Wooten v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Wooten
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) and Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)
Not Classified By Court: Donivan Flowers
Case Number: 6:2022cv00409
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case. It is further ORDERED that this cause of action is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED for administrative and statistical purposes. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/23/2023. (gsm)
January 17, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration)(Johnson, Joseph)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR. Donivan Flowers added as Mediator. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/29/2022. (wea, )
December 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Nicholas Wooten Joint Notice of Agreed Upon Mediator (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goudarzi, Joel)
December 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Johnson, Joseph)
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Nicholas Wooten Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosures (Goudarzi, Joel)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court hereby CANCELS the Rule 16 Pretrial Conference set for December 8, 2022. Discovery due by 7/18/2023. Jury instructions and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2023. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/27/2023 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Mediation Completion due by 7/18/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2023. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 12/5/2022. (wea, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Goudarzi, Joel)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2022 AT 10:15 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 10/31/2022. (gsm)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Nicholas Wooten (Goudarzi, Joel)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nicholas Wooten. (Goudarzi, Joel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) (Johnson, Joseph)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. from 114th Judicial District Court of Smith County, Texas, case number 22-2044-B. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9192608), filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Information Pursuant to Local Rule CV-81(c), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Joseph)
October 21, 2022 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (gsm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wooten v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Wooten
Represented By: Marty Leon Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Represented By: Joseph Edward Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)
Represented By: Joseph Edward Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Donivan Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?