Holloway v. Gregg County et al
Plaintiff: William Stephan Holloway, Jr.
Defendant: Gregg County, Officer Unknown Martin, Officer Unknown Unknown, Robert Benton and L Martin
Case Number: 6:2023cv00560
Filed: November 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by L Martin identifying Interested Party Texas Association of Counties for L Martin. (O'Donoghue, Robin)
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robin Hill O'Donoghue on behalf of L Martin (O'Donoghue, Robin)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by L Martin.(Davis, Robert)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed L Martin served on 12/11/2023. (wea, 6)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Robin Hill O'Donoghue as to #9 Order to Answer. Received 12/8/2023. (ndc)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by the U.S. Marshal's Office as to #9 Order to Answer, #10 Summons. (wea, 6).
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to L Martin and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service. (wea, 6)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO ANSWER AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The Clerk shall issue process and the Defendant Martin shall have thirty (30) days from the date of receipt of this order in which to answer or otherwise plead to the Plaintiff's complaint. The Court having determined that appointment of the United States Marshal to serve process is necessary and appropriate in this case, service shall be perfected by the United States Marshal without cost to the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/6/2023. (wea, 6)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Benton, Gregg County, L Martin, filed by William Stephan Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gsm)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Admin of Inmate Accounts Gregg County Jail as to #5 Order Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. Received 11/21/2023. (ndc)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. No partial filing fee shall be assessed. In the event that the Plaintiff subsequently receives deposits in his inmate trust account, the agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis provided the account exceeds $10.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/15/2023. (wea, 6)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by William Stephan Holloway, Jr. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this order to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/15/2023. (gsm)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (wea, 6)
November 15, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent form to Plaintiff. (wea, 6)
November 14, 2023 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for William Stephan Holloway, Jr. (wea, 6)
November 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Benton, Gregg County, Unknown Martin, Unknown Unknown, filed by William Stephan Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wea, 6)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Gregg County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stephan Holloway, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unknown Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unknown Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Martin
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Represented By: Robin Hill O'Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?