Enge v. The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity et al
Plaintiff: Joel Enge
Defendant: The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, Texas Equal Access Fund and The Afiya Center
Case Number: 6:2020cv00447
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to remand and DENIES Plaintiff's fee request. It is ORDERED that this case be REMANDED to Smith County, Texas. All pending motions in this case are DENIED AS MOOT without prejudice to being reasserted, as necessary, in the state court. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 09/16/20. (mll, )
September 16, 2020 ***This civil action will be remanded to state court on or after 10-07-2020 per Local Rule CV-83(b)*** (mll, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O'Connor Order)(Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Joel Enge. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. If the Court denies Plaintiff's motion to remand, then Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be due within 14 days of that order. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 08/25/20. (mll, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Joel Enge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ecklund, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Joel Enge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hartson Dustin Fillmore, III on behalf of Joel Enge (Fillmore, Hartson)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity Notice of Related Cases (Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, filed by Joel Enge. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition")(mll, )
August 17, 2020 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
August 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
August 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. Bryan Hughes on behalf of Joel Enge (Hughes, D.)
August 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F Mitchell on behalf of Joel Enge (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity (Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity Certificate of Interested Parties and Entities (Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 State Court Records Filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity Index of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit C - Original Petition, #3 Exhibit D - Request for Citations, #4 Exhibit E - Citations)(Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Afiya Center, Texas Equal Access Fund, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity from 241st District Court, Smith County, Texas, case number 20-1581-C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7947119), filed by The Afiya Center, Texas Equal Access Fund, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Index of Documents, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Original Petition, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Request for Issuance of Citations, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - Citations)(Ecklund, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enge v. The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity
Represented By: Jennifer Rudenick Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Equal Access Fund
Represented By: Jennifer Rudenick Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Afiya Center
Represented By: Jennifer Rudenick Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Enge
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: Hartson Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: D. Bryan Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?