Peterson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Peterson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 1:2021cv00224
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: John R Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND TO PROCEED WITHOUT LOCAL COUNSEL. Having considered Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Pro Hac Vice #3 in conjunction with both her Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel #9 and her response to the Order to Show Cause, this Court finds both motions should be granted. The Clerk of Court shall deposit the admission fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 2/2/2022) (amg)
January 27, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #8 and MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Michael Peterson (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Herrera, Betty) Modified docket text to add Response to Order to Show Cause and Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel on 1/28/2022 (docketed as First Motion for Order to Show Cause by filer) (amg).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On December 21, 2021, the Court issued an order requiring attorney Betty Herrera to either (1) provide satisfactory documentation of local counsel to the Court and Clerk of Court or (2) move for leave to proceed without local counsel for admission pro hac vice. Dkt. No. #5 . Herrera was ordered to do so by January 13, 2022. As of the date of this order, Herrera has not complied. Therefore, it is ORDERED that no later than February 2, 2022, Herrera shall either (1) provide satisfactory documentation of local counsel to the Court and Clerk of Court or (2) move for leave to proceed without local counsel for admission pro hac vice. It is further ORDERED, no later than February 2, 2022, Herrera shall file a response to this Order and show cause in writing for her failure to comply with the Court's previous Notice of Deficiency and Order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 1/19/2022) (amg)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General of the United States, Region VI Social Security Administration, and U.S. Attorney's Office. **Clerk's Note: summonses and USM-285s hand-delivered and emailed to USMS-Abilene with Petitioner's Complaint (Doc 1), Notice and Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Order (Doc 6) (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (amg)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to complete Form USM-285 and issue summons to the Defendant; The Clerk is directed to provide (a) Form USM-285, (b) the completed summons, (c) Plaintiff's Complaint, (d) a blank Notice and Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge, and (d) a copy of this Order to the United States Marshal (USM) for service upon Defendant as provided in Rule 4(c)(3); The USM must, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, complete service upon Defendant as required by Rule 4(i) by serving: Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General of the United States, Region VI Social Security Administration, and the United States Attorneys Office. Although the Court has directed the USM to serve the Defendant, it is ultimately the Plaintiff's responsibility to ensure that the Defendant is timely served under Rule 4(m). See Order for additional information. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 12/21/2021) (amg)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER. The Court, having reviewed the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice #3 of Betty Herrera notes the application is not in compliance with the local counsel requirement set out by this Court's Local Civil Rules. Counsel is ORDERED to cure the deficiencies by either obtaining local counsel or file a motion to proceed without local counsel by January 13, 2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 12/21/2021) (amg)
December 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge John R. Parker added. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge John R. Parker. **Clerk's Note: per instructions from CD/Judge Cummings. (amg)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (amg)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12454529) filed by Michael Peterson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s)) (Herrera, Betty)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Peterson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))Attorney Betty Herrera added to party Michael Peterson(pty:pla) (Herrera, Betty)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Michael Peterson. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s) Summons, #4 Exhibit(s) Summons, #5 Exhibit(s) Summons) (Herrera, Betty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peterson
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?