Taylor v. Bowman
Petitioner: Michael Ulysses Taylor
Respondent: Senior Warden Jimmy Bowman
Case Number: 6:2021cv00285
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Ulysses Taylor on 8/30/2021 as to #6 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition - State. (gsg)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE by Jimmy Bowman through the Attorney General for the State of Texas regarding #6 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition - State, by Laura Haney on 08/23/2021. Show Cause Response due by 10/4/2021. (mll, )
August 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HABEAS PETITION - STATE. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondent shall have 40 days in which to show cause why the writ should not be granted or to otherwise plead. Copy of order to Edward Marshall and Laura Haney via electronic noticing including petition and any supporting documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/21/2021. (mll, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Ulysses Taylor as to #3 Order. Received 8/6/2021. (ndc)
July 29, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 5, receipt number 6-57564 (gsg)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner shall have until 9-08-2021 in which to either pay the statutory $5.00 filing fee, or furnish an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis which is accompanied by a properly certified in forma pauperis data sheet or inmate account record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/20/2021. (mll, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (jbe, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Ulysses Taylor.(jbe, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2021: #1 Envelope(s)) (jbe, ).
July 21, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge.Consent has been mailed to Petitioner. (jbe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Ulysses Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Senior Warden Jimmy Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?