Smith v. Taylor County Sheriff's Office Narcotics et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth R Smith
Defendant: Taylor County Sheriff's Office Narcotics and Taylor County Adult Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv00202
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Referring Judge: John R Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Thu Nov 14 11:45:35 CST 2019 (crt)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS. It is therefore ORDERED that the officials listed in this order shall provide the Court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint. An authorized custodian of the records of the respective entity must execute the attached Certification of Business Records (Certification) and attach the executed Certification to the records provided to the Court on or before December 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 11/14/2019) (jmc)
November 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Tue Nov 5 14:46:43 CST 2019 (crt)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Transferring the Case to the United States Magistrate Judge. After an initial review under 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court is of the opinion that this case should be transferred to the docket of the Honorable John R. Parker, United States District Judge, for further proceedings. This case will now be numbered Civil Action No. 1:19-CV-00202-BU. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 11/5/2019) (jmc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Consent by Kenneth R Smith to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (jmc)
October 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Tue Oct 15 14:18:32 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee because he lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay an initial fee; however, plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 under the PLRA. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 10/15/2019) (jmc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Trust Account by Kenneth R Smith TDCJ # 2019082598. (jmc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Copy of a Certificate of Inmate Trust account by Kenneth R Smith. A Certificate of Inmate Trust account form was mailed to Petitioner at address listed on correspondence. (jmc)
September 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Sep 26 10:54:52 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Kenneth R Smith must address the following deficiency: pay the filing fee or file a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement and a signed copy of the Authorization portion of the Certifcate of Inmate Trust Account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 20 days. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust) (jmc)
September 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Sep 23 14:29:49 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth R Smith. (jmc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jmc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kenneth R Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint) (jmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Taylor County Sheriff's Office Narcotics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor County Sheriff's Office Narcotics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?