Ward v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Clinton Ryan Ward
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2021cv00283
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Order, by Clinton Ryan Ward. (gsg)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Clinton Ryan Ward on 9/3/2021 as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (gsg)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clinton Ryan Ward. ORDERED that Petitioner shall file a response on or before October 29, 2021, explaining his ineffective assistance of counsel claim in light of Strickland. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/31/2021. (gsg)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/17/2021. (mll, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clinton Ryan Ward. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(wea, )
August 6, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 5, receipt number 6-57664 (gsg)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Clinton Ryan Ward as to #5 Order. Received 8/2/2021. (ndc)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Petitioner has 30 days from receipt of this order to either pay the $5 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, together with an in forma pauperis data sheet. The Clerk shall not accept any other documents in this case, except for a motion for an extension of time, until Petitioner complies with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/26/21. (mll, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
July 26, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, )
July 20, 2021 Case transferred in from Sherman Division on 07/20/2021; Case Number 4:21-cv-540. (mll, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. It is accordingly ORDERED that the Petitioner's case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/20/2021. (daj, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (411th District Court, Smith County, Texas No. 114-1506-18), filed by Clinton Ryan Ward. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope(s))(daj, )
July 19, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to petitioner. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clinton Ryan Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?