Warren v. Howard et al

Plaintiff: Veronica Diann Warren
Defendant: Powell Transportation Company, Inc. and Jeremiah Howard
Case Number: 9:2018cv00232
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Ron Clark
1 Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2019. Court to enter scheduling order. Appearances: M Hancock, Pla atty; D Peters, Def atty (Court time: 1:26PM - 1:40PM) (Courtroom Deputy & FTR Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Order)(Peters, Andrew)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE RESETTING Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2019 11:30 AM has been RESET to 2/25/2019 01:30 PM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ttp, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Veronica Diann Warren Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosure (Badders, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thomas Peters on behalf of Powell Transportation Company, Inc. (Peters, Andrew)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before January 21, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on February 22, 2019 at 11:30 a.m., in the Courtroom 102, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/2/19. (ljw, )
December 28, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn per Standing Referral Order RC-72.4. (ljw, )
December 28, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 ORIGINAL ANSWER (FILED IN STATE COURT) to #2 ORIGINAL PETITION (FILED IN STATE COURT) by Powell Transportation Company, Inc..(ljw, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION (FILED IN STATE COURT) against All Defendants, filed by Veronica Diann Warren.(ljw, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Powell Transportation Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7078194), filed by Powell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit POP, #3 Exhibit DOA, #4 Exhibit Return of Citation, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fee, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Fee
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Diann Warren
Represented By: Jeffrey B Badders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?