Butler v. Director, TDCJ
Petitioner: Northington Butler
Respondent: Director, TDCJ
Case Number: 6:2021cv00497
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Northington Butler (gsg)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Northington Butler as to #4 Order. Received 1/27/2022. (ndc)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SEVER. ORDERED that Petitioners habeas claims raised in his original petition shall remain pending in Cause No. 6:21cv497. All other claims concerning the conditions of Petitioners confinement in the Michael Unit, as raised in his Motion to Transfer, (Dkt. #5) shall be SEVERED from and terminated as a pending motion in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/27/2022. (gsg)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Custory of Prisoner by Northington Butler. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit - A, #3 Exhibit - B, #4 Cover Letter/Envelope)(gsg)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Northington Butler. ORDERED that Petitioner has 30 days from receipt of this Order to pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a properly supported application to proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/24/2022. (gsg)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Love (gsg)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Northington Butler. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit - A, #3 Cover Letter/Envelope)(gsg)
December 22, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (gsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Director, TDCJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northington Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?