Kohute v. City of Dallas S.W.A.T. Headquarters
Plaintiff: Kevin James Kohute
Defendant: City of Dallas S.W.A.T. Headquarters
Case Number: 6:2024cv00494
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2025 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt by Kevin James Kohute on 1/12/2025 as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (ndc)
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. It is further recommended that Plaintiff be WARNED that the continued filing of frivolous lawsuits will result in being barred from filing any new lawsuits without representation by a licensed attorney and payment of the full filing fee. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/13/2024. (wea)
December 26, 2024 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (wea)
December 26, 2024 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent form to Plaintiff. (wea)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Proposed Order) by Kevin James Kohute. (wea)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Dallas S.W.A.T. Headquarters, filed by Kevin James Kohute. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohute v. City of Dallas S.W.A.T. Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas S.W.A.T. Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin James Kohute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?