Tommy's Phoenix, LLC
Debtor: Tommy's Phoenix, LLC
U.S. Trustee: United States Trustee
Trustee: Mark Andrews
Case Number: 9:2024bk90015
Filed: May 21, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Edward L Morris
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting #14 Motion to extend time. (Re: related document(s) #2 Notice of deficiency, #14 Motion to extend time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, and Statements of Financial Affairs, and (II) Granting Related Relief) Schedule A/B due 7/8/2024 for #2, Schedule D due 7/8/2024 for #2, Schedule E/F due 7/8/2024 for #2, Schedule G due 7/8/2024 for #2, Schedule H due 7/8/2024 for #2, Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2024 for #2, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/8/2024 for #2, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 7/8/2024 for #2, Entered on 7/2/2024. (Nunns, Tracy)
June 25, 2024 Filing 14 Motion to extend time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, and Statements of Financial Affairs, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Trustee Mark Andrews Objections due by 6/28/2024. (Kaufman, Aaron)
May 26, 2024 Filing 11 BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024.) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting #6 Motion to extend time. (Re: related document(s) #2 Notice of deficiency) Schedule A/B due 6/24/2024 for #2, Schedule D due 6/24/2024 for #2, Schedule E/F due 6/24/2024 for #2, Schedule G due 6/24/2024 for #2, Schedule H due 6/24/2024 for #2, Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/24/2024 for #2, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/24/2024 for #2, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/24/2024 for #2, Declaration for electronic filing due 6/24/2024 for #2, Entered on 5/24/2024. (Nunns, Tracy)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 9:24-bk-90000 with member case 9:24-bk-90015 (related document #3). An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC, Case No. 24-90000-11 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Entered on 5/24/2024. (Spelmon, T)
May 23, 2024 Filing 8 BNC certificate of mailing. (RE: related document(s)#2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/4/2024. Schedule D due 6/4/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/4/2024. Schedule G due 6/4/2024. Schedule H due 6/4/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/4/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/4/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due 6/4/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/4/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/23/2024.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/23/2024. (Admin.)
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024. (Nixon, Sandra)
May 22, 2024 Filing 6 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Tommy's Phoenix, LLC (Rahn, Alexandria)
May 22, 2024 Filing 5 Amended voluntary petition by a non-individual filed for the following: add county . filed by Debtor Tommy's Phoenix, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)). (Boydston, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2024 4 Hearing set (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000-11, 24-90001-11, 24-90002-11, 24-90003-11, 24-90004-11, 24-90005-11, 24-90006-11, 24-90007-11, 24-90008-11, 24-90009-11, 24-90010-11, 24-90011-11, 24-90012-11, 24-90013-11, 24-90014-11, and 24-41734 Filed by Debtor Tommy's Phoenix, LLC) Hearing to be held on 5/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris for #3, (Warren, Shelley)
May 21, 2024 Filing 3 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000-11, 24-90001-11, 24-90002-11, 24-90003-11, 24-90004-11, 24-90005-11, 24-90006-11, 24-90007-11, 24-90008-11, 24-90009-11, 24-90010-11, 24-90011-11, 24-90012-11, 24-90013-11, 24-90014-11, and 24-41734 Filed by Debtor Tommy's Phoenix, LLC (Boydston, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/4/2024. Schedule D due 6/4/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/4/2024. Schedule G due 6/4/2024. Schedule H due 6/4/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/4/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/4/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due 6/4/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/4/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/23/2024. (Chambers, Deanna)
May 21, 2024 Filing 1 Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Tommy's Phoenix, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/18/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/18/2024. (Boydston, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)(# 24-90015-11) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number B31434312, amount $1738.00 (re: Doc#1). (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Tommy's Phoenix, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Tommy's Phoenix, LLC
Represented By: Alexandria Rahn
Represented By: Elizabeth Nicolle Boydston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Mark Andrews
Represented By: Aaron Michael Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?