Tindol v. Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jaysen Tindol
Defendant: Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00128
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc.. (Mann, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc..(Mann, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaysen Tindol. Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Brady, Scott)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc. and emailed to Attorney for service. (ljw, )
July 31, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jaysen Tindol. (ljw, )
July 31, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7372275.), filed by Jaysen Tindol. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brady, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tindol v. Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaysen Tindol
Represented By: Scott Earl Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Change Oil & Lube, Inc.
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?