Bryant v. Sheriff, Smith County
Petitioner: Justin Keith Bryant
Respondent: Sheriff, Smith County
Case Number: 6:2021cv00487
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Leah Bryant Barnes on 2/3/2022 as to #11 Order. (gsg)
January 31, 2022 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Leah Bryant Barnes as to #5 Order to Show Cause. Received 1/24/2022. (ndc)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Justin Keith Bryant as to #5 Order to Show Cause. Received at EDTX on 1/27/2022. (ndc)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING NEXT FRIEND STATUS re #9 Response to Non-Motion filed by Justin Keith Bryant. ORDERED that, within 30 days of entry of this order, Mr. Bryant must complete, sign, date, and file his own petition for the writ of habeas corpus. ORDERED that the Clerk shall refuse to accept any further filings on behalf of Mr. Bryant in this action that are not signed and submitted by him. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/26/2022. (gsg)
January 24, 2022 Filing 10 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #9 Response to Non-Motion. (Attachments: #1 Medical Information, #2 POA Information)(gsg)
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause, filed by Justin Keith Bryant. (gsg)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/18/2022. (gsg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Petition by Justin Keith Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Letters)(gsg)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDERED that Ms. Bryant-Barnes and/or Justin Keith Bryant must respond within fourteen days of receipt of this order and show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/14/2022. (gsg)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Letter from Leah Bryant-Barnes in regards to Justin Keith Bryant (gsg)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
December 20, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 6-59115 (mll, )
December 20, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Justin Keith Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Sheriff, Smith County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Keith Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff, Smith County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?