Cameron et al v. Black et al
Plaintiff: Kala Cameron and Kala Cameron, A/N/F of Z.J., a Minor
Defendant: Michael Anthony Black and Flat Creek Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00336
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Original Complaint against Michael Anthony Black, Flat Creek Transportation, LLC, filed by Kala Cameron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of the U.S. Dist. Court East Dist. of Texas dated Sept. 21, 2021, #2 Exhibit Alabama Secretary of State information for Flat Creek Transportation, LLC)(Ross, Benton)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint & Affirmative Defenses by Michael Anthony Black.(Rucker, Alan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's show cause response due by 10/5/2021. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 9/21/2021. (ndc)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kala Cameron. Michael Anthony Black served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Ross, Benton)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Anthony Black, Flat Creek Transportation, LLC, filed by Kala Cameron.(Ross, Benton)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Michael Anthony Black and Flat Creek Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ndc)
August 26, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (wea, )
August 25, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kala Cameron, Kala Cameron, A/N/F of Z.J., a Minor. (wea, )
August 25, 2021 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (wea, )
August 25, 2021 MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (wea, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Anthony Black, Flat Creek Transportation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8554503.), filed by Kala Cameron, Kala Cameron, A/N/F of Z.J., a Minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ross, Benton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron et al v. Black et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kala Cameron
Represented By: Benton Gaines Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kala Cameron, A/N/F of Z.J., a Minor
Represented By: Benton Gaines Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Black
Represented By: Alan Lawrence Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Creek Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?