State of Texas v. Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM
Plaintiff: State Of Texas
Defendant: Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM
Respondent: Debbie Mercer, Ancheta S.A. de C.V., Aircraft Guaranty Holdings & Trust, LLC, Aircraft Guaranty Management & Trust, LLC, Aircraft Guaranty Corporation, Aircraft Guaranty Trust, LLC, Debbie Mercer-Erwin, Aircraft Guaranty Corp., Trustee for Continent Aircraft Statutory Trust No. 2564, Debbie Lynn Erwin and Roberto Miguel Gonzalez Barragan
Case Number: 9:2020cv00175
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Evans, Gary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing by State Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Coleman, Tommy)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by State Of Texas. (Coleman, Tommy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ).
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Debra Mercer-Erwin, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Evans, Gary)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture (filed in State Court) against Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM filed by State Of Texas.(bmf, ) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (bmf, ).
August 14, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bmf, )
August 14, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (bmf, )
August 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bmf, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM from 411th Judicial District Court of Polk County, Texas, case number Cause No. CIV33803. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7948951), filed by Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings), #3 Exhibit B)(Evans, Gary) Modified on 8/17/2020 (bmf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas v. Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of Texas
Represented By: Tommy L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cessna 560 Citation Jet Bearing Serial Number 560-0068 And Assigned And Displaying Registration/Tail Number N569LM
Represented By: Gary Linn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debbie Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ancheta S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aircraft Guaranty Holdings & Trust, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aircraft Guaranty Management & Trust, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aircraft Guaranty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aircraft Guaranty Trust, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debbie Mercer-Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aircraft Guaranty Corp., Trustee for Continent Aircraft Statutory Trust No. 2564
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debbie Lynn Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roberto Miguel Gonzalez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?