Morris et al v. AirCon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Debra Morris, Ashley Morris, Amanda Morris Wright, Jimmy Williams, Rebecca Williams, Orlando Ordaz and Roy McCollough
Defendant: AirCon Corporation, Grecon, Inc., Mid-South Engineering Company and Global Asset Protection Services LLC
Case Number: 9:2016cv00035
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Lufkin Office
County: Angelina
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDERED that GreCon's objections (Doc# 166) are overruled and Judge Hawthorn's report and recommendation (Doc# 147) is adopted. GreCon's Motion for summary judgment (Doc# 80) is denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/25/2017. (bjc)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER ADOPTING 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. GAPS's objections are overruled. GAPS's Motion for Summary Judgment 78 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/10/17. (ljw, )
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER ADOPTING 129 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendants GreCon and GAPS's motions to designate responsible third parties 102 & 128 are DENIED AS MOOT, to the extent that Georgia-Pacific, LLC and Georgia Wood Products South, LLC (collectively, "Georgia-Pacific") will be deemed a "settling party" within the meaning of § 33.003(a) of the Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/6/17. (ljw, )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER adopting 46 Report and Recommendation. Global Asset, GreCon and AirCon's motions to dismiss are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/31/2017. (bjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. AirCon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Morris
Represented By: John Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Morris
Represented By: Jane Swearingen Leger
Represented By: John Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Morris Wright
Represented By: John Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Williams
Represented By: John Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Williams
Represented By: John Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Ordaz
Represented By: John Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy McCollough
Represented By: John Michael Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AirCon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grecon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-South Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Asset Protection Services LLC
Represented By: Cameron James Asby
Represented By: Corey M Weideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?