Perritt v. Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Adam Blake Perritt
Defendant: Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc., CPI Insurance Company a/k/a Cobra Professional, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana, CPI Insurance Company, Orr Motors of Shreveport, Inc, Lousiana Health Service and Indemnity Company, PAC and Cobra Professional, Inc
Case Number: 6:2021cv00146
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant CPI Insurance Company A/K/A Cobra Professional, Inc. by Adam Blake Perritt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissing Defendant CPI Insurance Company A/K/A Cobra Professional, Inc. Without Prejudice)(O'Kelly, Nicholas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana a/k/a Louisiana Health Service and Indemnity Company, PAC, filed by Adam Blake Perritt.(O'Kelly, Nicholas)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CPI Insurance Company.( James, Kindall)
May 13, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CPI Insurance Company to 6/14/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc..(Elliott, Jeffrey)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DESIGNATING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 04/21/21. (mll, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to CPI Insurance Company a/k/a Cobra Professional, Inc. and Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ndc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Persons (O'Kelly, Nicholas) Modified on 4/21/2021 (mll, ).
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CPI Insurance Company a/k/a Cobra Professional, Inc., Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8365014.), filed by Adam Blake Perritt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Info Cover Sheet)(O'Kelly, Nicholas)
April 19, 2021 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
April 19, 2021 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the courts local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, )
April 19, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
April 19, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Adam Blake Perritt. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perritt v. Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Adam Blake Perritt
Represented By: Nicholas Alban O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Orr Auto Collection, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPI Insurance Company a/k/a Cobra Professional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPI Insurance Company
Represented By: Kindall Chauffe James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orr Motors of Shreveport, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lousiana Health Service and Indemnity Company, PAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobra Professional, Inc
Represented By: Kindall Chauffe James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?