Scroggins v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Jesse Jacobi Scroggins
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 9:2022cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Thad Heartfield
Referring Judge: Christine L Stetson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jesse Jacobi Scroggins.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 1/10/2022. (nkl, )
January 7, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 5, receipt number 6-59285 (gsg)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by Jesse Jacobi Scroggins.(ljw, )
January 4, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (ljw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scroggins v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Jacobi Scroggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?