Texas Farmers Insurance Company v. As America, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Texas Farmers Insurance Company as Subrogee of Julie Walker and Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Defendant: Neoperl Inc., Neoperl Iberica S.A. (FKA Industrial Mateu S.A., AS AMERICA, INC. D/B/A AMERICAN STANDARD BRANDS D/B/A AMERICAN STANDARD, As America, Inc. and Neoperl Iberica S.A.
Case Number: 9:2020cv00002
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/5/20. (ljw, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by As America, Inc. Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions (Smith, Russell)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Texas Farmers Insurance Company. Neoperl Iberica S.A. served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Whitney Certificate for Neoperl Iberica S.A.)(Vigushin, Paul) Modified on 2/28/2020 (ljw, ).
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by As America, Inc. (Smith, Russell)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Deadlines)(Vigushin, Paul)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Texas Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Vigushin, Paul)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before February 3, 2020. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on March 11, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom #6, Jack Brooks Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas before Magistrate Judge Giblin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/16/20. (ljw, )
January 7, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, )
January 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
January 7, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED PETITION (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Texas Farmers Insurance Company.(ljw, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #2 ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) by As America, Inc..(ljw, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court Case # C1934989) against All Defendants, filed by Texas Farmers Insurance Company.(ljw, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Neoperl Inc. from 145th Judicial District Court of Nacogdoches County, Texas, case number C1934989. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7598248), filed by Neoperl Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Siahatgar, Bijan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Farmers Insurance Company v. As America, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neoperl Inc.
Represented By: Bijan R Siahatgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neoperl Iberica S.A. (FKA Industrial Mateu S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AS AMERICA, INC. D/B/A AMERICAN STANDARD BRANDS D/B/A AMERICAN STANDARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: As America, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Ray Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neoperl Iberica S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Farmers Insurance Company as Subrogee of Julie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Vigushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?