Williams v. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: JAY WILLIAMS
Defendant: Department of Justice
Case Number: 6:2024cv00265
Filed: July 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2024 Filing 6 Letter from Jay Williams (gsm)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Remark. Recommended that the above-styled civil action be dismissed with prejudice as barred by sanctions and sovereign immunity. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/29/2024. (gsm)
July 29, 2024 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Love (gsm)
July 25, 2024 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:24-cv-00953. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. As more fully stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 7/10/2024. Copies mailed as set forth in the Order. (dad) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/25/2024.]
June 21, 2024 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/25/2024.]
June 21, 2024 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (sms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/25/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?