Edwards v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Plaintiff: Justin Dontae Edwards
Defendant: Director Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2021cv00489
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the United States Magistrate Judge re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Justin Dontae Edwards. The undersigned recommends that Defendants motion for summary judgment (Dkt. #13) be DENIED as frivolous. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/16/2022. (gsg)
February 14, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Justin Dontae Edwards. (gsg)
January 24, 2022 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Gloria Chandler on 1/24/2022 as to #12 Order to Show Cause. (gsg)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/24/2022. (gsg)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-01160. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, )
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Justin Dontae Edwards. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID.It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause on or before December 31, 2021, explaining why his complaint should not be dismissed as moot. Failure to respond to this order will result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Justin Dontae Edwards (#1877419). Copy routed to Divisional Financial Deputy. It is further ORDERED that Justin Dontae Edwards (#1877419) is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $0. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue summons nor forward summons to the United States Marshal for service on the defendants unless and until directed by further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justin Dontae Edwards. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Justin Dontae Edwards. Plaintiff, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, must submit either the filing fee of $402.00 or must submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Justin Dontae Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dontae Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?