Emmett v. Dickerson et al
Plaintiff: Barry Emmett
Defendant: FNU Dickerson, Kitchen Major, Ernestine Julye, UTMB President, UTMB Vice President, Director, TDCJ and Executive Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 9:2022cv00004
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Lufkin Office
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Barry Emmett as to #7 Report and Recommendations. (no signed on date) (ljw, )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to the Court by Barry Emmett (ljw, )
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Barry Emmett on 1/21/22 as to #4 Preliminary Filing Fee Order. (ljw, )
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the above-styled civil action should be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 USC 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/26/2022. (bjc, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Sanctions and Supplement the Record by Barry Emmett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ljw, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Copy of Motion for Leave to File TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Barry Emmett (ljw, )
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/10/22. (ljw, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION Regarding Transfer. It is ordered that this civil rights action is TRANSFERRED to the Lufkin Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/7/22. (kcv, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Injunction (construed) by Barry Emmett. (kcv, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Case transferred in from Beaumont Division on 01/07/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-8. Case assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield.(ljw, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 42:1983 COMPLAINT against FNU Dickerson, Director, TDCJ, Executive Director, TDCJ-CID, Ernestine Julye, Kitchen Major, UTMB President, UTMB Vice President, filed by Barry Emmett.(kcv, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmett v. Dickerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Emmett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchen Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernestine Julye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTMB President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTMB Vice President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, TDCJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?