Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange v. Omega Flex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00269
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Smith County 114th Judicial District Court as to #6 Order of Remand. (gsg)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Omega Flex, Inc. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 8/11/2021. (gsg)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Karen Stubblefield)(Hazan-Cohen, Marcos)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Omega Flex, Inc..(Matthews, Melissa)
July 14, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Omega Flex, Inc., filed by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition")(mll, )
July 13, 2021 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
July 13, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (mll, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Omega Flex, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Omega Flex, Inc. from 114th Judicial District Court, Smith County, Texas, case number 21-0959-B. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8492117), filed by Omega Flex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Citation)(Matthews, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange v. Omega Flex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Represented By: Marcos Alfredo Hazan-Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?