Williams v. Doe
Petitioner: Jay Williams
Respondent: John Doe
Case Number: 6:2024cv00354
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2024 Filing 13 Mail sent to Jay Williams returned as undeliverable re #12 Report and Recommendations,. (jbe)
October 1, 2024 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the civil action be dismissed with prejudice as barred by sanctions and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/1/2024. (wea)
September 27, 2024 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 5:24-cv-00709. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER the above captioned case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division, the district in which the alleged cause of action arose. See 28 U.S.C. 1391. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a determination of Plaintiffs pauper status and approved forms be deferred to the transferee court for resolution and disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/25/2024. (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
July 26, 2024 Filing 9 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court requesting discovery. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
July 26, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST from Jay Williams for information on cases. Clerk mailed Clerk mailed copy work letter stating the case numbers are not cases of the United States District Court Western District of Louisiana on 07/26/2024. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter) (crt,Williams, G) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
July 24, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Support/NOTICE of Disposition of Collateral by Jay Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
July 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE/MEMORANDUM by Jay Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
July 16, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE re Filing Fee by Jay Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
July 16, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST from Jay Williams for information on cases. Clerk mailed copy work letter stating the case numbers are not cases of the United States District Court Western District of Louisiana on 07/16/2024. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter) (crt,Williams, G) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 7/8/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 1983 Civil Rights form, #2 In Forma Pauperis form)(crt,Devillier, W) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
June 5, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/5/2024. (crt,Devillier, W) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
May 22, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against John Doe filed by Jay Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Bowman, A). Complaint not on approved form. [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/27/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?