Orona v. Gregg County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Encarnacion Orona
Defendant: Gregg County Jail, Gregg County Medical Staff, Maxey Cerliano, Gregg County Sheriff Department, Sgt. Unknown Stadt and Officer Unknown Bradshaw
Case Number: 6:2023cv00491
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/31/2023. (gsm)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #7 Motion for medical records. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/31/2023. (gsm)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jesus Encarnacion Orona. (gsm)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jesus Encarnacion Orona. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Correspondence, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(gsm)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Admin of Inmate Accounts Gregg County Jail as to #3 Order. Received 10/17/2023. (ndc)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION Requesting Court Order for Medical Records by Jesus Encarnacion Orona. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jbe, 6)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by Jesus Encarnacion Orona. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this order to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/10/2023. (gsm)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #1-1) is GRANTED. No partial filing fee shall be assessed. In the event that the Plaintiff subsequently receives deposits in his inmate trust account, the agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis provided the account exceeds $10.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/10/2023. (wea, 6)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge (gsm)
October 3, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (gsm)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jesus Encarnacion Orona. (Attachments: #1 Account Transaction History, #2 Grievance Forms, #3 Correspondence, #4 Envelope/Cover Letter)(gsm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orona v. Gregg County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Encarnacion Orona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg County Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxey Cerliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Unknown Stadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unknown Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?