Madondo v. NMP-Stone Creek LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROSANE MADONDO, Individually and on Behalf of her Minor Children JU and FM and Rosane Madondo
Defendant: JORDAN BROADWAY and NMP-STONE CREEK LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv00099
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Scheduling Conference held in chambers on 8/9/2019. (ttp, )
August 5, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 11:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Location change only (ttp, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jordan Broadway. (Streich, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by NMP-Stone Creek LLC. (Streich, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines)(Yancy, Austin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jordan Broadway, NMP-Stone Creek LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scelfo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Streich, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Jordan Broadway.(Streich, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by NMP-Stone Creek LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Streich, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by NMP-Stone Creek LLC.(Streich, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rosane Madondo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Yancy, Austin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by NMP-Stone Creek LLC Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Process, #4 Exhibit D - Orders, #5 Exhibit E - List of Parties, #6 Exhibit F - Address of Court, #7 Exhibit G - Index of Matters)(Streich, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before July 6, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on August 9, 2019 at 11:00am in the Courtroom 102, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/19/19. (ljw, )
June 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Original Petition (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Rosane Madondo.(ljw, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by JORDAN BROADWAY of Consent to Removal (Streich, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NMP-STONE CREEK LLC from 145th Judicial District Court of Nacogdoches County Texas, case number C1934784. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7311257), filed by NMP-STONE CREEK LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Executed Process, #4 Exhibit D - Orders, #5 Exhibit E - List of Parties, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Address, #7 Exhibit G - Index of Matters, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Streich, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madondo v. NMP-Stone Creek LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORDAN BROADWAY
Represented By: Michael Edward Streich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMP-STONE CREEK LLC
Represented By: Michael Edward Streich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSANE MADONDO, Individually and on Behalf of her Minor Children JU and FM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosane Madondo
Represented By: Joel C Simon
Represented By: Austin K. Yancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?