Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. L.C. Jordan & Son et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: L.C. Jordan & Son, Lawrence C. Jordan, Susie Jordan, John D. Jordan and Jodi Jordan
Case Number: 9:2021cv00280
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before December 13, 2021. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on January 5, 2022 at 3:30 p.m., in Room 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/22/21. (ljw, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Defendants' Original Answer ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by all Defendants.(Fenley, Curtis)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to District Judge Michael J. Truncale for all further proceedings. District Judge Ron Clark no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 11/10/2021. (bjc, )
November 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn no longer assigned to case. (bjc, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Lawrence C. Jordan served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021; Susie Jordan served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021; L.C. Jordan & Son served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Pipkin, Mike)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Jodi Jordan served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; John D. Jordan served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Pipkin, Mike)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants and emailed back to Attorney in Charge for service. (ljw, )
October 26, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
October 26, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
October 26, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8640408.), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pipkin, Mike)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. L.C. Jordan & Son et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Mike Fowler Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.C. Jordan & Son
Represented By: Curtis William Fenley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence C. Jordan
Represented By: Curtis William Fenley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie Jordan
Represented By: Curtis William Fenley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Jordan
Represented By: Curtis William Fenley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Jordan
Represented By: Curtis William Fenley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?