Flores v Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jeanette Flores
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 1:2020cv00126
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Referring Judge: John R Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jak)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by Jeanette Flores. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons USAG, #2 Proposed Summons USAO) (Chermol, David)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Granting Rule 83.10 Request for Leave: Before the Court is Plaintiff Jeanette Flores's Rule 83.10 Request for Leave #3 . The Court finds that the motion should be granted. It is ordered that Flores may proceed without local counsel in this civil action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 6/5/2020) (jak)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER : The Court has reviewed the Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 and concludes that is should be granted. Service on the Defendant shall be the responsibility of the Plaintiff. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff shall complete the "Summons in a Civil Case" form for each Defendant and submit it to the Clerk; 3. Upon receipt from the Plaintiff, the Clerk shall issue the summons and return it to the Plaintiff for service on the Defendant. See Order for further instructions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 6/5/2020) (jak)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Parker (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeanette Flores. (Chermol, David)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Request for Leave filed by Jeanette Flores (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chermol, David)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeanette Flores (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chermol, David)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul filed by Jeanette Flores. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Flores
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?