Kennemer v. UTMB Medical et al
Plaintiff: John David Kennemer
Defendant: UTMB Medical, Warden Unknown Upshaw, Brant Cain, Dr Unknown Almari and Dr Unknown Helt
Case Number: 6:2021cv00266
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by TDCJ Business and Finance as to #10 Order. (gsg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John David Kennemer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(wea, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by John David Kennemer as to #10 Order. (Received 08/17/2021) (wea, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by TDCJ Inmate Trust Fund as to #10 Order. Received 8/16/2021. (ndc)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the relevant personnel at TDCJ-CID shall investigate whether Plaintiff has properly requested or otherwise has access to a certified copy of his inmate trust account. The findings of this investigation shall be furnished to the Court and the Plaintiff within 30 days of the date of receipt of this order. The Plaintiff shall thereupon have 20 days in which to respond to such findings. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/10/2021. (mll, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel by John David Kennemer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Envelope(s))(mll, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by John David Kennemer as to #5 Order. Received 7/16/2021. (ndc)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from John Kennemer (gsg)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Plaintiff has 30 days from receipt of this order to either pay the $402 filing fee or submit his certified IFP data sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/12/21. (mll, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John David Kennemer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(mll, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John David Kennemer. (mll, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Almari, Brant Cain, Unknown Helt, UTMB Medical, Unknown Upshaw, filed by John David Kennemer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope(s))(mll, )
July 9, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennemer v. UTMB Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Kennemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTMB Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Unknown Upshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brant Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Unknown Almari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Unknown Helt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?