Handlon v. Warden, FCI Big Spring
Petitioner: Robert Michael Handlon
Respondent: FBOP and Warden, FCI Big Spring
Case Number: 1:2020cv00110
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Jun 8 10:54:35 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Petitioner filed a motion to amend his habeas petition. But he did not submit a complete amended petition, nor did he include additional grounds for relief. Instead, Petitioner cites to additional case law in support of his original petition. Thus, the motion to amend is DENIED. However, the Court will consider Petitioner's additional case law as his memorandum in support of his petition. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/8/2020) (jmc)
June 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jun 2 13:56:48 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the petition and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ for FBOP added. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/2/2020) (jmc)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend 28 U.S.C. 2241 #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Michael Handlon. Clerk's Note: A date stamped copy was returned to Petitioner in self addressed stamped envelope provided to the Court. (jmc)
May 20, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Wed May 20 11:34:31 CDT 2020 (crt)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jmc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Michael Handlon. (Filing fee $5.00; receipt number AB005695) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmc) Modified to include receipt number on 5/27/2020 (mmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handlon v. Warden, FCI Big Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCI Big Spring
Represented By: Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Michael Handlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?