Nelson v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Eugene Nelson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 6:2021cv00338
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO RESPOND. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's motion and provide an explanation for why such opposition was not timely filed within seven days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 10/19/2021. (efarris, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) by Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM against Eugene Nelson, filed by Wells Fargo Bank.(Danaher, Philip)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wells Fargo Bank.( Danaher, Philip)
September 7, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #8 Application for Extension of Time submitted by Wells Fargo Bank. Defendant submitted an incorrect document/form. Application must be submitted on the official form found on this Court's website. Correction should be made by one business day. (mll, )
September 7, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #9 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wells Fargo Bank to 9/16/2021. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wells Fargo Bank.( Danaher, Philip) Modified on 9/7/2021 (mll, ).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is directed to Local Rule CV-12 for the proper request regarding extension of time to answer. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 09/02/2021. (mll, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (extend deadline to file answer), by Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip William Danaher on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank (Danaher, Philip)
August 27, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, filed by Eugene Nelson. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Stay of Order to proceed with expedited foreclosure under Tex Rule Civil Procedure 736 in Cause No 2019-163")(mll, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, filed by Eugene Nelson. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition and Stay of Order to Proceed with expedited foreclosure under Tex Rule Civil Procedure 736 in Cause No. 2019-163")(mll, )
August 26, 2021 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 (Cronenwett, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 from District Court 4th Judicial District Rusk County, Texas, case number 2021164. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8555774), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Nelson
Represented By: Robert Clarence Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE1
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Philip William Danaher
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?