State of Texas, et al v. Richter, et al
Plaintiff: State of Texas and Texas Health and Human Services Commission
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Elizabeth Richter, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 6:2021cv00191
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission. Elizabeth Richter served on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Olson, Leif)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Olson, Leif)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services served on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Olson, Leif)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission. Xavier Becerra served on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Olson, Leif)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 6/1/2021, answer due 7/31/2021. (Olson, Leif)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leif A Olson on behalf of State of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission (Olson, Leif)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Elizabeth Richter, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(ndc)
May 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lanora C. Pettit on behalf of State of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission (Pettit, Lanora)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8411844.), filed by State Of Texas, Texas Health and Human Services Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Lanora C. Pettit, #3 Declaration of James Frank, #4 Declaration of Lois Kolkhurst, #5 Declaration of Victoria Grady, #6 Declaration of Brittani Bilse)(Stone, Judd)
May 14, 2021 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, )
May 14, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
May 14, 2021 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, ) Modified on 5/17/2021 (mll, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas, et al v. Richter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Judd E Stone, II
Represented By: Lanora C. Pettit
Represented By: Leif A Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Health and Human Services Commission
Represented By: Judd E Stone, II
Represented By: Lanora C. Pettit
Represented By: Leif A Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?