Parity Networks, LLC v. Fortinet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Parity Networks, LLC
Defendant: Fortinet, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00138
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #9 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fortinet, Inc. to 6/18/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant)( mll, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Parity Networks, LLC.( Schmid, Daniel)
April 19, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #8 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fortinet, Inc. to 6/3/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant)( mll, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Parity Networks, LLC.( Schmid, Daniel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parity Networks, LLC. Fortinet, Inc. served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Schmid, Daniel)
April 12, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
April 9, 2021 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Fortinet, Inc. (ndc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Louis Schmid on behalf of Parity Networks, LLC (Schmid, Daniel)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G Price on behalf of Parity Networks, LLC (Price, Adam)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Parity Networks, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fortinet, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8349110.), filed by Parity Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(DiNovo, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parity Networks, LLC v. Fortinet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortinet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parity Networks, LLC
Represented By: Adam G Price
Represented By: Andrew Gerald DiNovo
Represented By: Daniel Louis Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?