Sandoval v. Director
Defendant: TDCJ Director
Petitioner: Steve John Sandoval
Case Number: 6:2022cv00015
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Steve John Sandoval. (gsg)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Steve John Sandoval as to #3 Order. Received 2/17/2022. (ndc)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steve John Sandoval (gsg)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steve John Sandoval. ORDERED that the Petitioner shall have until March 15, 2022 in which to either: (1) pay the statutory $5.00 filing fee, or (2) furnish an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/1/2022. (gsg)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Love (gsg)
January 20, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (gsg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steve John Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Disciplinary Report, #2 Grievance Forms, #3 Disciplinary Rules, #4 Cover Letter/Envelope)(gsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve John Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDCJ Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?