Rendon v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Plaintiff: Hope Rendon
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) and Sanderson Farms Inc
Case Number: 9:2023cv00137
Filed: August 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing:Case Management Conference RESET for 11/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kmr, )
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hope Rendon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hommel, William) Modified on 9/21/2023 (ljw, ).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference must occur by 9/28/2023. Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2023 at 10:30 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/8/2023. (bjc, )
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) (Crutcher, Robert)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division).(Crutcher, Robert)
September 8, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
August 22, 2023 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) to 10/2/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
August 21, 2023 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division).( Crutcher, Robert)
August 21, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Rendon. Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Hommel, William)
August 7, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) and emailed back to Attorney for service. (ljw, )
August 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9637186.), filed by Hope Rendon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 8/7/2023) (ljw, ).
August 7, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (ljw, )
August 7, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rendon v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Rendon
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms Inc
Represented By: Audrey Momanaee
Represented By: Robert Pepper Crutcher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?