John Doe v. Stephen F. Austin State University
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Stephen F. Austin State University, Dr. Michael Walker, Dr. Peggy S Scott and President Steve Westbrook
Case Number: 9:2019cv00006
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Stephen F. Austin State University to 4/8/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Peggy S Scott, Stephen F. Austin State University, Michael Walker, Steve Westbrook.( Lyles, Benjamin) (Main Document 17 replaced with Flattened Version on 3/18/2019) (ljw, ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued as to Peggy S Scott & Michael Walker and emailed back to Attorney for service. (Attachments: #1 Scott Summons)(ljw, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stephen F. Austin State University, Steve Westbrook, Michael Walker, Peggy S Scott, filed by John Doe. (Clerk Ordered to file by Text Only Entry)(ljw, )
March 13, 2019 TEXT ONLY: The court grants #14 Consent to Allow Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Pleading. The clerk of the court is directed to docket Attachment 1 to Dkt. #14, Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/13/2019. (rc2)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Second Amended Complaint)(Tate, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before March 25, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on April 25, 2019 at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom #6, Jack Brooks Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas before Magistrate Judge Giblin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/6/19. (ljw, )
March 6, 2019 TEXT ONLY: The court grants #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Defendants may file a motion to dismiss of no more than 52 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/6/2019. (rc2)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Stephen F. Austin State University, Steve Westbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyles, Benjamin) Modified on 3/6/2019 (ljw, ).
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss by Stephen F. Austin State University, Steve Westbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyles, Benjamin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Steve Westbrook served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Tate, Richard)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Steve Westbrook and emailed to Attorney for service. (ljw, )
February 20, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR by Attorney. Document # 7, Additional Attachment (Summons). PLEASE IGNORE. Summons that need to be issued must be emailed to the appropriate Clerks Office for issuance. Please never file a blank Summons.*** (ljw, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE IGNORE Additional Attachments to Main Document: #6 Amended Complaint.. (Tate, Richard) Modified on 2/21/2019 (ljw, ).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Doe.(Tate, Richard)
February 12, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Stephen F. Austin State University to 3/5/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Stephen F. Austin State University.( Lyles, Benjamin) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened version on 2/12/2019) (ljw, ).
February 11, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 4, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney to re-file using the APPLICATION to Clerk.*** (ljw, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stephen F. Austin State University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyles, Benjamin) Modified on 2/12/2019 (ljw, ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Stephen F. Austin State University served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Tate, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Stephen F. Austin State University and emailed to Attorney in Charge for service. (ljw, )
January 18, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin per Standing Referral Order RC-72.4. (ljw, )
January 18, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT John Doe against Stephen F. Austin State University ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7104379.), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Info Sheet, #2 Summons(es) Summons)(Tate, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe v. Stephen F. Austin State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Austin State University
Represented By: Benjamin Storey Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael Walker
Represented By: Benjamin Storey Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Peggy S Scott
Represented By: Benjamin Storey Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Steve Westbrook
Represented By: Benjamin Storey Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Richard Lynn Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?