Re: Smith County
Petitioner: Smith County
Respondent: Kerry Max Cook
Case Number: 6:2021cv00232
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Response to Non-Motion Petition to Perpetuate Testimony filed by City of Tyler, Texas, Eddie Clark, Eric Liptak. (Dollahite, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Keith Dollahite on behalf of City of Tyler, Texas, Eddie Clark, Eric Liptak (Dollahite, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Response to Non-Motion (Petitioner's Reply to Respondent Cook's Response to Petition to Perpetuate Testimony) filed by Smith County. (Rook, Chad)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to SMITH COUNTY, TEXAS PETITION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY filed by Kerry Max Cook. (Hamilton, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anand Swaminathan on behalf of Kerry Max Cook. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8466794. (Swaminathan, Anand)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Danielle Hamilton on behalf of Kerry Max Cook. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8466782. (Hamilton, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Roshna Bala Keen on behalf of Kerry Max Cook. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8466762. (Keen, Roshna)
June 11, 2021 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petitioner Smith County's Verified Petition to Perpetuate Testimony) against Smith County ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8450114.), filed by Smith County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rook, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Re: Smith County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Smith County
Represented By: Chad Carlton Rook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kerry Max Cook
Represented By: Anand Swaminathan
Represented By: Danielle Hamilton
Represented By: Roshna Bala Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?