Ford v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Willie Ford
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv00120
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 11:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2020. Discovery completed by 2/24/2020. Jury Selection set for 6/22/2020 01:30 PM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/5/2019. (bjc, )
September 5, 2019 NOTICE CANCELING the Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2019 11:30AM in Lufkin, Texas before Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ttp, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC . (LaRue, Jessica)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LaRue, Jessica)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE assigning case to Magistrate Judge Hawthorn by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 8/21/2019. (bmf)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Willie Ford, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bmf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC.(LaRue, Jessica)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before August 10, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on September 6, 2019 at 11:30am in the Courtroom 102, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/23/19. (ljw, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Original Petition (Filed in State Court) against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed by Willie Ford.(ljw, )
July 22, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC from 145th Judicial District Court, Nacogdoches County, Texas, case number C1934625. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7358324), filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LaRue, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Ford
Represented By: Victor Martinez Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Merritt LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?