Evans v. Dault
Plaintiff: M.D. Charles Evans
Defendant: Thomas Dault, Jr.
Case Number: 9:2021cv00080
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1821
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Thomas Dault, Jr.. (ljw, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Request by Charles Evans for Clerk's Entry of Default against Thomas Dault, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notarized Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default)(Thomas, Zachary)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Evans. Thomas Dault, Jr served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Thomas, Zachary)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 Unable to Issue Clerk's Entry of Default. The Summons must be entered on the docket sheet separately before requesting the Clerks Entry of Default. Also the Affidavit must be notarized that is required in the Clerks Entry of Default. (ljw, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Request by Charles Evans for Clerk's Entry of Default against Thomas Dault, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default)(Thomas, Zachary)
May 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to Thomas Dault, Jr. (bjc, )
April 28, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
April 28, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Dault, Jr ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8383197.), filed by Charles Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Thomas, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Dault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dault, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Charles Evans
Represented By: Zachary Watson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?