Avalos v. USA
Petitioner: Pascual Jaime Avalos
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00173
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Amy J Mitchell-DOJ added as AUSA. (Mitchell-DOJ, Amy)
September 9, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Sep 9 14:19:15 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Instructions to Parties in a Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255: The United States attorney shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, file an answer, motion or other response to the motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion, the Court's August 24, 2020 Order to Show Cause, and Avalos's Response to that order and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/9/2020) (jak)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Movant's Reply to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Pascual Jaime Avalos, re: #3 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (jak)
August 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Mon Aug 24 14:48:39 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause: After preliminary review, the Court notes that it appears that the motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 is subject to summary dismissal as barred by the time limitation for filing such motions. It is therefore ORDERED that Pascual Jaime Avalos shall, by no later than September 24, 2020, file a response reciting any arguments as to why his motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 should not be dismissed as filed beyond the time allowed. Failure to timely respond to this order by September 24, 2020 could result in the summary dismissal of the 2255 motion without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/24/2020) (jak)
August 18, 2020 Judge Reed C. O'Connor added. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. (jmc)
August 17, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Mon Aug 17 16:48:09 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmc)
August 17, 2020 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jmc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate filed by Pascual Jaime Avalos. ***(Clerk's Note: Page 9 of the Factual Resume was not included in the filing.) (jmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Leigha A Simonton-DOJ
Represented By: Amy J Mitchell-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pascual Jaime Avalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?