McRoy v. Lumpkin
Petitioner: Danny Leon McRoy
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 6:2021cv00311
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Danny Leon McRoy as to #8 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition - State. (received 09/14/2021) (wea, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Georgette Dudly Hogarth on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin (Hogarth, Georgette)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/16/2021. (gsg)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danny Leon McRoy. (Attachments: #1 Financial Data Sheet)(gsg)
September 9, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Laura Haney on 9/9/2021 as to #8 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition - State. (gsg)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HABEAS PETITION - STATE. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Copy of order to Edward Marshall and Laura Haney via electronic noticing including petition and any supporting documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/8/2021. (gsg)
September 7, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 6-58001 (mll, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Danny Leon McRoy as to #6 Order. Received 8/24/2021. (ndc)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Petitioner is GRANTED an additional 30 days in which to submit the $5.00 filing fee or to file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis along with a properly certified TDCJ data sheet. Petitioner shall do so no later than 9-15-2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/12/2021. (mll, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-02590. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE - the Clerk is ORDERED to TRANSFER this action tothe United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division, under 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). The petitioner is advised to file all further pleadings and correspondence in the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division, after he receives notice of his new case number. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/11/2021.]
August 11, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, )
August 11, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to ED/TX - Tyler Div. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 8/11/21, filed. (sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/11/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/11/2021.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Danny Leon McRoy.(BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/11/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRoy v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Leon McRoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Represented By: Georgette Dudly Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?