Atkins v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: John Louis Atkins
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2021cv00306
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT. All claims in the matter are dismissed without prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot, and a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 9/17/2021. (ndc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #5 Report and Recommendations. This case is dismissed without prejudice to petitioner's ability to seek authorization from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit to proceed with a second or successive habeas petition under 2244. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 9/17/2021. (ndc)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by John Louis Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter/Envelope)(gsg)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by John Louis Atkins as to #5 Report and Recommendations. Received 8/26/2021. (ndc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed without prejudice to Petitioner's ability to re-file his petition when and if he obtains authorization under Section 2244(b)(3). The undersigned further recommends that a COA from such dismissal be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/11/2021. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer if Deemed a Second or Successive Petition by John Louis Atkins. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Louis Atkins. (mll, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Louis Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope(s))(mll, )
August 9, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Louis Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?