Sandoz Inc. v. M & S Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Defendant: Ben Eugene Jacob, M & S Pharmacy, Inc., Garth A. Hinze, David R. Humphries and David G. Bradley
Case Number: 9:2019cv00232
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandoz Inc.. Garth A. Hinze waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Wong, Linda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandoz Inc.. David R. Humphries waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Wong, Linda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandoz Inc.. David G. Bradley waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Wong, Linda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandoz Inc.. Ben Eugene Jacob waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Wong, Linda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandoz Inc.. M & S Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Wong, Linda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David George Lubben on behalf of All Defendants (Lubben, David)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to David G. Bradley, Garth A. Hinze, David R. Humphries, Ben Eugene Jacob, M & S Pharmacy, Inc. (bjc, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J. Marrazo on behalf of Sandoz Inc. (Marrazo, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
December 16, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sandoz Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Sandoz Inc.. (Wong, Linda)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7569185.), filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wong, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoz Inc. v. M & S Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Eugene Jacob
Represented By: David George Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & S Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: David George Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth A. Hinze
Represented By: David George Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Humphries
Represented By: David George Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Bradley
Represented By: David George Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Linda Wong
Represented By: Joseph J. Marrazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?