brands, LLC (Certificate of Interested Parties) (Rook, Chad)
April 24, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael)
April 24, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #24 Response in Support. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED AS REPLY TO RESPONSE.*** (mjc, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***RESPONSE in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2018 (mjc, ).
April 24, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 5/22/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/20/18. (mll, )
April 17, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ).
April 17, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Rook, Chad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ).
April 13, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Loco Brands, LLC (Rook, Chad)
April 4, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
April 4, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jacqueline) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2018: #2 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ).
April 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline Carol Johnson on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation (Johnson, Jacqueline)
March 27, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)
March 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Ellis Dobbs on behalf of Loco Brands, LLC (Dobbs, David)
March 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Porter on behalf of Loco Brands, LLC (Porter, Gregory)
March 21, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation, filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rook, Chad)
March 15, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Frontier Communications Corporation to 3/26/2018. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Frontier Communications Corporation.( Flores, Mark)
March 14, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Butler America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Butler America Holdings, Inc. for Butler America, LLC. (Simons, Michael)
March 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Butler America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
March 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Olin Trey Hebert, III on behalf of Butler America, LLC (Hebert, Olin)
March 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Simons on behalf of Butler America, LLC (Simons, Michael)
February 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loco Brands, LLC. Frontier Communications Corporation served on 2/21/2018, answer due 3/14/2018. (mjc, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loco Brands, LLC. Butler America, LLC served on 2/21/2018, answer due 3/14/2018. (mjc, )
February 15, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation, and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Frontier Communications)(mll, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Scott Davis on behalf of Loco Brands, LLC (Davis, Robert)
February 13, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
February 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (rlf)
February 13, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Loco Brands, LLC. (rlf)
February 13, 2018 District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (rlf)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Original) against Butler America, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6658935.), filed by Loco Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rook, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loco Brands, LLC v. Frontier Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler America, LLC
Represented By: Ryan B. Bell
Represented By: Olin Trey Hebert, III
Represented By: R. Jeremy Adamson
Represented By: Michael Simons
Represented By: Jacqueline Carol Johnson
Represented By: Mark Anthony Flores
Represented By: Marcia Fuller Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Communications Corporation
Represented By: Laura A. Lindner
Represented By: Jacqueline Carol Johnson
Represented By: Mark Anthony Flores
Represented By: Casey Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loco Brands, LLC d/b/a Direct Tek
Represented By: Gregory Scott Porter
Represented By: Chad Carlton Rook
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Represented By: David Ellis Dobbs
Represented By: Lee Ina Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?