Bagby v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Curtis Wayne Bagby
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2020cv00458
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is recommended that the above-styled habeas corpus action be dismissed, without prejudice, for Petitioner's failure to comply with an order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/13/20. (mll, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/21/20. (mll, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curtis Wayne Bagby. (mll, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Petitioner has 30 days from receipt of this order to either pay the $5 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, together with a certified in forma pauperis data sheet. Petitioner has 30 days from receipt of the blank, standardized section 2254 form that was sent to him on 8-19-2020 to fill it out in full and return it to the Court. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of the lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/20/20. (mll, )
August 19, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Curtis Wayne Bagby.(mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagby v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Wayne Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?