National Rifle Association of America
Debtor: National Rifle Association of America and National Rifle Association of America, Debtor
Us Trustee: United States Trustee
Not Classified By Court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 3:2021bk30085
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Harlin DeWayne Hale
Referring Judge: Stacey G Jernigan
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 776 Support/supplemental documentNRA Admitted Exhibits 278, 280, 322, 323, 332, 531-533, 535-546, 580-582, 591, 661, 663, 664, 670, 672, 687-689 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Attachments: #1 NRA 544-546, 580, 581, 582, 591, 661 #2 NRA 663, 664, 670, 672, 687, 688, and 689) (Van Horn, Eric)
June 22, 2021 Filing 775 Support/supplemental documentNRA Admitted Exhibits 57, 58, 65, 155, 174, 177, 189, 211, 222, 228, 261, 270-273 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Attachments: #1 NRA 177, 189, 211, 222 #2 NRA 228, 261, 270 #3 NRA 271 -- PART 1 #4 NRA 271 -- PART 2 #5 NRA 272 -- PART 1 #6 NRA 272 -- PART 2 #7 NRA 272 -- PART 3 #8 NRA 272 -- PART 4 #9 NRA 272 -- PART 5 #10 NRA 272 -- PART 6 #11 NRA 273 -- PART 1 #12 NRA 273 -- PART 2) (Van Horn, Eric)
June 22, 2021 Filing 774 Support/supplemental documentNRA Admitted Exhibits 15, 22-24 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Attachments: #1 Supplement NRA 22 PART 1 #2 NRA 22 -- PART 2 #3 NRA 23 -- PART 1 #4 NRA 23 -- PART 2 #5 NRA 23 -- PART 3 #6 NRA 23 -- PART 4 #7 NRA 23 -- PART 5 #8 NRA 24 -- PART 1 #9 NRA 24 -- PART 2 #10 NRA 24 -- PART 3) (Van Horn, Eric)
June 22, 2021 Filing 773 Support/supplemental documentAckerman McQueen Admitted Exhibits filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Van Horn, Eric)
June 22, 2021 Filing 772 Support/supplemental documentJourney Admitted Exhibits filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 771 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 368 & 369 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 770 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 339, 341, 347, 349, 354, 356, 360, 361, 362, 363 (REDACTED), 364, 366 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 769 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 322, 327 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 768 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 303, 314, 315, 316, 317 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 767 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 278, 285, 287, 288 (REDACTED), 298, 299, 300 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 766 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 191, 193, 199, 201, 203, 208, 255, 257, 258, 270, 271, 272, 273, 276 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 765 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 148, 151, 153, 160, 162, 170, 172, 173, 174, 178, 181, 182, 188 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 764 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 130, 131, 134, 138, 142, 143, 144 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 763 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 111, 123, 128, 129 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 762 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 79, 86, 89 (REDACTED), 95, 100, 107, 109 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 761 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 50, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 60, 72, 74, 75 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 760 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBIT: 24 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 759 Support/supplemental documentNYAG EXHIBITS: 17, 18, 22 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#758 Notice (generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
June 11, 2021 Filing 758 Notice of Filing Admitted Exhibits filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#757 Court admitted exhibits date of hearings 4/5/2021, 4/6/2021, 4/7/2021, 4/8/2021, 4/13/2021, 4/16/2021, 4/20/2021, 4/21/2021, 4/23/2021, and 4/29/2021. ACKERMAN MCQUEEN EXHIBITS: 1, 10, 13, 14, 18, 19, 20, 33, 35, 38, 40, 41 (REDACTED), 46, 50, 66, 67 (REDACTED), 68, 72, 74, 78, 83 (REDACTED), 84, 121, 124, 125, 152, 163, 168, 176 ADMITTED. JOURNEY EXHIBITS 3, 11, AND 18 ADMITTED. NEW YORK ATTORNEY GENERAL EXHIBITS 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7 (REDACTED), 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 16, 17, 18, 22, 24, 50, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 60, 72, 74, 75, 79, 86, 89 (REDACTED), 95, 100, 107, 109, 111, 123, 128, 129, 130, 131, 134, 138, 142, 143, 144, 148, 151, 153, 160, 162, 170, 172, 173, 174, 178, 181, 182, 188, 191, 193, 199, 201, 203, 208, 255, 257, 258, 270, 271, 272, 273, 276, 278, 285, 287, 288 (REDACTED), 298, 299, 300, 303, 314, 315, 316, 317, 322, 327, 339, 341, 347, 349, 354, 356, 360, 361, 362, 363 (REDACTED), 364, 366, 368, AND 369 ADMITTED. NRA EXHIBITS 15, 22, 23, 24, 57, 58, 65, 155, 174, 177, 189, 211, 222, 228, 261, 270, 271, 272, 273, 278, 280, 322, 323, 332, 530-546, 580, 581, 582, 591, 610-1 610-5 (FILED AT DKT #610), 661, 663, 664, 670, 672, 675, 687, 688, AND 689 ADMITTED. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3), #494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4), #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #610 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Retain and Pay Litigation Experts Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F))). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NYAG EXHIBITS: 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7 (REDACTED), 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 16) (Van Horn, Eric)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 755 Order sealing certain trial exhibits 38, 39 and 40 (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.). Entered on 6/9/2021 (Bradden, T.)
June 7, 2021 Filing 754 Correspondence to the Court filed by Hal Irwin (RE: related document(s)#740 Order Granting Motions to Dismiss - mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #423), denying application to employ as Real estate broker (related document #519), denying motion to appoint trustee. (related document #114), mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #131), granting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #155), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #163), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #214) Entered on 5/11/2021. (Bradden, T.)) (Rielly, Bill)
June 7, 2021 Bankruptcy case closed. Pursuant to LBR 9070-1, any exhibits that were admitted by the Court may be claimed and removed from the Clerks Office during the 60-day period following final disposition of a case by the attorney or party who introduced the exhibits. Any exhibit not removed within the 60-day period may be destroyed or otherwise disposed of by the Bankruptcy Clerk. (Kerr, S.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 753 Stipulation and Agreed Order regarding general bar date #750 Motion to extend time. Entered on 5/20/2021. (Bradden, T.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 752 Stipulation by Ackerman McQueen, Inc. and Debtors, Creditors' Committee and US Trustee. filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#750 Motion to extend time to Claims Bar Date (RE: related document(s)#80 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11)). (Acosta, H)
May 19, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 5/19/2021. (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #557 Motion for relief from stay For Entry of an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay, to the Extent Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement, and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy Fee amount $188, Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips Objections due by 4/26/2021.) (CASE DISMISSED; MOTIONS MOOT.) (Green, Shanette)
May 19, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 5/19/2021. (RE: related document(s)#416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE Filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #608 Motion to sell NRA Branded Merchandise NOTE: THE PROPERTY TO BE SOLD PURSUANT TO THIS MOTION TO SELL WILL NOT BE SOLD FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS. Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter Into Postpetition Agreement with Helm Promotions LLC to Operate the NRA Store and License Certain NRA Trademarks and Logos Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 5/19/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 4/19/2021 (Kerr, S.).) (CASE DISMISSED; MOTIONS MOOT.) (Green, Shanette)
May 19, 2021 Filing 751 Motion for expedited hearing (related documents #750 Motion to extend/shorten time) Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Acosta, H) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #750 SET FOR HEARING ON 5/21/2021 AT 10:00 AM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 5/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
May 19, 2021 Filing 750 Motion to extend time to Claims Bar Date (RE: related document(s)#80 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11) Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Acosta, H)
May 15, 2021 Filing 748 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#742 Order denying motion to (1) preclude debtors from offering evidence in support of the sufficiency or completeness of debtors' calculation of excess benefit transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) admit NYAG exhibits 26,29,333,334; and (3) admit summary evidence pursuant to federal rule of evidence 1006 (related document #591) Entered on 5/13/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/15/2021. (Admin.)
May 14, 2021 749 Hearing held on 5/14/2021. (RE: related document(s)#1 Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by National Rifle Association of America Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/17/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 05/17/2021.) (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD.) (Green, Shanette)
May 14, 2021 Filing 747 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/14/2021 RE: Status Conference. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 08/12/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Liberty Transcripts/Dipti Patel, Telephone number 8478484907. (RE: related document(s) 724 Hearing held on 5/3/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (TRIAL CONCLUDED; THE COURT ANNOUNCED ITS INTENTION TO ISSUE A RULING IN APPROXIMATELY 1 WEEK.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 08/12/2021. (Patel, Dipti)
May 14, 2021 746 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 5/14/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 745 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#740 Order Granting Motions to Dismiss - mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #423), denying application to employ as Real estate broker (related document #519), denying motion to appoint trustee. (related document #114), mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #131), granting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #155), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #163), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #214) Entered on 5/11/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Admin.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 744 BNC certificate of mailing. (RE: related document(s)#738 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order denying from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Kerr, S.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Admin.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 743 BNC certificate of mailing. (RE: related document(s)#736 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order denying from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Kerr, S.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Admin.)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Order denying motion to (1) preclude debtors from offering evidence in support of the sufficiency or completeness of debtors' calculation of excess benefit transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) admit NYAG exhibits 26,29,333,334; and (3) admit summary evidence pursuant to federal rule of evidence 1006 (related document #591) Entered on 5/13/2021. (Bradden, T.)
May 12, 2021 Filing 741 Notice of hearing(status conference) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#740 Order Granting Motions to Dismiss - mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #423), denying application to employ as Real estate broker (related document #519), denying motion to appoint trustee. (related document #114), mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #131), granting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #155), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #163), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #214) Entered on 5/11/2021. (Bradden, T.)). Hearing to be held on 5/14/2021 at 10:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #740, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Laura)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 740 Order Granting Motions to Dismiss - mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #423), denying application to employ as Real estate broker (related document #519), denying motion to appoint trustee. (related document #114), mooting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #131), granting motion to dismiss Debtor without prejudice. (related document #155), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #163), mooting motion to appoint trustee. (related document #214) Entered on 5/11/2021. (Bradden, T.)
May 11, 2021 Filing 739 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark S. Werbner filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips. (Werbner, Mark)
May 11, 2021 Filing 738 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order denying from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Kerr, S.)
May 11, 2021 Filing 737 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order denying from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#417 Motion for leave -- The State of New York's Motion to Preclude Debtors from Introducing Certain Evidence and Eliciting Certain Testimony They Have Shielded from Discovery Based Upon Inappropriate Privilege Assertions Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Connell in Support of Motion # 2 Proposed Order)) Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Kerr, S.)
May 11, 2021 Filing 736 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order denying from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Kerr, S.)
May 10, 2021 Filing 735 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Daniel J. McGuire. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips (Loegering, Rebecca)
May 10, 2021 Filing 734 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Seth C. Farber. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips (Loegering, Rebecca)
May 10, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28701849, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#735). (U.S. Treasury)
May 10, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28701819, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#734). (U.S. Treasury)
May 8, 2021 Filing 733 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#730 Order approving debtors' motion for authority to retain and pay litigation experts (related document #610) Entered on 5/6/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.)
May 7, 2021 Filing 732 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for Attorney General of the State of New York. (RE: related document(s)#393 Motion for protective order Debtors Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAGs Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of Gayle Stanford Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Responses due by 5/21/2021. (Kerr, S.)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Order approving debtors' motion for authority to retain and pay litigation experts (related document #610) Entered on 5/6/2021. (Bradden, T.)
May 6, 2021 Filing 727 INCORRECT ENTRY. Docketed in error. Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for creditor. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) Responses due by 5/20/2021. (Kerr, S.) Modified on 5/11/2021 (Kerr, S.).
May 6, 2021 Filing 726 INCORRECT ENTRY: Docketed in error. Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#417 Motion for leave -- The State of New York's Motion to Preclude Debtors from Introducing Certain Evidence and Eliciting Certain Testimony They Have Shielded from Discovery Based Upon Inappropriate Privilege Assertions Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Connell in Support of Motion # 2 Proposed Order)) Responses due by 5/20/2021. (Kerr, S.) Modified on 5/11/2021 (Kerr, S.).
May 5, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 5/5/2021. (RE: related document(s)#557 Motion for relief from stay For Entry of an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay, to the Extent Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement, and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy Fee amount $188, Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips Objections due by 4/26/2021.) (TO BE RESET TO 5/19/21 AT 1:30 PM PER THE COURT.) (Green, Shanette)
May 5, 2021 Filing 725 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 05/03/21 RE: Afternoon Session. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 08/3/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 724 Hearing held on 5/3/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (TRIAL CONCLUDED; THE COURT ANNOUNCED ITS INTENTION TO ISSUE A RULING IN APPROXIMATELY 1 WEEK.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 08/3/2021. (Bowen, James)
May 4, 2021 Filing 723 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/3/2021 RE: Trial. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 08/2/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Liberty Transcripts/Dipti Patel, Telephone number 8478484907. (RE: related document(s) 711 Hearing held and continued to 5/3/2021 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Hearing to be held on 5/3/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 08/2/2021. (Patel, Dipti)
May 3, 2021 Filing 731 PDF with attached Audio File **5/3/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [05/03/2021 04:30:24 PM]. File Size [ 10360 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:44:21 ]. (admin). Modified on 5/6/2021 (Green, Shanette).
May 3, 2021 Filing 729 PDF with attached Audio File **5/3/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [05/03/2021 02:43:01 PM]. File Size [ 18674 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:19:59 ]. (admin). Modified on 5/6/2021 (Green, Shanette).
May 3, 2021 Filing 728 PDF with attached Audio File **5/3/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [05/03/2021 01:00:22 PM]. File Size [ 21440 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:31:49 ]. (admin). Modified on 5/6/2021 (Green, Shanette).
May 3, 2021 Filing 722 PDF with attached Audio File **5/3/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [05/03/2021 10:45:10 AM]. File Size [ 13659 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:58:29 ]. (admin). Modified on 5/4/2021 (Green, Shanette).
May 3, 2021 724 Hearing held on 5/3/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (TRIAL CONCLUDED; THE COURT ANNOUNCED ITS INTENTION TO ISSUE A RULING IN APPROXIMATELY 1 WEEK.) (Green, Shanette)
May 3, 2021 Filing 721 PDF with attached Audio File **5/3/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [05/03/2021 08:02:02 AM]. File Size [ 34346 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:27:07 ]. (admin). Modified on 5/3/2021 (Green, Shanette).
May 3, 2021 720 Request for transcript (ENTIRE HEARING) regarding a hearing held on 5/3/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Harden, D.)
May 2, 2021 Filing 719 Chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
May 1, 2021 Filing 718 BNC certificate of mailing. (RE: related document(s)#707 Clerk's correspondence requesting the appropriate document to resolve the motion from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3)) Responses due by 5/13/2021. (Kerr, S.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2021. (Admin.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 716 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips (RE: related document(s)#557 Motion for relief from stay For Entry of an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay, to the Extent Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement, and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy Fee amount $188, Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips Objections due by 4/26/2021.). Hearing to be held on 5/19/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #557, (Attachments: #1 Dallas Webex Hearing Instructions #2 Master Service List) (Loegering, Rebecca)
April 30, 2021 Filing 713 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/29/21 RE: Afternoon Session. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/29/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 711 Hearing held and continued to 5/3/2021 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Hearing to be held on 5/3/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/29/2021. (Bowen, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 757 Court admitted exhibits date of hearings 4/5/2021, 4/6/2021, 4/7/2021, 4/8/2021, 4/13/2021, 4/16/2021, 4/20/2021, 4/21/2021, 4/23/2021, and 4/29/2021. ACKERMAN MCQUEEN EXHIBITS: 1, 10, 13, 14, 18, 19, 20, 33, 35, 38, 40, 41 (REDACTED), 46, 50, 66, 67 (REDACTED), 68, 72, 74, 78, 83 (REDACTED), 84, 121, 124, 125, 152, 163, 168, 176 ADMITTED. JOURNEY EXHIBITS 3, 11, AND 18 ADMITTED. NEW YORK ATTORNEY GENERAL EXHIBITS 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7 (REDACTED), 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 16, 17, 18, 22, 24, 50, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 60, 72, 74, 75, 79, 86, 89 (REDACTED), 95, 100, 107, 109, 111, 123, 128, 129, 130, 131, 134, 138, 142, 143, 144, 148, 151, 153, 160, 162, 170, 172, 173, 174, 178, 181, 182, 188, 191, 193, 199, 201, 203, 208, 255, 257, 258, 270, 271, 272, 273, 276, 278, 285, 287, 288 (REDACTED), 298, 299, 300, 303, 314, 315, 316, 317, 322, 327, 339, 341, 347, 349, 354, 356, 360, 361, 362, 363 (REDACTED), 364, 366, 368, AND 369 ADMITTED. NRA EXHIBITS 15, 22, 23, 24, 57, 58, 65, 155, 174, 177, 189, 211, 222, 228, 261, 270, 271, 272, 273, 278, 280, 322, 323, 332, 530-546, 580, 581, 582, 591, 610-1 610-5 (FILED AT DKT #610), 661, 663, 664, 670, 672, 675, 687, 688, AND 689 ADMITTED. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3), #494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4), #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #610 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Retain and Pay Litigation Experts Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F)) (Green, Shanette)
April 29, 2021 Filing 715 PDF with attached Audio File **4/29/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/29/2021 05:08:50 PM]. File Size [ 2871 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:16 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/30/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 29, 2021 Filing 714 PDF with attached Audio File **4/29/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/29/2021 03:59:30 PM]. File Size [ 12749 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:54:41 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/30/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 29, 2021 717 Hearing held on 4/29/2021. (RE: related document(s)#610 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Retain and Pay Litigation Experts Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
April 29, 2021 Filing 712 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/29/21 RE: TRIAL (MORNING). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/28/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. (RE: related document(s) 711 Hearing held and continued to 5/3/2021 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Hearing to be held on 5/3/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/28/2021. (Hartmann, Karen)
April 29, 2021 Filing 710 PDF with attached Audio File **4/29/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/29/2021 01:31:27 PM]. File Size [ 30647 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:11:22 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/29/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 29, 2021 Filing 709 Notice of Supplemental Comment filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#701 Support/supplemental documentDebtors Supplement to Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). (Strubeck, Louis)
April 29, 2021 Filing 708 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips (RE: related document(s)#557 Motion for relief from stay For Entry of an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay, to the Extent Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement, and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy Fee amount $188, Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips Objections due by 4/26/2021.). Hearing to be held on 5/19/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #557, (Loegering, Rebecca)
April 29, 2021 Filing 707 Clerk's correspondence requesting the appropriate document to resolve the motion from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3)) Responses due by 5/13/2021. (Kerr, S.)
April 29, 2021 Filing 706 PDF with attached Audio File **4/29/21 AM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/29/2021 11:37:48 AM]. File Size [ 6414 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:27:29 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/29/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 29, 2021 Filing 705 PDF with attached Audio File **4/29/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/29/2021 10:00:30 AM]. File Size [ 21587 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:32:27 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/29/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 29, 2021 Filing 704 PDF with attached Audio File **4/29/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/29/2021 08:01:31 AM]. File Size [ 24154 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:43:32 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/29/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 29, 2021 711 Hearing held and continued to 5/3/2021 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Hearing to be held on 5/3/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)
April 29, 2021 703 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/29/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 28, 2021 Filing 702 Amended Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held Commencing April 5, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#462 List (witness/exhibit/generic), #469 List (witness/exhibit/generic), #597 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Garman, Gregory)
April 28, 2021 Filing 701 Support/supplemental documentDebtors Supplement to Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 28, 2021 Filing 699 Support/supplemental documentExhibit B to Debtors' Objection to Motion of Wilson Phillips to Modify the Automatic Stay, to the Extend Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement and/or Advanced Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#695 Objection). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 28, 2021 700 Redacted transcript. (RE: related document(s) #543 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/07/2021 (172 pages) (Afternoon Docket Only) RE: Motions. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/7/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 516 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s) #114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #114 and for#163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.). Modified to include link to DE 114 on 4/7/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/7/2021.). (Rehling, Kathy)
April 27, 2021 Filing 698 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#610 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Retain and Pay Litigation Experts). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 27, 2021 Filing 697 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/23/2021 RE: 114, motion to appoint Trustee; 131, motion to dismiss filed by Ackerman McQueen; 155 motion to dismiss filed by New York AG; 163, motion to appoint Trustee filed by NYAG; 214, motion to appoint Trustee filed by DCAG; 423, motion to dismiss filed by DCAG. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/26/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Sumner, Telephone number 2148027196. (RE: related document(s) 694 Hearing Held and Continued to 4/29/21 at 8:00 AM. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Hearing to be held on 4/29/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155,). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/26/2021. (Sumner, Cindy)
April 27, 2021 Filing 696 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/23/21 RE: Afternoon Session. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/26/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 694 Hearing Held and Continued to 4/29/21 at 8:00 AM. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Hearing to be held on 4/29/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155,). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/26/2021. (Bowen, James)
April 26, 2021 Filing 695 Objection to (related document(s): #557 Motion for relief from stay For Entry of an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay, to the Extent Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement, and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy Fee amount $188, filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips)Debtors' Objection to the Motion of Wilson Phillips to Modify the Automatic Stay to the Extent Applicable to Allow Payment, Reimbursement and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 #2 Exhibit A-2 #3 Exhibit A-3 #4 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 26, 2021 Filing 692 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/06/21 RE: AMENDED AFTERNOON SESSION. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/26/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 496 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) Hearing to be held on 4/7/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/26/2021. (Bowen, James)
April 23, 2021 694 Hearing Held and Continued to 4/29/21 at 8:00 AM. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Hearing to be held on 4/29/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Green, Shanette)
April 23, 2021 Filing 691 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#656 Order authorizing the debtors to enter into postpetition agreement for repair and replacement of roof at NRA headquarters (related document #369) Entered on 4/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2021. (Admin.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 690 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#659 Unopposed Order granting application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel for the debtors and debtors in possession effective as of January 15, 2021 (related document #447) Entered on 4/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2021. (Admin.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 689 PDF with attached Audio File **4/23/21 PM SESSION** Court Date & Time [04/23/2021 01:19:22 PM]. File Size [ 4678 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:20:01 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/23/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 23, 2021 Filing 688 PDF with attached Audio File **4/23/21 AM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/23/2021 11:29:52 AM]. File Size [ 13717 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:58:52 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/23/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 23, 2021 Filing 687 PDF with attached Audio File **4/23/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/23/2021 09:36:36 AM]. File Size [ 25206 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:47:58 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/23/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 23, 2021 Filing 686 PDF with attached Audio File **4/23/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/23/2021 08:02:20 AM]. File Size [ 19632 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:24:04 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/23/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 23, 2021 685 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/23/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 684 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/22/2021 (67 pages) RE: Motions (Afternoon Docket Only). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/21/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 678 Hearing Held and Continued t0 4/23/21 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey; #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.; #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/23/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/21/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 683 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/22/21 RE: TRIAL (MORNING SESSION). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/21/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc., Telephone number 215-862-1115 (CourtTranscripts@aol.com). (RE: related document(s) 678 Hearing Held and Continued t0 4/23/21 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey; #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.; #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/23/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/21/2021. (Hartmann, Karen)
April 22, 2021 Filing 682 Notice of Stipulation Between the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, and Aronson LLC Regarding the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Limited Objection to the Debtors' Retention of Aronson LLC as an Ordinary Course Professional filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#321 Order authorizing employment and payment of professionals utilized in the ordinary course of business (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Entered on 3/9/2021 (Bradden, T.), #334 Declaration re: Declaration of Brenda L. Jayne on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Aronson LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business)., #412 Notice of Limited Objection to the Debtors' Retention of Aronson LLC as an Ordinary Course Professional filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#321 Order authorizing employment and payment of professionals utilized in the ordinary course of business (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Entered on 3/9/2021 (Bradden, T.), #334 Declaration re: Declaration of Brenda L. Jayne on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Aronson LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business).).). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Stipulation) (Gluck, Kristian)
April 22, 2021 Filing 681 PDF with attached Audio File **4/22/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/22/2021 03:21:04 PM]. File Size [ 1737 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:25 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 22, 2021 Filing 680 PDF with attached Audio File **4/22/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/22/2021 01:53:36 PM]. File Size [ 17068 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:13:10 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 22, 2021 Filing 679 PDF with attached Audio File **4/22/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/22/2021 01:38:38 PM]. File Size [ 2157 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:13 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 22, 2021 Filing 675 PDF with attached Audio File **4/22/21 AM SESSION 4** Court Date & Time [04/22/2021 10:45:23 AM]. File Size [ 19373 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:23:06 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 22, 2021 Filing 674 PDF with attached Audio File **4/22/21 AM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/22/2021 09:15:56 AM]. File Size [ 16820 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:11:59 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 22, 2021 Filing 673 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/21/2021 RE: 114, motion to appoint a Trustee; 131, motion to dismiss filed by Ackerman McQueen; 155, motion to dismiss filed by New York Attorney General; 163, motion to appoint a Trustee; 214, motion to appoint a Trustee filed by DC Attorney General; 423, motion to dismiss filed by DC Attorney General. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/21/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Sumner, Telephone number 2148027196. (RE: related document(s) 662 Hearing held and continued to 4/22/2021 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey; #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.; #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/22/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/21/2021. (Sumner, Cindy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 672 PDF with attached Audio File **4/22/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/22/2021 09:05:53 AM]. File Size [ 338 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:26 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 22, 2021 Filing 671 PDF with attached Audio File **4/22/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/22/2021 08:04:08 AM]. File Size [ 13623 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:58:23 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 22, 2021 Filing 670 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/21/21 RE: Afternoon Session. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/21/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 662 Hearing held and continued to 4/22/2021 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey; #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.; #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/22/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/21/2021. (Bowen, James)
April 22, 2021 669 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/22/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 22, 2021 678 Hearing Held and Continued t0 4/23/21 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey; #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.; #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/23/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)
April 21, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 4/21/2021. (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (AGREED RESET TO 5/19/21 PER DEBTOR.) (Green, Shanette)
April 21, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 4/21/2021. (RE: related document(s)#416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE Filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (TO BE RESET AFTER COURT HAS ISSUED A RULING ON THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS PER THE COURT.) (Green, Shanette)
April 21, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 4/21/2021. (RE: related document(s)#550 Motion to pay Motion for Entry of Amended Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor, and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (AGREED RESET TO 5/19/21 PER DEBTOR.) (Green, Shanette)
April 21, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 4/21/2021. (RE: related document(s)#447 Application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(3) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective as of January 15, 2021 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D)) (NO RESPONSES FILED; A/O TO BE UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
April 21, 2021 Filing 668 PDF with attached Audio File **4/21/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/21/2021 04:37:09 PM]. File Size [ 20838 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:29:15 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/21/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 21, 2021 Filing 667 PDF with attached Audio File **4/21/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/21/2021 03:00:55 PM]. File Size [ 19851 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:25:08 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/21/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 21, 2021 Filing 666 PDF with attached Audio File **4/21/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/21/2021 01:15:24 PM]. File Size [ 22886 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:38:14 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/21/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 21, 2021 Filing 665 PDF with attached Audio File **4/21/21 AM SESSION** Court Date & Time [04/21/2021 10:32:07 AM]. File Size [ 20402 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:27:28 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/21/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 21, 2021 Filing 661 Response opposed to (related document(s): #642 Notice (generic) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Van Horn, Eric)
April 21, 2021 Filing 660 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/20/2021 (121 pages) RE: Motions (Afternoon Docket Only). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/20/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 648 Hearing held and continued to 5/21/2021 at 10:30 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/20/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 659 Unopposed Order granting application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel for the debtors and debtors in possession effective as of January 15, 2021 (related document #447) Entered on 4/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 658 Order granting in part and denying in part debtors' objections to deposition testimony from prior unrelated cases and for which witnesses are not available and request to exclude the same (RE: related document(s)#494 Objection filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC). Entered on 4/21/2021 (Bradden, T.)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Order granting application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker (related document #378) Entered on 4/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 656 Order authorizing the debtors to enter into postpetition agreement for repair and replacement of roof at NRA headquarters (related document #369) Entered on 4/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 21, 2021 Filing 654 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/08/21 RE: AMENDED AFTERNOON SESSION. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/20/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 537 Hearing held on 4/8/2021 (RE: related document(s)#472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC) (MOTION WITHDRAWN ON THE RECORD) (Bergreen, J.), 538 Hearing held (RE: related document(s)#494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rif LLC). (MATTER TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT AND RESET TO 4/12/21 AT 1:30 PM; COURT WILL RULE AT THAT TIME OR BEFORE). Hearing to be held on 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #494, (Bergreen, J.), 540 HEARING HELD AND CONTINUED TO 4/13/21 AT 9:00 AM - (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/13/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/20/2021. (Bowen, James)
April 21, 2021 655 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/21/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 21, 2021 662 Hearing held and continued to 4/22/2021 at 8:00 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey; #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.; #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York; #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia; #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/22/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 20, 2021 Filing 677 PDF with attached Audio File **4/20/2021 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/20/2021 02:49:37 PM]. File Size [ 20167 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:26:30 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 20, 2021 Filing 676 PDF with attached Audio File **4/20/2021 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/20/2021 01:30:55 PM]. File Size [ 16533 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:10:55 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/22/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 20, 2021 Filing 664 PDF with attached Audio File **4/20/21 AM SESSION 4** Court Date & Time [04/20/2021 11:37:55 AM]. File Size [ 8987 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:38:33 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/21/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 20, 2021 Filing 663 PDF with attached Audio File **4/20/21 AM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/20/2021 11:24:34 AM]. File Size [ 2577 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:01 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/21/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 20, 2021 Filing 653 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period March 1, 2021 to March 31,2021 filed by Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 652 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period March 1, 2021 to March 31, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 651 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/20/21 RE: TRIAL (MORNING SESSION ONLY). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/19/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc., Telephone number 215-862-1115 CourtTranscripts@aol.com. (RE: related document(s) 648 Hearing held and continued to 5/21/2021 at 10:30 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/19/2021. (Hartmann, Karen)
April 20, 2021 Filing 650 Affidavit of Service filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#80 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 646 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#74 Order on motion to seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order); #63 Motion for relief from stay REDACTED Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie). MODIFIED linkage to include link to redacted motion on 1/28/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE Filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #447 Application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(3) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective as of January 15, 2021 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D), #550 Motion to pay Motion for Entry of Amended Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor, and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 645 Notice of Amendment to National Rifle Association of America's Schedule A, Question 75 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#161 Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America., #175 Amended Schedules: A/B, H, (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 644 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Acosta, H)
April 20, 2021 Filing 643 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 21, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 642 Notice Debtors' Amended Designation of Deposition Testimony filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#476 Notice Debtors' Designation of Deposition Testimony filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC.). (Garman, Gregory)
April 20, 2021 Filing 641 PDF with attached Audio File **4/20/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/20/2021 10:06:23 AM]. File Size [ 15787 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:07:42 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/20/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 20, 2021 Filing 640 PDF with attached Audio File **4/20/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/20/2021 08:04:09 AM]. File Size [ 25109 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:47:45 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/20/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 20, 2021 Filing 639 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Smith, Laura)
April 20, 2021 Filing 638 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (RE: related document(s)#416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE Filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 5/19/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #416, (Watson, Marcus)
April 20, 2021 Filing 637 Notice of Master Service List as of April 20, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 636 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#608 Motion to sell NRA Branded Merchandise NOTE: THE PROPERTY TO BE SOLD PURSUANT TO THIS MOTION TO SELL WILL NOT BE SOLD FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS. Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter Into Postpetition Agreement with Helm Promotions LLC to Operate the NRA Store and License Certain NRA Trademarks and Logos Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 5/19/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 4/19/2021 (Kerr, S.).). Hearing to be held on 5/19/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #608, (Neligan, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Filing 635 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#74 Order on motion to seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order); #63 Motion for relief from stay REDACTED Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie). MODIFIED linkage to include link to redacted motion on 1/28/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Hearing to be held on 5/19/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. (Arbaugh, Natalie) Modified on 4/20/2021 (Kerr, S.).
April 20, 2021 Filing 634 Response opposed to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 20, 2021 Filing 632 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Van Horn, Eric)
April 20, 2021 633 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/20/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 20, 2021 648 Hearing held and continued to 4/21/2021 at 10:30 AM (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 20, 2021 Announcement of PASS TO ANOTHER PRELIMINARY HEARING regarding hearing scheduled for 4/21/2021. Hearing continued to 5/19/2021 at 01:30 per Natalie Lynn Arbaugh, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 19, 2021 693 Hearing held on 4/19/2021. (RE: related document(s)#591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; THE COURT READ RULING INTO THE RECORD; DENIED.) (Green, Shanette)
April 19, 2021 Filing 631 Witness and Exhibit List Application to Employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Louis E. Robichaux IV filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UST-2 Email Re Supplement Disclosure) (Lambert, Lisa)
April 19, 2021 Filing 630 Amended Witness and Exhibit List Fifth Amended filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#596 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Gruber, G.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 629 Amended Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Supplemental Witness and Exhibit List Relating to Application of Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer to be held On April 20, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#606 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 19, 2021 Filing 628 Declaration re: First Supplemental Declaration of Louis E. Robichaux IV filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 19, 2021 Filing 624 Response opposed to (related document(s): #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 19, 2021 Filing 623 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/16/21 RE: Afternoon Session. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/19/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 619 Hearing held on 4/16/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (TRIAL HELD; TO RESUME TUESDAY, APRIL 20 AT 8:00 AM.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/19/2021. (Bowen, James)
April 19, 2021 Filing 622 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#610 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Retain and Pay Litigation Experts Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F)). Hearing to be held on 4/29/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #610, (Neligan, Patrick)
April 19, 2021 Filing 620 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/16/21 RE: TRIAL (MORNING SESSION ONLY). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/19/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc., Telephone number 215-862-1115 CourtTranscripts@aol.com. (RE: related document(s) 619 Hearing held on 4/16/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (TRIAL HELD; TO RESUME TUESDAY, APRIL 20 AT 8:00 AM.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/19/2021. (Hartmann, Karen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 618 Declaration re: of Teresa Pilatowicz in Support of Debtors' Response in opposition to the State of New York's Motion to (1) Preclude Debtors from Offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors' Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#617 Response). (Garman, Gregory)
April 19, 2021 Filing 617 Response opposed to (related document(s): #591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit S filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 19, 2021 621 Hearing continued (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 4/20/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #519 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)
April 18, 2021 Filing 616 INCORRECT ENTRY: Incorrect information indicated in document. Trustee's Objection to Motion to Appoint a Member Committee (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery) (Lambert, Lisa) Modified on 4/19/2021 (Kerr, S.).
April 16, 2021 Filing 626 PDF with attached Audio File **4/16/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/16/2021 04:57:09 PM]. File Size [ 17935 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:16:49 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 16, 2021 Filing 625 PDF with attached Audio File **4/16/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/16/2021 03:05:19 PM]. File Size [ 24004 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:42:57 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 16, 2021 619 Hearing held on 4/16/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.)., #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (TRIAL HELD; TO RESUME TUESDAY, APRIL 20 AT 8:00 AM.) (Green, Shanette)
April 16, 2021 Filing 615 PDF with attached Audio File **4/16/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/16/2021 01:16:24 PM]. File Size [ 23959 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:42:43 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/16/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 16, 2021 Filing 614 PDF with attached Audio File **4/16/21 AM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/16/2021 11:37:56 AM]. File Size [ 5426 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:23:16 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/16/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 16, 2021 Filing 613 PDF with attached Audio File **4/16/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/16/2021 09:59:16 AM]. File Size [ 21881 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:33:54 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/16/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 16, 2021 Filing 612 PDF with attached Audio File **4/16/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/16/2021 08:03:14 AM]. File Size [ 22865 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:38:05 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/16/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 16, 2021 Filing 611 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #610 Motion to pay) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #610 SET FOR HEARING ON 4/29/21 AT 1:30 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 4/19/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 16, 2021 Filing 610 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Retain and Pay Litigation Experts Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 16, 2021 Filing 609 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held on April 21, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay Fee amount $188,, #75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order, #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE, #447 Application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(3) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel, #550 Motion to pay Motion for Entry of Amended Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor, and Member Programs). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 16, 2021 Filing 608 Motion to sell NRA Branded Merchandise NOTE: THE PROPERTY TO BE SOLD PURSUANT TO THIS MOTION TO SELL WILL NOT BE SOLD FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS. Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter Into Postpetition Agreement with Helm Promotions LLC to Operate the NRA Store and License Certain NRA Trademarks and Logos Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 4/19/2021 (Kerr, S.).
April 16, 2021 Filing 607 Objection to (related document(s): #416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, Creditor Roscoe B. Marshall, Creditor Esther Schneider, Creditor Owen "Buz" Mills)Debtors' Limited Objection to Motion for Appointment of a Member Committee filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 16, 2021 Filing 606 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List Relating to Application of Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group,LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 #2 Exhibit 3 #3 Exhibit 4) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 16, 2021 Filing 605 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE, #447 Application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(3) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel, #550 Motion to pay Motion for Entry of Amended Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor, and Member Programs). (Smith, Laura)
April 16, 2021 Filing 604 INCORRECT ENTRY: INCORRECT EVENT CODE RE - Application to employ Helm Promotions, LLC as Other Professional Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter Into Postpetition Agreement with Helm Promotions, LLC to Operate the NRA Store and License Certain NRA Trademarks and Logos Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) Objections due 5/19/21 (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 4/19/2021 (Kerr, S.). Modified on 4/19/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 16, 2021 Filing 603 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (RE: related document(s)#416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE). (Watson, Marcus)
April 16, 2021 Filing 601 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 03/04/2021 THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/15/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext Legal Solutions, Telephone number 516-608-2400. (RE: related document(s) 289 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)) (FINAL ORDER ENTERED 3/2/21.), 290 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) (APPROVED.), 291 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_Retention Application Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B_Declaration of M. Collins # 3 Exhibit C_Declaration of Meadows # 4 Exhibit D_Declaration of Frazer # 5 Exhibit E_Disclosure)) (RESET UNTIL AFTER TRUSTEE HEARING HAS BEEN RULED ON.), 292 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.)) (GRANTED.), 293 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) (APPROVED.), 297 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) (GRANTED; K&L WILL FILE A SEPARATE APPLICATION.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/15/2021. (Rupa, Dion)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Order granting motion of Christopher W. Cox for leave to file under seal certain portions of and exhibits to his reply in support of his motion to modify the automatic stay (related document #582) Entered on 4/16/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 599 Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #593 Declaration re: Declaration of Monica Connell in Support of the State of New York's Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit S). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L # 13 Exhibit M # 14 Exhibit N)). Hearing to be held on 4/19/2021 at 04:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #591 and for #593, (Kathman, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 597 Amended Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held Commencing April 5, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#462 List (witness/exhibit/generic), #469 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Garman, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 596 Amended Witness and Exhibit List Fourth Amended filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#492 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Mason, Brian)
April 16, 2021 Filing 595 Objection to (related document(s): #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Acosta, H)
April 16, 2021 Filing 594 Motion to file document under seal.Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Monica Connell in Support of the State of New York's Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kathman, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 593 Declaration re: Declaration of Monica Connell in Support of the State of New York's Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit S). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J #11 Exhibit K #12 Exhibit L #13 Exhibit M #14 Exhibit N) (Kathman, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 592 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #591 Motion for leave) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Van Horn, Eric)(GRANTED ORALLY; DE #591 SET FOR HEARING ON 4/19/21 AT 4:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 4/16/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 16, 2021 Filing 591 Motion for leave Motion To (1) Preclude Debtors from offering Evidence in Support of the Sufficiency or Completeness of Debtors Calculation of Excess Benefit Transactions as to Wayne LaPierre; (2) Admit NYAG Exhibits 26, 29, 333, 334; and (3) Admit Summary Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kathman, Jason)
April 16, 2021 598 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/16/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 16, 2021 602 SEALED document regarding: CHRISTOPHER W. COX'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO MODIFY THE AUTOMATIC STAY per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#600 Order on motion to seal). (Attachments: #1 Buchanan Declaration #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3 #5 Exhibit 4 #6 Exhibit 5 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7 #9 Exhibit 8 #10 Exhibit 9 #11 Exhibit 10 #12 Exhibit 11 #13 Exhibit 12 #14 Exhibit 13 #15 Exhibit 14 #16 Exhibit 15 #17 Exhibit 16 #18 Exhibit 17 #19 Exhibit 18 #20 Exhibit 19 #21 Exhibit 20 #22 Exhibit 21 #23 Exhibit 22) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 15, 2021 Filing 590 Objection to (related document(s): #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit October 2020 Bylaws) (Van Horn, Eric)
April 15, 2021 Filing 589 Witness and Exhibit List in Connection with Hearing on Motion to Appoint a Member Committee filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RE: related document(s)#416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - DellAquila 2d Amended Complaint #2 Exhibit 3 Dell Aquilla Opinion) (Lambert, Lisa)
April 15, 2021 Filing 588 Response unopposed to (related document(s): #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Strubeck, Louis)
April 15, 2021 Filing 587 Response unopposed to (related document(s): #416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, Creditor Roscoe B. Marshall, Creditor Esther Schneider, Creditor Owen "Buz" Mills) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Strubeck, Louis)
April 14, 2021 Filing 585 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#556 Final Order authorizing the debtors to continue use of existing cash management system, maintain existing bank accounts, pay certain costs and fees associated with credit card transactions, and continue use of existing business forms (related document #5) Entered on 4/12/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 26. Notice Date 04/14/2021. (Admin.)
April 14, 2021 Filing 584 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/13/2021 RE: Trial. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/13/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Liberty Transcripts/Dipti Patel, Telephone number 847-848-4907. (RE: related document(s) 573 Hearing continued (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/16/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/13/2021. (Patel, Dipti)
April 14, 2021 Filing 583 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#74 Order on motion to seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order); #63 Motion for relief from stay REDACTED Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie). MODIFIED linkage to include link to redacted motion on 1/28/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Preliminary hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 14, 2021 Filing 582 Motion to file document under seal.(Certain Portions of and Exhibits to Reply in Support of #63 Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay) Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 14, 2021 Filing 581 Reply to (related document(s): #121 Objection filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) (Redacted Reply to #63 Motion to Modify Automatic Stay) filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Attachments: #1 Buchanan Declaration #2 Exhibits 1 - 7 #3 Exhibit 8 #4 Exhibits 9-21 #5 Exhibit 22) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 14, 2021 Filing 580 Trustee's Objection to Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer (RE: related document(s)#519 Application to employ) (Lambert, Lisa)
April 14, 2021 Filing 579 Objection to (related document(s): #519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group LLC as Other Professional Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Ch filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America)"LIMITED OBJECTION TO DEBTORS' APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LOUIS E. ROBICHAUX IV AS CHIEF RESTRUCTURING OFFICER" filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider, Bart Skelton. (Taylor, Clay)
April 14, 2021 Filing 578 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/13/2021 (Trial Day 5 - Afternoon Only) (179 pages) RE: Motions. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/13/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 573 Hearing continued (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/16/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/13/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 577 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#550 Motion to pay Motion for Entry of Amended Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor, and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #550, (Neligan, Patrick)
April 14, 2021 Filing 576 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#393 Motion for protective order Debtors Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAGs Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of Gayle Stanford Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) Responses due by 4/28/2021. (Kerr, S.)
April 13, 2021 Filing 575 PDF with attached Audio File **4/13/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/13/2021 04:33:21 PM]. File Size [ 20207 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:26:42 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/14/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 13, 2021 Filing 574 PDF with attached Audio File **4/13/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/13/2021 01:34:08 PM]. File Size [ 40427 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:53:28 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/13/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 13, 2021 Filing 572 PDF with attached Audio File **4/13/21 AM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/13/2021 11:26:20 AM]. File Size [ 9994 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:42:51 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/13/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 13, 2021 Filing 571 PDF with attached Audio File **4/13/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/13/2021 10:00:08 AM]. File Size [ 19071 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:21:52 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/13/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 13, 2021 Filing 570 Withdrawal filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231)). (Attachments: #1 Mailing matrix) (Wilcox, Stephen)
April 13, 2021 Filing 569 PDF with attached Audio File **4/13/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/13/2021 08:01:35 AM]. File Size [ 23272 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:40:00 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/13/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 13, 2021 Filing 568 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kelsey Mullens Taylor filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Taylor, Kelsey)
April 13, 2021 Filing 566 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 03/31/2021 (7 pages) (Excerpt: Ruling Only) RE: Motion to Compel Discovery (406), Motion to Preclude (417). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/12/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 498 Hearing held on 3/31/2021 (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE); #417 Motion for leave -- The State of New York's Motion to Preclude Debtors from Introducing Certain Evidence and Eliciting Certain Testimony They Have Shielded from Discovery Based Upon Inappropriate Privilege Assertions Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE) (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/12/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
April 13, 2021 565 Request for transcript (ruling only) regarding a hearing held on 3/31/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 13, 2021 573 Hearing continued (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/16/2021 at 08:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)
April 13, 2021 564 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/13/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 13, 2021 567 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 3/4/2021. The requested turn-around time is 3-day expedited (Bergreen, J.)
April 13, 2021 Announcement of WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Stephen Wilcox regarding hearing scheduled for 4/14/2021, filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). (Wilcox, Stephen)
April 13, 2021 Announcement of WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Stephen Wilcox regarding hearing scheduled for 4/14/2021, filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Matrix # 2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 # 3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 6 Certificate of Title on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 # 8 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442)). (Wilcox, Stephen)
April 12, 2021 627 Hearing held on 4/12/2021. (RE: related document(s)#369 Motion to borrow/incur debt Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter into Postpetition Agreement for Replacement of Roof to NRA Headquarters Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 3/30/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B),(FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) #378 Application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Broker Debtor National Rifle Association of America's Application to Employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C), (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED.)#494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; THE COURT READ INTO RECORD RULING.) (Green, Shanette)
April 12, 2021 Filing 563 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled for April 14, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231)). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 12, 2021 Filing 562 Declaration re: Declaration of Sonya Rowling filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#561 Objection). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 12, 2021 Filing 561 Objection to (related document(s): #235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC)Debtors' Objection to Motions for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by Ford Motor Credit LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 12, 2021 Filing 560 Notice of hearingNotice of Reset Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #78, (Neligan, Patrick)
April 12, 2021 Filing 559 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/7/2021 RE: 114, motion to appoint a Trustee; 131, motion to dismiss case filed by Ackerman McQueen; 155, motion to dismiss case filed by Attorney General for the State of New York; 163, motion to appoint a Trustee filed by Attorney General State of New York; 214 Motion to appoint a Trustee filed by Attorney General District of Columbia; 423, motion to dismiss filed by Attorney General for District of Columbia. AM SESSION ONLY. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/12/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Sumner, Telephone number 2148027196. (RE: related document(s) 516 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s) #114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #114 and for#163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.). Modified to include link to DE 114 on 4/7/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/12/2021. (Sumner, Cindy)
April 12, 2021 Filing 558 Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips (RE: related document(s)#557 Motion for relief from stay For Entry of an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay, to the Extent Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement, and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy Fee amount $188, Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips Objections due by 4/26/2021.). Hearing to be held on 5/5/2021 at 01:30 PM VIDEO CONFERENCE for #557, (Loegering, Rebecca)
April 12, 2021 Filing 557 Motion for relief from stay For Entry of an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay, to the Extent Applicable, to Allow Payment, Reimbursement, and/or Advancement of Defense Costs Under the D&O Policy Fee amount $188, Filed by Interested Party Wilson Phillips Objections due by 4/26/2021. (Loegering, Rebecca)
April 12, 2021 Filing 556 Final Order authorizing the debtors to continue use of existing cash management system, maintain existing bank accounts, pay certain costs and fees associated with credit card transactions, and continue use of existing business forms (related document #5) Entered on 4/12/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 12, 2021 Filing 555 Notice of Omnibus Hearing Date filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 12, 2021 Filing 554 Agreed Order granting application to employ BVA Group Restructuring and Advisory, LLC as Financial Adviser (related document #349) Entered on 4/12/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 12, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion for relief from stay(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00). Receipt number 28633967, amount $ 188.00 (re: Doc#557). (U.S. Treasury)
April 9, 2021 Filing 553 Notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 12, 2021 at 1:30 P.M. (CDT) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #369 Motion to borrow/incur debt Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter into Postpetition Agreement for Replacement of Roof to NRA Headquarters Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 3/30/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #378 Application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Broker Debtor National Rifle Association of America's Application to Employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Order granting motion for expedited hearing (Related Doc#520)(document set for hearing: #519 Application to employ) Hearing to be held on 4/16/2021 at 08:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #519 and for #519, Entered on 4/9/2021. (Blanco, J.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 551 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #550 Motion to pay) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)(GRANTED ORALLY; DE #550 SET FOR HEARING ON 4/21/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 4/9/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 9, 2021 Filing 550 Motion to pay Motion for Entry of Amended Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor, and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 9, 2021 Filing 549 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for interested party. (RE: related document(s)#382 Motion for protective order and to Stay Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Sheehan)) Responses due by 4/23/2021. (Kerr, S.) Modified on 4/9/2021 (Kerr, S.).
April 9, 2021 Filing 548 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#372 Motion to compel re: discovery The State of New York to (i) Respond to Debtors' Document Requests or Admit no Documents Exist and (ii) Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J)) Responses due by 4/23/2021. (Kerr, S.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 756 Sealed court admitted exhibits date of hearing 04/08/2021. NRA EXHIBITS 38, 39, AND 40 ADMITTED UNDER SEAL. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) (Green, Shanette)
April 8, 2021 Filing 546 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#493 Order granting motion for authority to pay mediation fee (related document #481) Entered on 4/6/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/08/2021. (Admin.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 545 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#490 Order granting application to employ AlixPartners, LLP as Financial Adviser to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document #337) Entered on 4/6/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/08/2021. (Admin.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 544 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/08/21 RE: MORNING SESSION. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/7/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc., Telephone number 215-862-1115 CourtTranscripts@aol.com. (RE: related document(s) 540 HEARING HELD AND CONTINUED TO 4/13/21 AT 9:00 AM - (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/13/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/7/2021. (Hartmann, Karen)
April 8, 2021 Filing 543 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/07/2021 (172 pages) (Afternoon Docket Only) RE: Motions. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/7/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 516 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s) #114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #114 and for#163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.). Modified to include link to DE 114 on 4/7/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/7/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
April 8, 2021 Filing 542 PDF with attached Audio File **4/8/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/08/2021 05:03:37 PM]. File Size [ 12020 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:51:36 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/9/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 8, 2021 Filing 541 PDF with attached Audio File **4/8/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/08/2021 02:50:19 PM]. File Size [ 29063 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:07:40 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/8/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 8, 2021 Filing 539 PDF with attached Audio File **4/8/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/08/2021 01:15:25 PM]. File Size [ 19166 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:23:50 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/8/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 8, 2021 Filing 536 PDF with attached Audio File **4/8/21 AM SESSION** Court Date & Time [04/08/2021 09:03:37 AM]. File Size [ 40770 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:59:11 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/8/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 8, 2021 Filing 535 Declaration re: Declaration of Matthew C. Albrecht on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Albrecht Law PLLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 8, 2021 Filing 534 Declaration re: Declaration of Kenneth G. Turkel on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Bajo Cuva Cohen Turkel filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 8, 2021 Filing 525 Declaration re: Declaration of Jeffery Banish On Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 8, 2021 537 Hearing held on 4/8/2021 (RE: related document(s)#472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC) (MOTION WITHDRAWN ON THE RECORD) (Bergreen, J.)
April 8, 2021 540 HEARING HELD AND CONTINUED TO 4/13/21 AT 9:00 AM - (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/13/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)
April 8, 2021 524 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/8/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 8, 2021 538 Hearing held (RE: related document(s)#494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rif LLC). (MATTER TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT AND RESET TO 4/12/21 AT 1:30 PM; COURT WILL RULE AT THAT TIME OR BEFORE). Hearing to be held on 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #494, (Bergreen, J.)
April 7, 2021 Filing 533 PDF with attached Audio File **4/7/21 PM SESSION 4** Court Date & Time [04/07/2021 05:04:16 PM]. File Size [ 12109 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:53:04 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 7, 2021 Filing 532 PDF with attached Audio File **4/7/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/07/2021 03:15:35 PM]. File Size [ 22309 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:38:00 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 7, 2021 Filing 531 PDF with attached Audio File **4/7/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/07/2021 01:57:43 PM]. File Size [ 15251 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:06:43 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 7, 2021 Filing 530 PDF with attached Audio File **4/7/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/07/2021 01:15:43 PM]. File Size [ 6296 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:27:27 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 7, 2021 Filing 529 PDF with attached Audio File **4/7/21 AM SESSION** Court Date & Time [04/07/2021 10:32:36 AM]. File Size [ 21464 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:32:13 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 7, 2021 Filing 520 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #519 Application to employ) Motion for Expedited Consideration Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 519 Application to employ Ankura Consulting Group, LLC as Real Estate Broker Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and Appointment of Louis E. Robichaux IV as the Debtors' Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 518 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #369 Motion to borrow/incur debt Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter into Postpetition Agreement for Replacement of Roof to NRA Headquarters, #378 Application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Broker Debtor National Rifle Association of America's Application to Employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker). (Smith, Laura)
April 7, 2021 Filing 517 Response opposed to (related document(s): #504 Objection filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Acosta, H)
April 7, 2021 Filing 515 Declaration re: Declaration of Stephanie Bono on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 514 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4)). Hearing to be held on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #494, (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 513 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled to be Held on April 12, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #369 Motion to borrow/incur debt Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter into Postpetition Agreement for Replacement of Roof to NRA Headquarters, #378 Application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Broker Debtor National Rifle Association of America's Application to Employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 512 Amended Objection to (related document(s): #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Amended Objection to Attorney General of the State of New York's Designations of Depositions & rior Testimony and Designations Thereto filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 7, 2021 Filing 511 Amended Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.)Debtors' Amended Objections to Ackerman McQueen, Inc.'s Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations Thereto filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 7, 2021 Filing 510 Objection to (related document(s): #476 Notice (generic) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC)NYAG'S OBJECTIONS TO DEBTORS DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS THERETO filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Van Horn, Eric)
April 7, 2021 Filing 509 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Philip Kent Correll filed by Interested Party Wayne LaPierre. (Correll, Philip)
April 7, 2021 Filing 508 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3), #494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4)). Hearing to be held on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #494 and for #472, (Garman, Gregory)
April 7, 2021 Filing 507 Notice of Master Service List as of April 7, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 506 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#74 Order on motion to seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order); #63 Motion for relief from stay REDACTED Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie). MODIFIED linkage to include link to redacted motion on 1/28/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Preliminary hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 7, 2021 Filing 505 Objection to (related document(s): #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objections to Attorney General of the State of New York's Designations of Depositions & Prior Testimony and Designations Thereto filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 7, 2021 Filing 504 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.)Debtors' Objections to Ackerman McQueen, Inc.'s Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations Thereto filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 7, 2021 Filing 503 Declaration re: Declaration of Daniel L. Schmutter on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Hartman & Winnicki, P.C. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 502 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4)). Hearing to be held on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #494, (Neligan, Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 501 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/06/21 RE: Afternoon Session. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/6/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (RE: related document(s) 496 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) Hearing to be held on 4/7/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/6/2021. (Bowen, James)
April 7, 2021 500 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/7/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 7, 2021 516 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s) #114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/8/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #114 and for#163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.). Modified to include link to DE 114 on 4/7/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 6, 2021 Filing 649 PDF with attached Audio File **4/6/21 AM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/06/2021 10:45:20 AM]. File Size [ 17344 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:14:24 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 6, 2021 Filing 647 PDF with attached Audio File **4/6/21 AM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/06/2021 09:04:20 AM]. File Size [ 20223 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:26:45 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/20/2021 (Green, Shanette).
April 6, 2021 Filing 527 PDF with attached Audio File **4/6/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/06/2021 04:09:36 PM]. File Size [ 26794 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:57:42 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 6, 2021 Filing 526 PDF with attached Audio File **4/6/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/06/2021 01:15:26 PM]. File Size [ 36142 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:38:36 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 6, 2021 Filing 499 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/06/21 RE: Morning Session. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/6/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc., Telephone number 215-862-1115 CourtTranscripts@aol.com. (RE: related document(s) 496 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) Hearing to be held on 4/7/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/6/2021. (Hartmann, Karen)
April 6, 2021 Filing 497 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/05/2021 (204 pages) (Afternoon Docket Only) RE: Motions. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/6/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 480 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) Hearing to be held on 4/6/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/6/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
April 6, 2021 Filing 495 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #472 Motion to quash, #494 Objection) Motion for Emergency Hearing on (1) Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris and (2) Debtors' Objections to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for Which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Garman, Gregory) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #472 SET FOR HEARING ON 4/8/21 AT 9:00 AM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 4/7/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 6, 2021 Filing 494 Objection to (related document(s): #473 Notice (generic) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #475 Notice (generic) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York)Debtors' Objection to Deposition Testimony from Prior Unrelated Cases and for which Witnesses are not Unavailable and Request to Exclude the Same filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4) (Garman, Gregory)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Order granting motion for authority to pay mediation fee (related document #481) Entered on 4/6/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 6, 2021 Filing 492 Amended Witness and Exhibit List Third Amended filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#470 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Gruber, G.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Order granting application to employ AlixPartners, LLP as Financial Adviser to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document #337) Entered on 4/6/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Order granting application to employ Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP as Attorney for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document #336) Entered on 4/6/2021. (Bradden, T.)
April 6, 2021 Filing 488 Declaration re: -- Declaration of Luzmarina Vargas Regarding Summaries of Invoices filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#463 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Pronske, Gerrit)
April 6, 2021 Filing 487 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/5/2021 RE: 131, motion to dismiss case filed by Ackerman McQueen; 163, motion to appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee; 423, motion to dismiss filed by District of Columbia Attorney General, AM SESSION ONLY. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/6/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Sumner, Telephone number 2148027196. (RE: related document(s) 480 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) Hearing to be held on 4/6/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/6/2021. (Sumner, Cindy)
April 6, 2021 Filing 485 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#341 Motion for protective orderDebtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) Responses due by 4/20/2021. (Kerr, S.)
April 6, 2021 Filing 484 Amended Witness and Exhibit List Second Amended Witness and Exhibit List filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#471 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
April 6, 2021 496 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) Hearing to be held on 4/7/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)
April 6, 2021 491 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/6/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 5, 2021 Filing 523 PDF with attached Audio File **4/5/21 PM SESSION 3** Court Date & Time [04/05/2021 05:07:12 PM]. File Size [ 15425 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:07:36 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 5, 2021 Filing 522 PDF with attached Audio File **4/5/21 PM SESSION 2** Court Date & Time [04/05/2021 03:07:27 PM]. File Size [ 25991 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:53:39 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 5, 2021 Filing 521 PDF with attached Audio File **4/5/21 PM SESSION 1** Court Date & Time [04/05/2021 01:16:02 PM]. File Size [ 22234 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:36:54 ]. (admin). Modified file date on 4/20/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 5, 2021 486 INCORRECT ENTRY - Hearing set (RE: related document(s)#1 Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by National Rifle Association of America Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/17/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 05/17/2021.) Hearing to be held on 4/5/2021 at 01:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #1, (Bergreen, J.)
April 5, 2021 Filing 483 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #481 Motion to pay) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (DE #481 GRANTED ORALLY; NO HEARING REQUIRED) Modified on 4/6/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 5, 2021 Filing 482 Support/supplemental documentMaster Service List for Debtors' Motion for Authority to Pay Mediation Fee filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#481 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Page Mediation Fee). (Neligan, Patrick)
April 5, 2021 Filing 481 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion for Authority to Pay Mediation Fee Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 4/6/2021 (Kerr, S.).
April 5, 2021 Filing 479 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 03/19/2021 (31 pages) RE: Motion to Compel Discovery and Motion for Protective Order. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/6/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 430 Hearing held on 3/19/2021. (RE: related document(s)#372 Motion to compel re: discovery The State of New York to (i) Respond to Debtors' Document Requests or Admit no Documents Exist and (ii) Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED IN PART.), 431 Hearing held on 3/19/2021. (RE: related document(s)#382 Motion for protective order and to Stay Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Sheehan)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED IN PART.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/6/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
April 5, 2021 Filing 477 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#74 Order on motion to seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order); #63 Motion for relief from stay REDACTED Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie). MODIFIED linkage to include link to redacted motion on 1/28/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Preliminary hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 476 Notice Debtors' Designation of Deposition Testimony filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Garman, Gregory)
April 5, 2021 Filing 475 Notice Designation of Depositions & Prior Testimony filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Van Horn, Eric)
April 5, 2021 Filing 474 PDF with attached Audio File - **4/5/21 AM SESSION** Court Date & Time [04/05/2021 10:32:44 AM]. File Size [ 19800 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:24:54 ]. (admin). Modified on 4/5/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
April 5, 2021 Filing 473 Notice Ackerman McQueen, Inc.'s Deposition Designations for Hearing on Motion to Dismiss the Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition, or, In the Alternative, Motion for the Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Gruber, G.)
April 5, 2021 Filing 472 Motion to quash Debtors' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Erica Harris Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3) (Garman, Gregory)
April 5, 2021 Announcement of PASS TO ANOTHER PRELIMINARY HEARING regarding hearing scheduled for 4/14/2021. Hearing continued to 4/21/2021 at 02:00 per Natalie Lynn Arbaugh, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). (Arbaugh, Natalie)
April 5, 2021 480 Hearing held and continued (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1), #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).) Hearing to be held on 4/6/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #423 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, (Bergreen, J.)
April 5, 2021 478 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/5/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly (Bergreen, J.)
April 4, 2021 Filing 471 Amended Witness and Exhibit List filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#463 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Van Horn, Eric)
April 4, 2021 Filing 470 Amended Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#460 List (witness/exhibit/generic), #464 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Gruber, G.)
April 4, 2021 Filing 469 Exhibit List Debtors' Supplement to Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held Commencing April 5, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner, #131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee). (Garman, Gregory)
April 3, 2021 Filing 468 Support/supplemental documentAppendix filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#467 Reply). (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2 #2 Appendix Part 3 #3 Appendix Part 4 #4 Appendix Part 5 #5 Appendix Part 6 #6 Appendix Part 7 #7 Appendix Part 8) (Acosta, H)
April 2, 2021 586 Hearing held on 4/2/2021. (RE: related document(s)#1 Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by National Rifle Association of America Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/17/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 05/17/2021.) (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD; COURT GAVE PARTIES GUIDANCE ON TRIAL PROCEDURES.) (Green, Shanette)
April 2, 2021 Filing 467 Omnibus Reply to (related document(s): #306 Objection filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #307 Response filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC, #368 Response filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Acosta, H)
April 2, 2021 Filing 466 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Christina Carroll by Brian Edward Mason filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Mason, Brian)
April 2, 2021 Filing 465 Brief in opposition filed by Interested Party State of Texas (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee). (Lloyd, James)
April 2, 2021 Filing 464 Amended Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#460 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Acosta, H)
April 2, 2021 Filing 463 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #163 Motion to appoint trustee). (Van Horn, Eric)
April 2, 2021 Filing 462 Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held Commencing April 5, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner, #131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee). (Garman, Gregory)
April 2, 2021 Filing 461 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner, #131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #163 Motion to appoint trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss). (Watson, Marcus)
April 2, 2021 Filing 460 Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing on Ackerman McQueen's Motion to Dismiss the Chapter 11 Petition, or, in the Alternative, Motion for the Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case ). (Gruber, G.)
April 2, 2021 Filing 459 Omnibus Reply to (related document(s): #307 Response filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC, #368 Response filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Kathman, Jason)
April 2, 2021 Filing 457 Verified statement pursuant to Rule 2019 filed by Bart Skelton, Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider. (Watson, Marcus)
April 2, 2021 Filing 456 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner, #131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #163 Motion to appoint trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss). (Smith, Laura)
April 2, 2021 458 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 3/19/2021. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited (Bergreen, J.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 455 Notice of hearingon Motion In Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (RE: related document(s)#423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).). Hearing to be held on 4/5/2021 at 10:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #423, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1) (Alper, Nancy)
April 1, 2021 Filing 454 Amended Notice of hearingMotion In Support of State of New York's Motion to Appoint Trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (RE: related document(s)#214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)). Hearing to be held on 4/5/2021 at 10:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #214, (Attachments: #1 Supplement WebEx Instructions) (Alper, Nancy)
April 1, 2021 Filing 453 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of Jennifer Jones, Special Trial Counsel, Office of Attorney General for the District of Columbia by Nancy Lynn Alper filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia. (Alper, Nancy)
April 1, 2021 Filing 452 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231)). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Commercial Lease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 #3 Supplement to Commercial Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 #4 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 #5 Supplement to Commercial Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 #6 Certificate of Titles #7 Payment history(s)) (Wilcox, Stephen)
April 1, 2021 Filing 451 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#447 Application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(3) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective as of January 15, 2021 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D)). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #447, (Neligan, Patrick)
April 1, 2021 Filing 450 Notice of hearing -- Notice of Status Conference Regarding Hearing Scheduled to Begin on April 5, 2021 filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. Hearing to be held on 4/2/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale (Attachments: #1 WebEx Hearing Instructions) (Pronske, Gerrit)
April 1, 2021 Filing 449 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #447 Application to employ) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY: DE #447 SET FOR HEARING ON 4/21/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 4/1/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 31, 2021 498 Hearing held on 3/31/2021 (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE); #417 Motion for leave -- The State of New York's Motion to Preclude Debtors from Introducing Certain Evidence and Eliciting Certain Testimony They Have Shielded from Discovery Based Upon Inappropriate Privilege Assertions Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE) (Bergreen, J.)
March 31, 2021 Filing 448 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#424 Order continuing hearing (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/5/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, Entered on 3/29/2021 (Bergreen, J.)) No. of Notices: 28. Notice Date 03/31/2021. (Admin.)
March 31, 2021 Filing 447 Application to employ Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(3) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Briglia Hundley, P.C. as Special Litigation Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective as of January 15, 2021 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 31, 2021 Filing 446 Witness and Exhibit List filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner, #131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #163 Motion to appoint trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee, #423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss). (Lambert, Lisa)
March 31, 2021 Filing 445 Brief in opposition filed by Interested Party State of Arkansas (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee). (Wagner, Vincent)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Order granting motion for leave to file brief as Amici Curiae in support of Debtors; and in opposition to the State of New York's motion to dismiss, or in the alternative to appoint a chapter 11 trustee (related document #439) Entered on 3/31/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Order granting in part, Debtors' emergency motion to compel Akerman McQueen to produce a representative under FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6)(related document #391) Entered on 3/31/2021. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
March 31, 2021 Filing 442 Response opposed to (related document(s): #406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Noall, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 441 Response opposed to (related document(s): #417 Motion for leave -- The State of New York's Motion to Preclude Debtors from Introducing Certain Evidence and Eliciting Certain Testimony They Have Shielded from Discovery Based Upon Inappropriate Privilege Assertions filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J #11 Exhibit K) (Hamm, Gabrielle)
March 30, 2021 Filing 440 Declaration re: of John C. Frazer in Support of Debtors' Petitions filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Garman, Gregory)
March 30, 2021 Filing 439 Motion for leave to File Brief of Arkansas and 15 Other States as Amici Curiae in Support of Debtors, and in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss (related document(s) #131 Motion to dismiss case, #155 Motion to dismiss case, #214 Motion to appoint trustee) Filed by Interested Party State of Arkansas (Wagner, Vincent)
March 30, 2021 Filing 438 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (RE: related document(s)#416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE Filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #416, (Watson, Marcus)
March 30, 2021 Filing 437 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B)) Responses due by 4/13/2021. (Kerr, S.)
March 29, 2021 Filing 436 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (RE: related document(s)#214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)). Hearing to be held on 4/5/2021 at 10:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #214, (Alper, Nancy)
March 29, 2021 Filing 435 Notice of hearing filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (RE: related document(s)#416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE Filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 4/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #416, (Watson, Marcus)
March 29, 2021 Filing 426 AMENDED Order continuing hearing (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/5/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, Entered on 3/29/2021 (Bradden, T.)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Order continuing hearing (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, #131 Motion to dismiss case filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia). Hearing to be held on 4/5/2021 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #163 and for #114 and for #214 and for #131 and for #155, Entered on 3/29/2021 (Bergreen, J.)
March 29, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 3/29/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)) (ALL MATTERS RESET TO 4/5/21 AT 10:30 AM.) (Green, Shanette)
March 29, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 3/29/2021. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) (AGREED RESET TO 3/31/21 PER J. ACOSTA.) (Green, Shanette)
March 26, 2021 Filing 429 Joinder in support of the motion to dismiss by filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (RE: related document(s)#155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee). (Kerr, S.)
March 26, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 3/26/2021. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) (TO BE RESET TO 3/29/21 PER THE COURT.) (Green, Shanette)
March 26, 2021 Filing 423 Motion to dismiss case Motion in Support of State of New York's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Alper, Nancy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Kerr, S.).
March 26, 2021 Filing 422 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (RE: related document(s)#214 Motion to appoint trustee). (Alper, Nancy)
March 26, 2021 Filing 421 Notice of hearingMotion to Appoint Trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (RE: related document(s)#214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)). Hearing to be held on 3/29/2021 at 09:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #214, (Alper, Nancy)
March 26, 2021 Filing 420 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 3/31/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #406, (Acosta, H)
March 26, 2021 Filing 419 Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#417 Motion for leave -- The State of New York's Motion to Preclude Debtors from Introducing Certain Evidence and Eliciting Certain Testimony They Have Shielded from Discovery Based Upon Inappropriate Privilege Assertions Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Connell in Support of Motion # 2 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 3/31/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #417, (Attachments: #1 WebEx Hearing Instructions) (Pronske, Gerrit)
March 26, 2021 Filing 418 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #417 Motion for leave) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Van Horn, Eric) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #417 SET FOR HEARING ON 3/31/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 3/29/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 26, 2021 Filing 417 Motion for leave -- The State of New York's Motion to Preclude Debtors from Introducing Certain Evidence and Eliciting Certain Testimony They Have Shielded from Discovery Based Upon Inappropriate Privilege Assertions Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Connell in Support of Motion #2 Proposed Order) (Pronske, Gerrit)
March 26, 2021 Filing 416 Motion to appoint creditors committee/ MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A MEMBER COMMITTEE Filed by Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Owen "Buz" Mills, Esther Schneider (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watson, Marcus)
March 26, 2021 Filing 415 Joinder by David Dell'Aquila filed by Creditor David Dell'Aquila (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #214 Motion to appoint trustee, #368 Response). (Blackwell, Robert)
March 25, 2021 425 Hearing held on 3/25/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)) (ALL MATTERS CONTINUED TO 4/5/2021.) (Green, Shanette)
March 25, 2021 434 Hearing held on 3/25/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)) (MATTERS CONTINUED TO 4/5/21.) (Green, Shanette)
March 25, 2021 Filing 414 Response unopposed to (related document(s): #406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.) filed by Creditor Phillip Journey, Roscoe B. Marshall, Jr, Esther Schneider and Owen "Buz" Mills. (Taylor, Clay) Modified on 3/26/2021 (Kerr, S.).
March 25, 2021 Filing 413 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 3/29/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #406, (Acosta, H)
March 25, 2021 Filing 412 Notice of Limited Objection to the Debtors' Retention of Aronson LLC as an Ordinary Course Professional filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#321 Order authorizing employment and payment of professionals utilized in the ordinary course of business (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Entered on 3/9/2021 (Bradden, T.), #334 Declaration re: Declaration of Brenda L. Jayne on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Aronson LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business).). (Gluck, Kristian)
March 25, 2021 Filing 411 Notice of hearing Notice of Status Conference Regarding Hearing Set to Commence on March 29, 2021 on Motion for Appointment of Examiner (Dkt #114) and Motions to Dismiss or Appoint Trustee (Dkts #131, 155 & 163, 214) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.), #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.), #214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)). Status Conference to be held on 3/25/2021 at 11:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. (Hamm, Gabrielle)
March 24, 2021 433 Hearing held on 3/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#393 Motion for protective order Debtors Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAGs Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of Gayle Stanford Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; DENIED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 24, 2021 432 Hearing held on 3/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#391 Motion to compel re: discovery Debtors' Emergency Motion to Compel Ackerman McQueen, Inc. to Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED IN PART.) (Green, Shanette)
March 24, 2021 Filing 410 Support/supplemental documentProposed Order filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery). (Acosta, H)
March 24, 2021 Filing 409 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 3/26/2021 at 08:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #406, (Acosta, H)
March 24, 2021 Filing 408 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #406 Motion to compel re: discovery) Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Acosta, H) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #406 SET FOR HEARING ON 3/29/21 AT 1:30 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 3/25/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 24, 2021 Filing 407 Verified statement pursuant to Rule 2019 filed by Creditor Phillip Journey. (Watson, Marcus)
March 24, 2021 Filing 406 Motion to compel re: discovery Discovery Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Acosta, H)
March 24, 2021 Filing 405 US Trustee's comment(s) regarding /Statement Regarding Motions Seeking Appointment of Examiner, Trustee, or Case Dismissal (Lambert, Lisa)
March 24, 2021 Filing 404 Response opposed to (related document(s): #391 Motion to compel re: discovery Debtors' Emergency Motion to Compel Ackerman McQueen, Inc. to Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC) filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Mason, Brian)
March 23, 2021 Filing 403 Response opposed to (related document(s): #393 Motion for protective order Debtors Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAGs Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of Gayle Stanford filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration) (Van Horn, Eric)
March 23, 2021 Filing 402 Notice of Master Service List as of March 23, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 23, 2021 Filing 401 Declaration re: Declaration of Nathan Thomas on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Copilevitz, Lam & Raney, PC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 23, 2021 Filing 400 Declaration re: Amended Declaration of James A. Valente on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Costello, Valente & Gentry P.C. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 399 Amended Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period February 1, 2021 to February 28, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#396 Operating report). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 398 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#391 Motion to compel re: discovery Debtors' Emergency Motion to Compel Ackerman McQueen, Inc. to Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E), #393 Motion for protective order Debtors Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAGs Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of Gayle Stanford Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 3/24/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #393 and for #391, (Noall, William)
March 22, 2021 Filing 397 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period February 1, 2021 to February 28, 2021 filed by Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 396 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period February 1, 2021 to February 28, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 395 Notice Notice of Amended Second Amendment to National Rifle Association of America's Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 394 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #393 Motion for protective order) Motion for Emergency Hearing on Debtors Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAGs Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of Gayle Stanford Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Hamm, Gabrielle) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #393 SET FOR HEARING ON 3/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 3/22/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 22, 2021 Filing 393 Motion for protective order Debtors Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAGs Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of Gayle Stanford Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Hamm, Gabrielle)
March 22, 2021 Filing 392 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #391 Motion to compel re: discovery) Motion for Emergency Hearing on Debtors' Emergency Motion to Compel Ackerman McQueen to Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Hamm, Gabrielle) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #391 SET FOR HEARING ON 3/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 3/22/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 22, 2021 Filing 391 Motion to compel re: discovery Debtors' Emergency Motion to Compel Ackerman McQueen, Inc. to Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E) (Hamm, Gabrielle)
March 19, 2021 431 Hearing held on 3/19/2021. (RE: related document(s)#382 Motion for protective order and to Stay Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Sheehan)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED IN PART.) (Green, Shanette)
March 19, 2021 430 Hearing held on 3/19/2021. (RE: related document(s)#372 Motion to compel re: discovery The State of New York to (i) Respond to Debtors' Document Requests or Admit no Documents Exist and (ii) Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED IN PART.) (Green, Shanette)
March 19, 2021 Filing 390 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#378 Application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Broker Debtor National Rifle Association of America's Application to Employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). Hearing to be held on 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #378, (Neligan, Patrick)
March 19, 2021 Filing 389 Certificate of service re: Supplemental Declaration of David MacGreevey of AlixPartners LLP filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#388 Declaration). (Smith, Laura)
March 19, 2021 Filing 388 Declaration re: (Supplemental Declaration of David MacGreevey of AlixPartners, LLP) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#337 Application to employ AlixPartners, LLP as Financial Advisor ). (Smith, Laura)
March 19, 2021 Filing 387 Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#386 Protective Order. Entered on 3/19/2021 (Bradden, T.)). Hearing to be held on 3/19/2021 at 09:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #386, (Van Horn, Eric)
March 19, 2021 Filing 386 Protective Order. Entered on 3/19/2021 (Bradden, T.)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Order granting motion for adequate protection payments to Atlantic Union Bank (related document #282) Entered on 3/19/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 18, 2021 Filing 384 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#365 Order granting application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as chapter 11 co-counsel for the debtors (related document #132) Entered on 3/16/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/18/2021. (Admin.)
March 18, 2021 Filing 383 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #382 Motion for protective order) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kathman, Jason) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #382 SET FOR HEARING ON 3/19/21 AT 9:00 AM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 3/19/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 18, 2021 Filing 382 Motion for protective order and to Stay Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Sheehan) (Pronske, Gerrit)
March 18, 2021 Filing 381 Response opposed to (related document(s): #372 Motion to compel re: discovery The State of New York to (i) Respond to Debtors' Document Requests or Admit no Documents Exist and (ii) Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Sheehan) (Pronske, Gerrit)
March 18, 2021 Filing 380 Declaration re: Declaration of Christian D. Ambler on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Stone & Johnson, Chtd. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 18, 2021 Filing 379 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#378 Application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Broker Debtor National Rifle Association of America's Application to Employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). Hearing to be held on 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #378, (Neligan, Patrick)
March 18, 2021 Filing 378 Application to employ CBRE, Inc. as Broker Debtor National Rifle Association of America's Application to Employ CBRE, Inc. as Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 18, 2021 Filing 377 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#372 Motion to compel re: discovery The State of New York to (i) Respond to Debtors' Document Requests or Admit no Documents Exist and (ii) Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J)). Hearing to be held on 3/19/2021 at 09:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #372, (Noall, William)
March 18, 2021 Filing 376 Notice of Second Amendment to National Rifle Association of America's Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#288 Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual Amended Statement of Financial Affairs. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 17, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 3/17/2021. (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Matrix # 2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 # 3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 6 Certificate of Title on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 # 8 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442) (AGREED RESET TO 4/14/21 AT 1:30 PM PER S. WILCOX.), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC) (AGREED RESET TO 4/14/21 AT 1:30 PM PER S. WILCOX.)(Green, Shanette)
March 17, 2021 427 Hearing held on 3/17/2021. (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (RESET TO 4/12/21.) (Green, Shanette)
March 17, 2021 428 Hearing held on 3/17/2021. (RE: related document(s)#282 Motion for adequate protectionDebtors' Motion for Approval of Adequate Protection Payments to Atlantic Union Bank Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (A/O TO BE UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 17, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 3/17/2021. (RE: related document(s)#173 Application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis LLP International as Special Counsel / Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(E) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) (CERT. OF NO OBJ FILED; ORDER UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 17, 2021 Filing 375 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#369 Motion to borrow/incur debt Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter into Postpetition Agreement for Replacement of Roof to NRA Headquarters Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 3/30/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #369, (Neligan, Patrick)
March 17, 2021 Filing 374 Declaration re: Declaration of James A. Valente on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Costello, Valente & Gentry P.C. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 17, 2021 Filing 373 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #372 Motion to compel re: discovery) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Noall, William) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #372 SET FOR HEARING ON 3/19/21 AT 9:00 AM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 3/18/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 17, 2021 Filing 372 Motion to compel re: discovery The State of New York to (i) Respond to Debtors' Document Requests or Admit no Documents Exist and (ii) Produce a Representative Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J) (Noall, William)
March 16, 2021 Filing 370 Declaration re: Declaration of Eric A. Lindberg on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Corr Cronin LLP filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 16, 2021 Filing 369 Motion to borrow/incur debt Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter into Postpetition Agreement for Replacement of Roof to NRA Headquarters Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 16, 2021 Filing 368 Response opposed to (related document(s): #131 Motion to dismiss case filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Strubeck, Louis)
March 16, 2021 Filing 367 Notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 17, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Matrix # 2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 # 3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 6 Certificate of Title on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 # 8 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, #282 Motion for adequate protectionDebtors' Motion for Approval of Adequate Protection Payments to Atlantic Union Bank Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D)). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 16, 2021 Filing 366 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Matrix # 2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 # 3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 6 Certificate of Title on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 # 8 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). Preliminary hearing to be held on 4/14/2021 at 11:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. (Attachments: #1 Mailing matrix) (Wilcox, Stephen)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Order granting application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as chapter 11 co-counsel for the debtors (related document #132) Entered on 3/16/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Order granting motion to continue hearing on (related document #265) (related documents Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession) Entered on 3/16/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 16, 2021 Announcement of PASS TO ANOTHER PRELIMINARY HEARING regarding hearing scheduled for 3/17/2021. Hearing continued to 4/14/2021 at 11:30 per Stephen Wilcox, filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Matrix # 2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 # 3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 6 Certificate of Title on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 # 8 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442)). (Wilcox, Stephen)
March 16, 2021 Announcement of PASS TO ANOTHER PRELIMINARY HEARING regarding hearing scheduled for 3/17/2021. Hearing continued to 4/14/2021 at 11:30 per Stephen Wilcox, filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). (Wilcox, Stephen)
March 15, 2021 371 Hearing held on 3/15/2021. (RE: related document(s)#341 Motion for protective orderDebtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) (AGREEMENT REACHED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 15, 2021 Filing 363 Verified statement pursuant to Rule 2019 filed by Roscoe B. Marshall Jr., Phillip Journey. (Watson, Marcus)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Order granting application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP as Special Litigation Counsel effective as of January 15, 2021 (related document #173) Entered on 3/15/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 15, 2021 Filing 361 Declaration re: Declaration of Matthew K. Felty on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Lytle Soule & Felty, P.C. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 360 Declaration re: Declaration of Thomas P. Pellis on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Meyer, Darragh, Buckler, Benenek & Eck, PLLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 359 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael W. May filed by Creditor United States of America (IRS). (May, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 358 Response opposed to (related document(s): #114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner filed by Creditor Phillip Journey) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 12, 2021 Filing 357 Response opposed to (related document(s): #341 Motion for protective orderDebtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pronske, Gerrit)
March 12, 2021 Filing 356 Certificate Certificate of No Objection filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#173 Application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis LLP International as Special Counsel / Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(E) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kirk). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 12, 2021 Filing 355 Declaration re: Declaration of Charles R. Spies on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Dickinson Wright PLLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 12, 2021 Filing 354 Objection to (related document(s): #114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner filed by Creditor Phillip Journey) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Strubeck, Louis)
March 12, 2021 Filing 353 Objection to (related document(s): #84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Strubeck, Louis)
March 12, 2021 Filing 352 Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled March 17, 2021 filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #173 Application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis LLP International as Special Counsel / Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(E) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kirk, #282 Motion for adequate protectionDebtors' Motion for Approval of Adequate Protection Payments to Atlantic Union Bank). (Smith, Laura)
March 12, 2021 Filing 351 Support/supplemental document Exhibit 8 to Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for March 17, 2021 Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#350 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 12, 2021 Filing 350 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled for March 17, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #173 Application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis LLP International as Special Counsel / Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(E) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kirk, #235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231), #282 Motion for adequate protectionDebtors' Motion for Approval of Adequate Protection Payments to Atlantic Union Bank). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 12, 2021 Filing 349 Application to employ BVA Group as Financial Advisor Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of BVA Group Restructuring and Advisory LLC as Financial Advisor to the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 12, 2021 Filing 348 Declaration re: Declaration of William W. Davis in Support of Debtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take the Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#341 Motion for protective orderDebtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 12, 2021 Filing 347 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 03/09/2021 (12 pages) RE: Omnibus Hearing. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 06/10/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 330 Hearing held on 3/9/2021. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B)) (AGREED FORM OF ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.), 331 Hearing held on 3/9/2021. (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (RESET TO MARCH 17, 2021.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 06/10/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 346 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#322 Order granting debtors' motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for case professionals (related document #112) Entered on 3/9/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 22. Notice Date 03/11/2021. (Admin.)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Order granting motion for expedited hearing (Related Doc#343)(document set for hearing: #341 Motion for protective order) Hearing to be held on 3/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #341, Entered on 3/11/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 11, 2021 Filing 344 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#341 Motion for protective orderDebtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Hearing to be held on 3/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #341, (Neligan, Patrick)
March 11, 2021 Filing 343 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #341 Motion for protective order) Motion for Emergency Hearing on Debtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 11, 2021 Filing 342 Declaration re: Declaration of Gabrielle A. Hamm in Support of Debtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#341 Motion for protective orderDebtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 11, 2021 Filing 341 Motion for protective orderDebtors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Re: NYAG's Notice of Intention to Take Deposition of the Honorable Phillip Journey Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Neligan, Patrick)
March 10, 2021 Filing 340 Declaration re: Declaration of John Parker Sweeney on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 10, 2021 Filing 339 Certificate of service re: Committee Retention Applications filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#336 Application to employ Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP as Attorney , #337 Application to employ AlixPartners, LLP as Financial Advisor ). (Smith, Laura)
March 10, 2021 Filing 338 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 3/9/2021. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited (Green, Shanette).
March 10, 2021 Filing 337 Application to employ AlixPartners, LLP as Financial Advisor Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Smith, Laura)
March 10, 2021 Filing 336 Application to employ Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP as Attorney Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Smith, Laura)
March 10, 2021 Filing 335 Notice of hearingNotice of Reset Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 3/17/2021 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #78, (Neligan, Patrick)
March 10, 2021 Filing 334 Declaration re: Declaration of Brenda L. Jayne on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Aronson LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 10, 2021 Filing 333 Declaration re: Declaration of Gregory W. Lyons on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional O'Neil, Cannon, Hollman, Dejong & Laing S.C. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 10, 2021 Filing 332 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 03/02/2021 (43 pages) RE: Motion to Continue Hearing. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 06/8/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 284 Hearing held on 3/2/2021. (RE: related document(s)#265 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #84 Application to employ)Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order Continuing Until April 2021 the Hearing on Debtors' Application for Order Authorizing and Approving Employment and Retention of Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors as Special Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possesion Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 06/8/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 329 Declaration re: Declaration of Stephen Halbrook on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Stephen Halbrook, Attorney at Law filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 9, 2021 Filing 328 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 3/2/2021. The requested turn-around time is daily (Green, Shanette)
March 9, 2021 Filing 327 Declaration re: Amended Declaration of Raymond DiGuiseppe on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional The DiGuiseppe Law Firm PC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 9, 2021 Filing 326 Declaration re: Declaration of Christopher M. Day on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Juris Day PLLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 9, 2021 Filing 325 Notice Master Service List as of March 9, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Dylan Thomas Ciciliano for National Rifle Association of America (related document #303) Entered on 3/9/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Talitha Beth Gray Kozlowski for National Rifle Association of America (related document #302) Entered on 3/9/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Order granting debtors' motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for case professionals (related document #112) Entered on 3/9/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Order authorizing employment and payment of professionals utilized in the ordinary course of business (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Entered on 3/9/2021 (Bradden, T.)
March 9, 2021 Filing 320 Declaration re: Declaration of Michael Loukota on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Founds Series of Lockton Companies LLC f/k/a Kansas City Series of Lockton Companies, LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Order granting application to employ Neligan LLP as Counsel to the debtor (related document #82) Entered on 3/9/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 9, 2021 Filing 318 Declaration re: Declaration of Raymond M. DiGuiseppe on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional The DiGuiseppe Law Firm, P.C. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 9, 2021 331 Hearing held on 3/9/2021. (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (RESET TO MARCH 17, 2021.) (Green, Shanette)
March 9, 2021 330 Hearing held on 3/9/2021. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B)) (AGREED FORM OF ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 9, 2021 Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. See original 341 notice for call-in information. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/12/2021 at 01:00 PM by TELEPHONE. (Lambert, Lisa)
March 9, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 3/9/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order)) (DE #114 TO BE RESET TO 3/29 PER HEARING HELD 2/24.) (Green, Shanette)
March 8, 2021 Filing 317 Declaration re: Declaration of William W. Davis on Behalf of Ordinary Course Professional William W. Davis, Esq. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Filing 316 Declaration re: Declaration of George M. Lee on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Seiler Epstein LLP filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Filing 315 INCORRECT ENTRY: Incomplete pdf attached. Declaration re: Declaration of Raymond M. DiGuiseppe on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional The DiGuiseppe Law Firm, P.C. filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 3/9/2021 (Kerr, S.).
March 8, 2021 Filing 314 Declaration re: Declaration of Donald P. Lan, Jr. on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Lan, Smith, Sosolik, Baxter-Thompson & Johnston, PLLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Filing 313 Declaration re: Declaration of Jason Torchinsky on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Filing 312 Declaration re: Declaration of Jeffrey H. Greger on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Hauptman Ham, LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Filing 311 Declaration re: Declaration of Jacqueline R. Scott on Behalf of Proposed Ordinary Course Professional Fortney & Scott, LLC filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Filing 310 Notice of change of address filed by Creditor Racine County Line Rifle Club Inc. . (Rielly, Bill)
March 8, 2021 Filing 309 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 9, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 7, 2021 Filing 308 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#295 Order approving certain notice and confidentiality procedures (related document #77) Entered on 3/5/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 03/07/2021. (Admin.)
March 6, 2021 Filing 307 Omnibus Response opposed to (related document(s): #131 Motion to dismiss case filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Garman, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Filing 306 Objection to (related document(s): #131 Motion to dismiss case filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc., #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #214 Motion to appoint trustee filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia) filed by Creditor Phillip Journey. (Watson, Marcus)
March 5, 2021 Filing 305 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b)). (Smith, Laura)
March 5, 2021 Filing 304 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James F. Chiu filed by Interested Party State of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Government Attorney Certification) (Chiu, James)
March 5, 2021 Filing 303 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Dylan T. Ciciliano. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Neligan, Patrick)
March 5, 2021 Filing 302 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Talitha Gray Kozlowski. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Neligan, Patrick)
March 5, 2021 Filing 301 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#282 Motion for adequate protectionDebtors' Motion for Approval of Adequate Protection Payments to Atlantic Union Bank Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D)). Hearing to be held on 3/17/2021 at 02:00 PM via Webex: https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale for #282, (Neligan, Patrick) Modified to add Webex link on 3/11/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 5, 2021 Filing 300 Amended Notice of Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 5, 2021 Filing 299 Notice of hearingAmended Notice of Reset Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 3/9/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #78 and for #5, (Neligan, Patrick)
March 5, 2021 Filing 298 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held on March 9, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b)). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 5, 2021 Filing 296 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Heather M. Crockett filed by Interested Party State of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Government Attorney Certification) (Crockett, Heather)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Order approving certain notice and confidentiality procedures (related document #77) Entered on 3/5/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Order granting motion to continue hearing on (related document #208) (related documents Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner) Hearing to be held on 3/29/2021 at 10:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #114, Entered on 3/5/2021. (Bradden, T.)
March 5, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28539031, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#302). (U.S. Treasury)
March 5, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28539031, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#303). (U.S. Treasury)
March 4, 2021 297 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) (GRANTED; K&L WILL FILE A SEPARATE APPLICATION.) (Green, Shanette)
March 4, 2021 Filing 288 Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual Amended Statement of Financial Affairs. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 287 Schedules: E/F, with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 286 Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 285 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#282 Motion for adequate protectionDebtors' Motion for Approval of Adequate Protection Payments to Atlantic Union Bank Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D)). Hearing to be held on 3/17/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #282, (Neligan, Patrick)
March 4, 2021 289 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)) (FINAL ORDER ENTERED 3/2/21.) (Green, Shanette)
March 4, 2021 290 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) (APPROVED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 4, 2021 292 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.)) (GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 4, 2021 291 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_Retention Application Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B_Declaration of M. Collins # 3 Exhibit C_Declaration of Meadows # 4 Exhibit D_Declaration of Frazer # 5 Exhibit E_Disclosure)) (RESET UNTIL AFTER TRUSTEE HEARING HAS BEEN RULED ON.) (Green, Shanette)
March 4, 2021 293 Hearing held on 3/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) (APPROVED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 3, 2021 Filing 283 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #282 Motion for adequate protection) Motion for Expedited Consideration Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #282 SET FOR HEARING ON 3/17/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 3, 2021 Filing 282 Motion for adequate protectionDebtors' Motion for Approval of Adequate Protection Payments to Atlantic Union Bank Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 3, 2021 Filing 281 Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for March 4, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C), #90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C), #112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.), #132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 3, 2021 Filing 280 Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Responses due by 3/17/2021. (Kerr, S.)
March 2, 2021 284 Hearing held on 3/2/2021. (RE: related document(s)#265 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #84 Application to employ)Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order Continuing Until April 2021 the Hearing on Debtors' Application for Order Authorizing and Approving Employment and Retention of Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors as Special Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possesion Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Order Denying MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (related document #164) Entered on 3/2/2021. (Okafor, M.)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Order granting application to employ Colliers International as Broker (related document #115) Entered on 3/2/2021. (Okafor, M.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 277 Final Order Authorizing Debtors' to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief (related document #6) Entered on 3/2/2021. (Okafor, M.)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Order granting motion for expedited hearing (Related Doc#271)(document set for hearing: #265 Motion to continue on #85 Application to employ) Hearing to be held on 3/2/2021 at 03:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #265, Entered on 3/2/2021. (Okafor, M.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 275 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#265 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #84 Application to employ)Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order Continuing Until April 2021 the Hearing on Debtors' Application for Order Authorizing and Approving Employment and Retention of Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors as Special Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possesion Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 3/2/2021 at 03:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #265, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Webex Information) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 2, 2021 Filing 274 Trustee's Objection to Motion to Continue Application to Employ Brewer Firm as Special Counsel (RE: related document(s)#265 Motion to continue) (Lambert, Lisa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 273 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession). (Collins, Michael)
March 1, 2021 Filing 272 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession). (Gruber, G.)
March 1, 2021 Filing 271 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #265 Motion to continue) Motion for Expedited Consideration Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified to remove text "granted orally" on 3/2/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
March 1, 2021 Filing 270 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled for March 4, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor, #90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business, #112 Motion to establish procedures R INTERIM COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES FOR CERTAIN PROFESSIONALS., #132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 1, 2021 Filing 269 Response unopposed to (related document(s): #82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, #132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Strubeck, Louis)
March 1, 2021 Filing 268 Objection to (related document(s): #166 Objection)Debtor's Application for Entry of Order Pursuant to Sections 105(A), 327(E), 329 and 1107(B) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention Effective as of the Petition Date of Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors as Special Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession and Joinder in the United States Trustee's Objection filed by Creditor David Dell'Aquila. (Blackwell, Robert)
March 1, 2021 Filing 267 Declaration re: Amended Declaration of Patrick J. Neligan, Jr. in Support of Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtors filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor). (Neligan, Patrick)
March 1, 2021 Filing 266 Amended Witness and Exhibit List in Connection with Hearing on Application to Employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RE: related document(s)#180 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - NRA 990 #2 Exhibit K Transcript Lockton Hearing) (Lambert, Lisa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 265 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #84 Application to employ)Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order Continuing Until April 2021 the Hearing on Debtors' Application for Order Authorizing and Approving Employment and Retention of Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors as Special Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possesion Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
March 1, 2021 Filing 264 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert Alan Blackwell filed by Creditor David Dell'Aquila. (Blackwell, Robert)
March 1, 2021 Filing 258 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor, #84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession, #132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors). (Smith, Laura)
March 1, 2021 Filing 250 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David William Parham filed by Creditor UKG Inc f/k/a The Ultimate Software Group Inc. (Parham, David)
February 28, 2021 Filing 249 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#245 Order granting motion to honor pre-petition obligations related to customer, donor and member programs (related document #76) Entered on 2/26/2021.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/28/2021. (Admin.)
February 27, 2021 Filing 248 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#234 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Curtis L. Tuggle for InfoCision Management Corporation (related document #225) Entered on 2/25/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/27/2021. (Admin.)
February 27, 2021 Filing 247 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#233 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Arthur A. Greenberg for Member Marketing Partners LLC (related document #212) Entered on 2/25/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/27/2021. (Admin.)
February 26, 2021 Filing 246 Certificate of service re: The State of New York's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, #156 Brief). (Van Horn, Eric)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Order granting motion to honor pre-petition obligations related to customer, donor and member programs (related document #76) Entered on 2/26/2021. (Rielly, Bill)
February 26, 2021 Filing 244 Notice of Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 25, 2021 Filing 243 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of Leonor Miranda, Assistant Attorney General by Nancy Lynn Alper filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia. (Alper, Nancy)
February 25, 2021 Filing 242 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of Catherine Jackson, Assistant Attorney General by Nancy Lynn Alper filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia. (Alper, Nancy)
February 25, 2021 Filing 241 INCORRECT ENTRY: INCORRECT EVENT CODE RE - Notice of hearingNotice of Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. Hearing to be held on 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 2/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 25, 2021 Filing 240 Notice of hearingNotice of Reset Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C), #112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.)). Hearing to be held on 3/4/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #112 and for #90, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 25, 2021 Filing 239 Notice of hearingNotice of Reset Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 3/9/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #78 and for #5, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 25, 2021 Filing 238 Affidavit filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231)). (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 25, 2021 Filing 237 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Matrix # 2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 # 3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 6 Certificate of Title on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 # 8 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442), #236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). Preliminary hearing to be held on 3/17/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 25, 2021 Filing 236 Amended Motion for adequate protection (related document: #231) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 25, 2021 Filing 235 Amended Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection (related document: #230) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix #2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 #3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 #4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 #5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 #6 Certificate of Title on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 #7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 #8 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442) (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Curtis L. Tuggle for InfoCision Management Corporation (related document #225) Entered on 2/25/2021. (Bradden, T.)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Arthur A. Greenberg for Member Marketing Partners LLC (related document #212) Entered on 2/25/2021. (Bradden, T.)
February 25, 2021 Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. See original 341 notice for call-in information. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/5/2021 at 01:00 PM by TELEPHONE. (Lambert, Lisa)
February 24, 2021 Filing 263 Court admitted exhibits date of hearing 02/24/2021. MOVANT EXHIBITS A-E ADMITTED FILED AT DKT #185. UST EXHIBITS 1-3 ADMITTED FILED AT DKT #226. (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC Objections due by 3/9/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order)) (Green, Shanette).
February 24, 2021 255 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)) (TO BE RESET TO 3/4/21.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (AGREED RESET TO 3/4/21 PER J. GAITHER.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 254 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 252 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)) (RESET TO 3/4/21; ORDER AGREED W/ PBGC AND COMMITTEE.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 251 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B)) (RESET TO 3/9/21.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_Retention Application Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B_Declaration of M. Collins # 3 Exhibit C_Declaration of Meadows # 4 Exhibit D_Declaration of Frazer # 5 Exhibit E_Disclosure)) (AGREED RESET TO 3/4/21 PER J. GAITHER.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 253 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.).) (RESET TO APRIL.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 Hearing NOT held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (AGREED RESET TO 3/4/21 PER J. GAITHER.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 261 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey.) (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 262 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#208 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #114 Motion to appoint trustee) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED; MR. PRONSKE TO UPLOAD ORDER.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 260 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC Objections due by 3/9/2021.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION DENIED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 256 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO 3/4/21.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 257 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.)) (RESET TO 3/4/21.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 259 Hearing held on 2/24/2021. (RE: related document(s)#115 Application to employ Colliers International as Broker Application for Order Authorizing the Employment of Colliers International as the Debtors' Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Proposed Order)) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 24, 2021 Filing 232 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (RE: related document(s)#230 Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC Objections due by 3/10/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Matrix # 2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 # 3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 # 5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 6 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 # 7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 # 8 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442), #231 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). Preliminary hearing to be held on 3/25/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 24, 2021 Filing 231 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 24, 2021 Filing 230 Motion for relief from stay or, in the alternative, request for adequate protection Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC Objections due by 3/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix #2 Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 #3 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 #4 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJK1JT1HEA54902 #5 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 #6 Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement dated April 25, 2018 on a 2018 Ford Explorer, Vehicle Identification Number 1FM5K8DH3JGB04775 #7 Supplement to Commercialease Master Lease Agreement dated July 5, 2014 on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442 #8 Certificate of Title on a 2017 Ford Expedition, Vehicle Identification Number 1FMJU1JT2HEA85442) (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 24, 2021 Filing 229 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen Wilcox filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Wilcox, Stephen)
February 24, 2021 Filing 228 SEALED document regarding: Debtors' Opposition to Motion of Christopher W. Cox to Modify the Automatic Stay per court order filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#177 Order on motion to seal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Neligan, Patrick)
February 24, 2021 Filing 227 Declaration re: MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Ross, Judith)
February 24, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion for relief from stay(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00). Receipt number 28514269, amount $ 188.00 (re: Doc#230). (U.S. Treasury)
February 23, 2021 Filing 226 Witness and Exhibit List in Connection with Emergency Hearing on MMP's Motion for an Order Requiring the U.S. Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended List of 20 Largest #2 Exhibit 2 - DellAquilla Second Amended Complaint #3 Exhibit 3 DellAquilla Memorandum Opinion) (Lambert, Lisa)
February 23, 2021 Filing 225 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Curtis L. Tuggle. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor InfoCision Management Corporation (Gordon, Sean)
February 23, 2021 Filing 224 Objection to (related document(s): #208 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #114 Motion to appoint trustee) filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York) filed by Creditor Phillip Journey. (Watson, Marcus)
February 23, 2021 Filing 223 Declaration re: MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Ross, Judith)
February 23, 2021 Filing 222 Notice Master Service List 2/23/2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 23, 2021 Filing 221 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#74 Order on motion to seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order); #63 Motion for relief from stay REDACTED Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie). MODIFIED linkage to include link to redacted motion on 1/28/2021 (Bergreen, J.).). Hearing to be held on 4/14/2021 at 11:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #75 and for #63, (Arbaugh, Natalie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 219 Certificate of service re: Reply to U.S. Trustees Objection to MMPs Motion for an Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (RE: related document(s)#218 Response). (Ross, Judith)
February 23, 2021 Filing 218 Response opposed to (related document(s): #194 Objection) filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Murray Drechsler) (Ross, Judith)
February 23, 2021 Filing 217 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 24, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.)., #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C), #112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.), #115 Application to employ Colliers International as Broker Application for Order Authorizing the Employment of Colliers International as the Debtors' Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Proposed Order), #164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC Objections due by 3/9/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order), #208 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #114 Motion to appoint trustee) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 23, 2021 Filing 216 Response unopposed to (related document(s): #164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 23, 2021 Filing 215 Notice Master Service List as of 2/23/2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 23, 2021 Filing 214 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1) (Alper, Nancy)
February 23, 2021 Filing 213 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Nancy Lynn Alper filed by Creditor District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia. (Alper, Nancy)
February 23, 2021 Filing 212 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Arthur A. Greenberg. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (Ross, Judith)
February 23, 2021 Filing 210 Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#208 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #114 Motion to appoint trustee) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #208, (Van Horn, Eric)
February 23, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28511140, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#225). (U.S. Treasury)
February 23, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28509713, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#212). (U.S. Treasury)
February 22, 2021 Filing 220 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by creditor and interested party Rickey Schroeder, as Co-Trustee of The Legal Advocacy Committee for Arms Creditors with Integrity Trust, filed by Michael E Reznick . (Hyden, Kara)
February 22, 2021 Filing 211 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order)). Status Conference to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. (Kerr, S.)
February 22, 2021 Filing 209 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #208 Motion to continue) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kathman, Jason) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #208 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 2/23/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 22, 2021 Filing 208 Motion to continue hearing on (related documents #114 Motion to appoint trustee) Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kathman, Jason)
February 22, 2021 Filing 207 Certificate of service re: Application to Employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP as Special Counsel filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#173 Application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis LLP International as Special Counsel / Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(E) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kirk). (Bennett, Ryan)
February 22, 2021 Filing 206 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#173 Application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis LLP International as Special Counsel / Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(E) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). Hearing to be held on 3/17/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #173, (Bennett, Ryan)
February 22, 2021 Filing 205 Notice of hearingNotice of Reset Hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C), #84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_Retention Application Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B_Declaration of M. Collins # 3 Exhibit C_Declaration of Meadows # 4 Exhibit D_Declaration of Frazer # 5 Exhibit E_Disclosure), #132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). Hearing to be held on 3/4/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #132 and for #82 and for #84, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 22, 2021 Filing 204 INCORRECT ENTRY: Incorrect event used. See enty #211 Notice of Status Conference filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order)). (Watson, Marcus) Modified on 2/23/2021 (Kerr, S.).
February 22, 2021 Filing 203 Response unopposed to (related document(s): #164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC) filed by Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Baird, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Filing 202 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period 1/15/2021 to 1/31/2021 filed by Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 22, 2021 Filing 201 Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period 1/15/2021 to 1/31/2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 22, 2021 Filing 200 Certificate of service re: Final Order Prohibiting Utilities from Alter, Refusing or Discontinuing Service filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#170 Order on first day motion). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 22, 2021 Filing 199 Certificate of service re: Final Order Extending Time to File Schedules and Statements, Second Interim Order Authorizing Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Final Order Authorizing Debtors to Pay Prepetition Taxes filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#167 Order on motion to extend/shorten time, #168 Order on first day motion, #169 Order on motion to pay tax debts). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 21, 2021 Filing 197 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#183 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Teresa M. Pilatowicz for National Rifle Association of America (related document #154) Entered on 2/19/2021. (Okafor, M.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/21/2021. (Admin.)
February 21, 2021 Filing 196 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#182 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding William M. Noall for National Rifle Association of America (related document #153) Entered on 2/19/2021. (Okafor, M.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/21/2021. (Admin.)
February 21, 2021 Filing 195 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#181 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Gregory E. Garman for National Rifle Association of America (related document #152) Entered on 2/19/2021. (Okafor, M.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/21/2021. (Admin.)
February 21, 2021 Filing 194 Trustee's Objection to MMPs Motion for an Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave) (Lambert, Lisa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 198 Joinder to US Trustee objection filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#193 Objection). (Kerr, S.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 193 Objection to (related document(s): #84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America)and Joinder in the United States Trustee Objection to the Brewer Application Related document(s) #166 Objection filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Gruber, G.). Modified on 2/22/2021 (Kerr, S.).
February 19, 2021 Filing 192 Agreed Order granting emergency joint motion for adequate protection agreement (related document #106) Entered on 2/19/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 191 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held on February 24, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs, #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor, #84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession, #115 Application to employ Colliers International as Broker Application for Order Authorizing the Employment of Colliers International as the Debtors' Real Estate Broker, #132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18 #2 Exhibit 19 #3 Exhibit 20 #4 Exhibit 21) (Neligan, Patrick)
February 19, 2021 Filing 190 Notice of hearing filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York, #163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.)). Hearing to be held on 3/29/2021 at 10:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #163 and for #155, (Attachments: #1 Creditor Matrix) (Pronske, Gerrit)
February 19, 2021 Filing 189 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs, #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business, #112 Motion to establish procedures R INTERIM COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES FOR CERTAIN PROFESSIONALS., #115 Application to employ Colliers International as Broker Application for Order Authorizing the Employment of Colliers International as the Debtors' Real Estate Broker, #164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Smith, Laura)
February 19, 2021 Filing 188 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Nick J. Hendrix filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Hendrix, Nick)
February 19, 2021 Filing 187 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Scott P. Drake filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Drake, Scott)
February 19, 2021 Filing 186 Certificate of service re: Witness & Exhibit List for Hearing Scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 2:00 P.M. filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (RE: related document(s)#185 List (witness/exhibit/generic)). (Ross, Judith)
February 19, 2021 Filing 185 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E) (Ross, Judith)
February 19, 2021 Filing 184 Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Amended 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Teresa M. Pilatowicz for National Rifle Association of America (related document #154) Entered on 2/19/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding William M. Noall for National Rifle Association of America (related document #153) Entered on 2/19/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Gregory E. Garman for National Rifle Association of America (related document #152) Entered on 2/19/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 18, 2021 Filing 180 Witness and Exhibit List in Connection with Hearing on Application to Employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit I #9 Exhibit D) (Lambert, Lisa)
February 18, 2021 Filing 179 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#170 Final Order (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (related document #8) Entered on 2/16/2021. (Okafor, M.)) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.)
February 18, 2021 Filing 178 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#168 Second Interim Order Authorizing Debtors' to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (related document #5) Entered on 2/16/2021. (Okafor, M.)) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Order Granting Motion to file Under Seal Certain Portions of and Exhibits to Debtors' Response to Christopher Cox Motion to Lift Stay. Related document(s) 63 Motion for relief from stays (related document #123) Entered on 2/18/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 18, 2021 Filing 176 Affidavit for Proof of Publication filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#80 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 18, 2021 Filing 175 Amended Schedules: A/B, H, (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 18, 2021 Filing 174 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 02/10/2021 (31 pages) RE: Motions. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 05/19/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 137 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.), 138 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO THE 24TH; SECOND INTERIM ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.), 139 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO THE 24TH.), 140 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINAL ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.), 141 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINAL ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.), 142 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO THE 2/24/21.), 143 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.), 144 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO 2/24/21.), 145 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#106 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc.) (ORDER AGREED AS TO FORM TO BE UPLOADED.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 05/19/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
February 17, 2021 Filing 173 Application to employ Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis LLP International as Special Counsel / Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(E) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Bennett, Ryan)
February 17, 2021 Filing 172 Joinder by filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner, #131 Motion to dismiss case , #155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee). (Arbaugh, Natalie)
February 17, 2021 Filing 171 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (RE: related document(s)#164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC Objections due by 3/9/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #164, (Ross, Judith)
February 16, 2021 Filing 170 Final Order (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (related document #8) Entered on 2/16/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 169 Final Order Authorizing Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (related document #7) Entered on 2/16/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 168 Second Interim Order Authorizing Debtors' to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (related document #5) Entered on 2/16/2021. (Okafor, M.)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order granting #4 Motion to extend time. Entered on 2/16/2021. (Ecker, C.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 166 Trustee's Objection to Application to Employ Brewer, Attorneys and Counselors, as Special Counsel for the Estate (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ) (Lambert, Lisa)
February 16, 2021 Filing 165 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #164 Motion for leave) Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ross, Judith) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #164 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 2/17/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 16, 2021 Filing 164 Motion for leave MMP's Motion for An Order Requiring the United States Trustee to Reconstitute the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC Objections due by 3/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Proposed Order) (Ross, Judith)
February 15, 2021 Filing 162 Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 15, 2021 Filing 161 Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 15, 2021 Filing 160 Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of deficiency). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 15, 2021 Filing 159 Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Jointly Administered Party/Debtor Sea Girt, LLC (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of deficiency). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 15, 2021 Filing 158 Joinder by the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Debtors' Opposition to the Motion of Christopher W. Cox to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#121 Objection). (Gluck, Kristian)
February 12, 2021 Filing 163 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Kerr, S.)
February 12, 2021 Filing 157 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Scott Drake and Nick Hendrix by Laura Lynn Smith filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Smith, Laura)
February 12, 2021 Filing 156 Brief in support filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (RE: related document(s)#155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee). (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Pronske, Gerrit)
February 12, 2021 Filing 155 Motion to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York (Pronske, Gerrit)
February 12, 2021 Filing 154 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Teresa M. Pilatowicz. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Neligan, Patrick)
February 12, 2021 Filing 153 Motion to appear pro hac vice for William M. Noall. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Neligan, Patrick)
February 12, 2021 Filing 152 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Gregory E. Garman. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Neligan, Patrick)
February 12, 2021 Filing 151 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Judith W. Ross filed by Creditor Member Marketing Partners LLC. (Ross, Judith)
February 12, 2021 Filing 150 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.)). Hearing to be held on 3/29/2021 at 10:30 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #131, (Acosta, H)
February 12, 2021 Filing 149 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 2/10/2021. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited (Green, Shanette)
February 12, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28492500, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#152). (U.S. Treasury)
February 12, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28492500, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#154). (U.S. Treasury)
February 12, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28492500, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#153). (U.S. Treasury)
February 11, 2021 Filing 148 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #132, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 11, 2021 Filing 147 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #78 and for #6 and for #5 and for #76, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 10, 2021 Filing 146 Court admitted exhibits date of hearing 02/10/2021. QUAD/GRAPHICS, INC. EXHIBITS 1,2, AND 3 ADMITTED (FILED AT DKT #118.) (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B), #106 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Green, Shanette).
February 10, 2021 Filing 136 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #112, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 10, 2021 Filing 135 Certificate of service re: Application to Employ Garner Turner Gordon LLP filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors, #133 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #132 Application to employ) ). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 10, 2021 Filing 134 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#115 Application to employ Colliers International as Broker Application for Order Authorizing the Employment of Colliers International as the Debtors' Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #115, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 10, 2021 Filing 133 Motion for expedited hearing (related documents #132 Application to employ) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #132 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 2/11/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 10, 2021 Filing 132 Application to employ Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Attorney Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment of Garman Turner Gordon LLP as Chapter 11 Co-Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Neligan, Patrick)
February 10, 2021 Filing 131 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Creditor Ackerman McQueen, Inc. (Gruber, G.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 130 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (RE: related document(s)#114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 3/9/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #114, (Watson, Marcus)
February 10, 2021 143 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 145 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#106 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc.) (ORDER AGREED AS TO FORM TO BE UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 144 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO 2/24/21.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 140 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINAL ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 141 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINAL ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 139 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO THE 24TH.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 142 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO THE 2/24/21.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 138 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (RESET TO THE 24TH; SECOND INTERIM ORDER TO BE UPLOADED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 10, 2021 137 Hearing held on 2/10/2021. (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
February 9, 2021 Filing 129 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix, #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief, #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes, #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate, #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs, #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures, #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #106 Motion for adequate protection). (Smith, Laura)
February 9, 2021 Filing 128 Amended Notice Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 10, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #106 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 9, 2021 Filing 127 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held on February 10, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix, #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes, #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate, #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures, #106 Motion for adequate protection). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 9, 2021 Filing 126 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Louis R. Strubeck Jr. filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Strubeck, Louis)
February 9, 2021 Filing 125 Complex Service List Master Service List as of February 9, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#53 Order granting complex chapter 11 treatment). (Neligan, Patrick)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Robert Lapowsky for The Bancorp Bank (related document #104) Entered on 2/9/2021. (Bradden, T.)
February 8, 2021 Filing 123 Motion to file Under Seal Certain Portions of and Exhibits to Debtors' Response to Christopher Cox Motion to Lift Stay. Related document(s) #63 Motion for relief from stay Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox)Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.) . Modified on 2/9/2021 (Kerr, S.).
February 8, 2021 Filing 122 INCORRECT ENTRY: Incorrect event used. See entry #123 Motion for leave Debtors' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Portions of and Exhibits to Debtors' Response to Christopher Cox Motion to Lift Stay (related document(s) #63 Motion for relief from stay) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Objections due by 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 2/9/2021 (Kerr, S.).
February 8, 2021 Filing 121 Objection (REDACTED) to (related document(s): #63 Motion for relief from stay Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox)Debtors' Opposition to Motion of Christopher W. Cox to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick) Modified text to indicate"redacted" on 2/9/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 8, 2021 Filing 120 Notice of change of address filed by Creditor Communications Corp of America . (Tello, Chris)
February 8, 2021 Filing 118 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#106 Motion for adequate protection). (Ralston, Mark)
February 8, 2021 Filing 117 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 10, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America, #106 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). (Neligan, Patrick). Modified on 2/9/2021 (Kerr, S.).
February 8, 2021 Filing 116 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #115 Application to employ) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #115 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 2/9/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 8, 2021 Filing 115 Application to employ Colliers International as Broker Application for Order Authorizing the Employment of Colliers International as the Debtors' Real Estate Broker Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
February 8, 2021 Filing 114 Motion to appoint trustee/ Motion for Appointment of Examiner Filed by Creditor Phillip Journey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Proposed Order) (Watson, Marcus)
February 8, 2021 119 INCORRECT ENTRY: NO PDF ATTACHED. Notice of change of address filed by Creditor Communications Corp of America . (Tello, Chris) Modified on 2/8/2021 (Tello, Chris).
February 5, 2021 Filing 113 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#106 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 2/10/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #106, (Ralston, Mark)
February 4, 2021 Filing 112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Kerr, S.)
February 4, 2021 Filing 111 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Marcus Jermaine Watson filed by Creditor Phillip Journey. (Watson, Marcus)
February 4, 2021 Filing 110 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #112 Motion to establish procedures for interim compensation and reimbursement of expenses for certain professionals Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #110 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 2/8/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 4, 2021 Filing 109 INCORRECT ENTRY. INCORRECT EVENT USED, SEE ENTRY #112 Motion to pay Debtors' Motion to Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Certain Professionals Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 2/5/2021 (Kerr, S.).
February 4, 2021 Filing 108 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_Retention Application Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B_Declaration of M. Collins # 3 Exhibit C_Declaration of Meadows # 4 Exhibit D_Declaration of Frazer # 5 Exhibit E_Disclosure)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #84, (Collins, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 107 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #106 Motion for adequate protection) Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ralston, Mark) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #106 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/10/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 2/4/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 4, 2021 Filing 106 Motion for adequate protection Filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ralston, Mark)
February 4, 2021 Filing 105 U.S. Trustee's appointment of committee of Unsecured Creditors (Lambert, Lisa)
February 4, 2021 Filing 104 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Robert Lapowsky. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor The Bancorp Bank (Marshall, Joe)
February 4, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28468242, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#104). (U.S. Treasury)
February 3, 2021 Filing 103 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Donald Hogan Cram III filed by Interested Party Severson & Werson, A Professional Corporation. (Cram, Donald)
February 3, 2021 Filing 102 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joe E. Marshall filed by Creditor The Bancorp Bank. (Marshall, Joe)
February 2, 2021 Filing 101 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark H. Ralston filed by Creditor Quad/Graphics, Inc.. (Ralston, Mark)
February 2, 2021 Filing 100 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #90, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 99 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 2/10/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #77 and for #78 and for #76, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 98 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #82, (Neligan, Patrick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 97 Notice of Master Service List filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 96 Clerk's correspondence requesting Creditors uploaded from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#89 Creditor matrix amended to add additional creditor(s). Fee Amount $32Debtors' Amended Creditor Matrix. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) Responses due by 2/3/2021. (Kerr, S.)
February 2, 2021 Filing 95 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eric M. Van Horn filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Van Horn, Eric)
February 2, 2021 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James Sheehan, Emily Stern and Monica Connell by Gerrit M. Pronske filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Pronske, Gerrit)
February 2, 2021 Filing 93 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jason Patrick Kathman filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Kathman, Jason)
February 2, 2021 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gerrit M. Pronske filed by Interested Party Attorney General of the State of New York. (Pronske, Gerrit)
February 1, 2021 Filing 91 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #90 Application to employ) Motion for Expedited Consideration Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #90 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/24/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 2/2/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
February 1, 2021 Filing 90 Application to employ Ordinary Course Professionals as Attorney Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Employment and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Neligan, Patrick)
February 1, 2021 Filing 89 Creditor matrix amended to add additional creditor(s). Fee Amount $32Debtors' Amended Creditor Matrix. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
February 1, 2021 Filing 88 Notice of change of address filed by Creditor Under Wild Skies . (Rielly, Bill)
February 1, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Matrix(21-30085-hdh11) [misc,matrix] ( 32.00). Receipt number 28459307, amount $ 32.00 (re: Doc#89). (U.S. Treasury)
January 30, 2021 Filing 86 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#74 Order granting motion to seal certain portions of and exhibits to his motion (I)to modify the automatic stay to allow a trial-ready arbitration to proceed against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for related relief (related document #65) Entered on 1/28/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/30/2021. (Admin.)
January 30, 2021 Filing 85 Certificate of service re: Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 327(e), 328(a), 329 and 1107(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession). (Collins, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 84 Application to employ Brewer Attorneys & Counselors as Attorney as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Retention Application Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B_Declaration of M. Collins #3 Exhibit C_Declaration of Meadows #4 Exhibit D_Declaration of Frazer #5 Exhibit E_Disclosure) (Collins, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 83 Certificate of service re: Various Motions filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs, #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures, #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b), #82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 29, 2021 Filing 82 Application to employ Neligan LLP as Attorney Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Neligan LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 29, 2021 Filing 81 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). Hearing to be held on 2/10/2021 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #77 and for #78 and for #76, (Neligan, Patrick)
January 28, 2021 Filing 80 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 5/24/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/23/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 28, 2021 Filing 79 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #76 Motion to pay pre-petition debt, #77 First Day Motion, #78 First Day Motion) Motion for Expedited Consideration Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #76, #77, #78 SET FOR HEARING ON 2/10/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 1/29/2021 (Bergreen, J.). Modified hearing time on 2/2/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
January 28, 2021 Filing 78 Motion to maintain bank accounts Waiver of Requirements of Section 345(b). Debtors' Motion for Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 28, 2021 Filing 77 Motion to establish procedures Notice and Confidentiality Procedures. Debtors' Motion for Approval of Certain Notice and Confidentiality Procedures Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 28, 2021 Filing 76 Motion to pay pre-petition debtDebtors' Motion for Authority to Honor Prepetition Obligations Related to Customer, Donor and Member Programs Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 28, 2021 Filing 75 SEALED Motion to (I) Modify the Automatic Stay to Allow a Trial-Ready Arbitration to Proceed Against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for Related Relief per court order filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#74 Order on motion to seal (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order); #63 Motion for relief from stay REDACTED Fee amount $188, filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie). MODIFIED linkage to include link to redacted motion on 1/28/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order granting motion to seal certain portions of and exhibits to his motion (I)to modify the automatic stay to allow a trial-ready arbitration to proceed against the National Rifle Association of America, and (II) for related relief (related document #65) Entered on 1/28/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Lori A. Butler for Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (related document #68) Entered on 1/27/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Faheem A. Mahmooth for Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (related document #67) Entered on 1/27/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Michael I. Baird for Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (related document #66) Entered on 1/27/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 26, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Brandon R. Freud filed by Creditor Global New Beginnings, Inc.. (Freud, Brandon)
January 26, 2021 Filing 69 Notice Master Service List as of January 26, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
January 25, 2021 Filing 68 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Lori A. Butler. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Butler, Lori)
January 25, 2021 Filing 67 Amended Motion to appear pro hac vice for Faheem A. Mahmooth. (related document: #56) Filed by Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Mahmooth, Faheem)
January 25, 2021 Filing 66 Amended Motion to appear pro hac vice for Michael I. Baird. (related document: #49) Filed by Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Baird, Michael)
January 25, 2021 Filing 65 Motion to file document under seal.re: certain portions of and exhibits to #63 Motion to Modify Automatic Stay Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
January 25, 2021 Filing 64 Notice of hearing filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion for relief from stay Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #63, (Arbaugh, Natalie)
January 25, 2021 Filing 63 Motion for relief from stay (REDACTED) Fee amount $188, Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox Objections due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration #2 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie) MODFIED text to indicate "Redacted" on 1/26/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
January 25, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 0.00). Receipt number KF - No Fee Due for filing by U.S. Federal Government Agency, amount $ 0.00 (re: Doc#56). (Floyd)
January 25, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mprohac] ( 0.00). Receipt number KF - No Fee Due for filing by U.S. Federal Government Agency, amount $ 0.00 (re: Doc#49). (Floyd)
January 25, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion for relief from stay(21-30085-hdh11) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00). Receipt number 28440279, amount $ 188.00 (re: Doc#63). (U.S. Treasury)
January 24, 2021 Filing 62 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#57 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Sarah B. Rogers for National Rifle Association of America (related document #33) Entered on 1/22/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/24/2021. (Admin.)
January 23, 2021 Filing 61 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#52 Interim Order authorizing the debtor's to continue use of existing cash management system, maintain existing bank accounts, pay certain costs and fees associated with credit card transactions, and continue use of existing business forms (related document #5) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
January 23, 2021 Filing 60 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#40 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Thomas M. Buchanan for Christopher Cox (related document #24) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
January 23, 2021 Filing 59 BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#39 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding David Neier for Christopher Cox (related document #23) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 58 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America Related document(s) #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)). Hearing to be held on 2/10/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #8 and for #6 and for #5 #4 #7, (Neligan, Patrick). MODIFIED to create linkage on 1/25/2021 (Cumby, C).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Sarah B. Rogers for National Rifle Association of America (related document #33) Entered on 1/22/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 56 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Faheem A. Mahmooth. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Mahmooth, Faheem)
January 22, 2021 Filing 55 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 01/20/2021 RE: First Day Motions (50 pgs.). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 04/22/2021. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. (RE: related document(s) 42 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.), 43 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (DESIGNATED AS A COMPLEX CASE.), 44 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; AGREEMENT REACHED WITH U.S. TRUSTEE; GRANTED.), 45 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED ON AN INTERIM BASIS.), 46 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.), 47 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 04/22/2021. (Rehling, Kathy)
January 21, 2021 Filing 54 BNC certificate of mailing. (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 1/29/2021. Schedule D due 1/29/2021. Schedule E/F due 1/29/2021. Schedule G due 1/29/2021. Schedule H due 1/29/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 1/29/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 1/29/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/29/2021. Creditor matrix due 1/21/2021.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/21/2021. (Admin.)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order granting complex chapter 11 treatment. Entered on 1/21/2021 (Bradden, T.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 52 Interim Order authorizing the debtor's to continue use of existing cash management system, maintain existing bank accounts, pay certain costs and fees associated with credit card transactions, and continue use of existing business forms (related document #5) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 51 Interim Order granting motion to pay certain pre-petition taxes (related document #7) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 50 Interim Order granting #4 Motion to extend time. (Re: related document(s) #9 Notice of deficiency) Schedule A/B due 2/15/2021 for #9, Schedule D due 2/15/2021 for #9, Schedule E/F due 2/15/2021 for #9, Schedule G due 2/15/2021 for #9, Schedule H due 2/15/2021 for #9, Statement of Financial Affairs due 2/15/2021 for #9, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/15/2021 for #9, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 2/15/2021 for #9, Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 49 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Michael I. Baird. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Baird, Michael)
January 21, 2021 Filing 48 Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 1/20/2021. The requested turn-around time is daily (Green, Shanette)
January 21, 2021 Filing 41 Interim order authorizing the debtor's to pay pre-petition employee wages, compensation, and employee benefits and granting related relief (related document #6) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Thomas M. Buchanan for Christopher Cox (related document #24) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding David Neier for Christopher Cox (related document #23) Entered on 1/21/2021. (Bradden, T.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 38 Creditor matrix Verification of Mailing List. Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Neligan, Patrick)
January 21, 2021 Filing 37 Clerk's correspondence requesting Verification of matrix cover sheet, Form BTXN094 from attorney for debtor. (RE: related document(s)#35 Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of deficiency).) Responses due by 1/28/2021. (Kerr, S.)
January 20, 2021 Filing 87 Court admitted exhibits date of hearing 01/20/2021. DECLARATIONS FILED AT DKT #10, DKT #11 AND DKT #12 ADMITTED. (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)) (Green, Shanette)
January 20, 2021 44 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; AGREEMENT REACHED WITH U.S. TRUSTEE; GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
January 20, 2021 42 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
January 20, 2021 45 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED ON AN INTERIM BASIS.) (Green, Shanette)
January 20, 2021 43 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (DESIGNATED AS A COMPLEX CASE.) (Green, Shanette)
January 20, 2021 46 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
January 20, 2021 47 Hearing held on 1/20/2021. (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America.) (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; MOTION GRANTED.) (Green, Shanette)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order jointly administered lead case 21-30085 with member case(s) 21-30080. Sea Girt, LLC. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Sea Girt LLC, Case No. 21-30080; and National Rifle Association of America, Case No. 21-30085. All further pleadings and papers shall be filed, and all further docket entries shall be made, in Case No. 21-30085 (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America). Entered on 1/20/2021 (Rielly, Bill)
January 20, 2021 Filing 35 Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of deficiency). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 20, 2021 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Tara LeDay filed by Creditor Denton County. (LeDay, Tara)
January 20, 2021 Filing 33 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Sarah B. Rogers. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Collins, Michael)
January 20, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Filing Revised Proposed Orders filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 20, 2021 Filing 31 Brief in support filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 20, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-sgj11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28428104, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#33). (U.S. Treasury)
January 19, 2021 Filing 30 Certificate of service re: Motion to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Existing Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions and Use of Existing Business Forms filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 29 Certificate of service re: Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 28 Certificate of service re: Certain First Day Motions filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases, #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case , #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix, #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief, #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 20, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 26 Witness and Exhibit List Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing to be Held on January 20, 2021 filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases, #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case , #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix, #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief, #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Natalie Lynn Arbaugh filed by Creditor Christopher Cox. (Arbaugh, Natalie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 24 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Thomas M. Buchanan. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (Arbaugh, Natalie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 23 Motion to appear pro hac vice for David Neier. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Creditor Christopher Cox (Arbaugh, Natalie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by H Joseph Acosta filed by Ackerman McQueen, Inc., Mercury Group, Inc.. (Acosta, H)
January 19, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Brian Edward Mason filed by Ackerman McQueen, Inc., Mercury Group, Inc.. (Mason, Brian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by G. Michael Gruber filed by Mercury Group, Inc., Ackerman McQueen, Inc.. (Gruber, G.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 Support/supplemental documentExhibit B to Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Alter, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 Amended Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)). Hearing to be held on 1/20/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #3 and for #4 and for #6 and for #7 and for #5 and for #2, (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)). Hearing to be held on 1/20/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #3 and for #4 and for #6 and for #7 and for #5 and for #2, (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 DUPLICATE ENTRY RE - Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #2 Motion for joint administration, #3 1st. Day - Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case, #4 Motion to extend/shorten time, #5 First Day Motion, #6 Motion to pay, #7 Motion to pay tax debts) Debtors' Motion for Emergency Consideration of Certain First Day Motions Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) Modified on 1/21/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Laurie A. Spindler filed by Creditor Dallas County. (Spindler, Laurie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of hearing filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order), #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B), #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order), #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Interim Order)). Hearing to be held on 1/20/2021 at 02:00 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for #3 and for #4 and for #6 and for #7 and for #5 and for #2, (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents #2 Motion for joint administration, #3 1st. Day - Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case, #4 Motion to extend/shorten time, #5 First Day Motion, #6 Motion to pay, #7 Motion to pay tax debts, #8 First Day Motion) Debtors' Motion for Emergency Consideration of Certain First Day Motions Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick) (GRANTED ORALLY; DE #2, #3, #4, #5, #6, #7 SET FOR HEARING ON 1/20/21 AT 2:00 PM VIA WEBEX) Modified on 1/19/2021 (Bergreen, J.).
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration re: Declaration of Sonya A. Rowling in Support of Certain First Day Motions filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases, #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case , #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix, #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief, #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes, #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration re: Declaration of Robert G. Owens in Support of Certain First Day Motions filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases, #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case , #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix, #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief, #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes, #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration re: Declaration of Shawn E. Soto in Support of Certain First Day Motions filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases, #3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case , #4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix, #5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Exist, #6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief, #7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes, #8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate). (Neligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 1/29/2021. Schedule D due 1/29/2021. Schedule E/F due 1/29/2021. Schedule G due 1/29/2021. Schedule H due 1/29/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 1/29/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 1/29/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/29/2021. Creditor matrix due 1/21/2021. (Whitaker, Sherri)
January 19, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-sgj11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28425076, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#23). (U.S. Treasury)
January 19, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(21-30085-sgj11) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 28425114, amount $ 100.00 (re: Doc#24). (U.S. Treasury)
January 18, 2021 Filing 8 Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices, (II) Approving Procedures for Providing Adequate Assurance of Postpetition Payments and (III) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Interim Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 18, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to pay tax debtsDebtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Interim Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 18, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to pay Debtors' Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Employee Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Interim Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 18, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Cash Management System, Maintain Bank Accounts, Pay Certain Costs and Fees Associated with Credit Card Transactions, and Continue Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 18, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 18, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 18, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for joint administration of cases 21-30080 and 21-30085 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Directing The Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor National Rifle Association of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neligan, Patrick)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by National Rifle Association of America Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/17/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 05/17/2021. (Neligan, Patrick)
January 15, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)(21-30085-11) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number 28419411, amount $1738.00 (re: Doc#1). (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: National Rifle Association of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: National Rifle Association of America
Represented By: Patrick J. Neligan, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Blaine Bennett
Represented By: Gregory Eugene Garman
Represented By: Teresa M. Pilatowicz
Represented By: Sarah Brooke Rogers
Represented By: Dylan Thomas Ciciliano
Represented By: Gregory E. Garman
Represented By: Talitha Beth Gray Kozlowski
Represented By: William M. Noall
Represented By: Douglas James Buncher
Represented By: Michael J. Collins
Represented By: John D. Gaither
Represented By: Gabrielle Alicia Hamm
Represented By: William McCarty Noall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: National Rifle Association of America, Debtor
Represented By: Patrick J. Neligan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Lisa L. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Kristian W. Gluck
Represented By: Laura Lynn Smith
Represented By: Scott P. Drake
Represented By: Louis R. Strubeck, Jr.
Represented By: Nick J. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?