Rodriguez v. Gorsuck et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Alvin Rodriguez
Defendant: Warden Keith Gorsuck, Warden Unknown DeLarosa and Unknown Mares
Case Number: 6:2021cv00335
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $16.00 within 30 days for Phillip Alvin Rodriguez.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/28/2021. (gsg)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of financial data by Phillip Alvin Rodriguez re #1 Complaint, (gsg)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until 10-15-2021, in which to show cause why his complaint should not be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/08/2021. (mll, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until 10-15-2021, in which to either pay the statutory $402.00 filing fee, which is the fee for persons not granted in forma pauperis status, or furnish a properly certified in forma pauperis data sheet or inmate account summary sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/08/2021. (mll, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/08/2021. (mll, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip Alvin Rodriguez. (gsg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Phillip Alvin Rodriguez. (gsg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phillip Alvin Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Grievance Form, #2 Letter from Board of CJ, #3 Memorandum of Facts, #4 Envelope(s))(gsg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #5 Declaration of Phillips Alvin Rodriguez) (gsg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Gorsuck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Alvin Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Keith Gorsuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Unknown DeLarosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?