Williams v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Defendant: Laura Haney
Petitioner: Toby Williams
Respondent: Director Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2022cv00085
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the United States Magistrate Judge re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Toby Williams. It is recommended that the application for the writ of habeas corpus be dismissed with prejudice as to its refiling without permission from the Fifth Circuit, but without prejudice as to its refiling once such permission has been obtained. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/27/2022. (gsg)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/22/2022. (gsg)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Toby Williams. (Attachments: #1 Financial Data Statement, #2 Envelope(s))(gsg)
April 1, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Order of Deficiency by Toby Williams. (gsg)
March 31, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Toby Williams as to #5 Order. Received 3/25/2022. (ndc)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Toby Williams. ORDERED that the Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee, or furnish an ifp application with a data sheet or inmate account record. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/7/2022. (gsg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:22-cv-00213. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE. ORDERED that the above-referenced case is TRANSFERRED to the Tyler Division of the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/4/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/4/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Toby Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/4/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Toby Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?